Kesner v. Barron's, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-03454 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1332lb Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander |
Case Filed: | May 04, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 10, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Florida Southern, 0:19-cv-61370 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 31, 2020 7:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
William "Bill" Alpert
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Barron's, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teri Buhl
1725 York Avenue Apt. 30G
New York, NY 10128 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dow Jones & Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
John Salmon
|
|
Plaintiff
Harvey J. Kesner
100 S.E. 3d Ave Suite 1300
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33394 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, December 28, 2023 | ||
171 | 171
misc
Taxation of Costs
Thu 12/28 2:46 PM
TAXATION OF COSTS as to169 Bill of Costs Notice of Taxation. Costs are taxed on 3/10/2022 in favor of Teri Buhl against Harvey Kesner.(laq) |