Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 7:20-cv-80085
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:May 04, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Oct 31, 2020 6:28 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
SETH RODRIGUEZ


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, July 14, 2022
misc Filing Fee for Multidistrict Litigation (MDL) Case Thu 07/14 9:35 AM
Payment of Filing Fee ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7294916), filed by SETH RODRIGUEZ. (ANELLO, VIRGINIA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
7 7 cmp Refiled Short Form Complaint - MDL cases only Wed 07/13 2:14 PM
REFILED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by SETH RODRIGUEZ. (ANELLO, VIRGINIA)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 07/13 12:07 PM
NOTICE OF DESIGNATED FORUM - Western District of Texas, Fort Hood Division by SETH RODRIGUEZ (ANELLO, VIRGINIA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
notice Notice of Transition Tue 07/12 3:29 PM
NOTICE OF TRANSITION by SETH RODRIGUEZ (ANELLO, VIRGINIA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
4 4 cmp Refiled Short Form Complaint - MDL cases only Wed 07/06 9:10 PM
REFILED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by SETH RODRIGUEZ. (ANELLO, VIRGINIA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 06/28 8:05 PM
NOTICE OF DESIGNATED FORUM - Southern District of California, San Diego Division by SETH RODRIGUEZ (ANELLO, VIRGINIA)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
notice Notice of Transition Fri 06/24 3:09 PM
NOTICE OF TRANSITION by SETH RODRIGUEZ (ANELLO, VIRGINIA)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 04, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/04 9:22 AM
MASTER SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. (pll)
Related: [-]