Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-10746

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:20-ap-50594
Nature of Suit81 Bankruptcy - Subordination of claim or interest
21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
Case Filed:May 02, 2020
Terminated:Aug 18, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Northwood Ventures LLC
485 Underhill Blvd, Ste. 205
Syosset, NY 11791
Represented By
Northwood Ventures LLC
contact info
Defendant
Northwood Capital Partners LLC, Northwood Ventures, LLC, PCG Ares Sidecar Investment LP, and Partnership Capital Growth Investors III Blocked AIV, L.P.
485 Underhill Blvd, Ste 205
Syosset, NY 11791
Represented By
Northwood Capital Partners LLC, Northwood Ventures, LLC, PCG Ares Sidecar Investment LP, and Partnership Capital Growth Investors III Blocked AIV, L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Partnership Capital Growth
1 Embarcadero Center
San Francisco, CA 94111
Represented By
Partnership Capital Growth
contact info
Defendant
SK Partners
.485 Underhill Blvd, Ste 205
Syosset, NY 11791
Represented By
SK Partners
contact info
Plaintiff
Wade Weigel
289 S Via Palmas
Palm Springs, CA 92262
Represented By
Craig Steven Sternberg
Sternberg Thomson Okrent & Scher PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
David Petersen
` 300 S Australian Blvd No 1520
West Palm Beach, FL 33401
Represented By
Craig Steven Sternberg
Sternberg Thomson Okrent & Scher PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago
Tuesday, August 18, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Tue 08/18 12:53 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50594 Closed (LB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
3 3 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding - Motion Tue 05/26 8:09 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by David Petersen, Wade Weigel. (Sternberg, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order
Saturday, May 02, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Sat 05/02 5:52 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50594 LSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9752144, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Sat 05/02 5:45 PM
Adversary case 20-50594 Complaint by Wade Weigel, David Petersen against Northwood Ventures LLC, Northwood Capital Partners LLC, Northwood Ventures, LLC, PCG Ares Sidecar Investment LP, and Partnership Capital Growth Investors III Blocked AIV, L.P., Partnership Capital Growth, SK Partners. Fee Amount $350 (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)),(72 (Injunctive relief - other)),(81 (Subordination of claim or interest)). AP Summons Served due date: 8/3/2020. (Sternberg, Craig)
Related: [-]