Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-10990

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael E Wiles
Case #: 1:20-ap-01082
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 04, 2020
Terminated:Aug 17, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Extreme Horse Limited
Represented By
Extreme Horse Limited
contact info
Plaintiff
The Northwest Company LLC
49 Bryant Ave.
Roslyn, NY 11576
Represented By
S. Jason Teele
Sills Cummis & Gross P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Thursday, August 17, 2023
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Thu 08/17 3:45 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1082 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (DePierola, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
92 92 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 08/11 5:01 PM
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding as to All Parties, Claims, and Counterclaims [Adv. Docket No. 91] Related [+] filed by Omni Agent Solutions.(Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 91