Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:19-bk-05810

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael G Williamson
Case #: 8:20-ap-00280
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 01, 2020
Terminated:Aug 12, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
4851 Cox Road
Glen Allen, VA 23060
Represented By
Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Angela Welch, as Chapter 7 Trustee
12157 W. Linebaugh Avenue #401
Tampa, FL 33626
Represented By
Thomas A Lash, Attorney for Trustee
Lash, Wilcox & Grace Pl
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, May 21, 2021
court Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto) (Automation Use Only - Do Not Select) Fri 05/21 5:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by EO. Receipt Number 158858. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 12, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Wed 08/12 4:48 PM
Adversary Case 8:20-ap-280 Closed. (Coleman-Giddens, Faye)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 25, 2020
10 10 misc Proof of Service Sat 07/25 2:55 AM
Proof of Service of Agreed Final Order of Dismissal with Prejudice. Filed by Thomas A. Lash, Attorney for Trustee on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch, as Chapter 7 Trustee Related [+]. (Lash, Attorney for Trustee, Thomas)
Related: [-] 9
Thursday, July 23, 2020
9 9 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Thu 07/23 1:39 PM
Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary with Prejudice Related [+]. Service Instructions: Thomas Lash, Attorney for Trustee is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Christiane)
Related: [-] 8
Wednesday, July 22, 2020
8 8 misc Stipulation Wed 07/22 10:26 AM
Stipulation For Final Order Of Dismissal With Prejudice Filed by Thomas A. Lash, Attorney for Trustee on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Lash, Attorney for Trustee, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
court COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only) Tue 06/30 3:14 PM
CORRECTIVE Change of Address submitted to the Court on June 29, 2020 by Attorney Thomas A. Lash of Lash Wilcox & Grace PL - 2202 West Shore Boulevard, Suite 200, Tampa, FL 33607. *Corrected to reflect full firm name, only.* (Sara M.)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 29, 2020
court COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only) Mon 06/29 3:26 PM
Change of Address submitted to the Court on June 29, 2020 by Attorney Thomas A. Lash, of Wilcox & Grace PL - 2202 West Shore Boulevard, Suite 200, Tampa, FL 33607. (Sara M.)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 05, 2020
court COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only) Fri 06/05 11:54 AM
Change of Address submitted to the Court on June 4, 2020 by Thomas A. Lash, Attorney for Trustee, of Lash Wilcox & Grace PL, 2202 West Shore Blvd Suite 222, Tampa, FL 33607. (Deanna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 03, 2020
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 06/03 4:22 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Samuel A Zolot on behalf of Defendant Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. (Zolot, Samuel)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, May 27, 2020
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/27 11:41 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Andrew Kemp-Gerstel on behalf of Defendant Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. (Kemp-Gerstel, Andrew)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Wed 05/27 11:40 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Corporate parents added to case: Capital One Financial Corporation, NYSE: COF. Filed by Samuel A Zolot on behalf of Defendant Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. (Zolot, Samuel)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/27 11:39 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Samuel A Zolot on behalf of Defendant Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. (Zolot, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 05, 2020
3 3 misc Summons Service Executed Tue 05/05 3:30 PM
Service Executed on Capital One Bank, N.A., a national banking association of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Thomas A Lash, Attorney for Trustee on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Lash, Attorney for Trustee, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 04, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 05/04 11:59 AM
Summons issued on Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 06/03/2020. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A Pretrial/Status Conference will be held on August 18, 2020, at 09:30 AM. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 01, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint - Original Fri 05/01 1:30 PM
Complaint by Angela Welch, as Chapter 7 Trustee against Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. Filing Fee Deferred. Nature of Suit: [14 Related [+]]. (Lash, Attorney for Trustee, Thomas)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet