Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 7:20-cv-80358
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:May 04, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Oct 31, 2020 5:21 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
BLAIR ROY


Docket last updated: 72 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
misc Filing Fee for Multidistrict Litigation (MDL) Case Wed 04/06 1:11 PM
Payment of Filing Fee ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6909227), filed by BLAIR ROY. (ANELLO, VIRGINIA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
4 4 cmp Refiled Short Form Complaint - MDL cases only Tue 04/05 10:13 AM
REFILED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by BLAIR ROY. (ANELLO, VIRGINIA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 24, 2022
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 03/24 1:31 PM
NOTICE of Designated Forum - District of Minnesota, St. Paul Division by BLAIR ROY (ANELLO, VIRGINIA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 22, 2022
notice Notice of Transition Tue 03/22 2:39 PM
NOTICE OF TRANSITION by BLAIR ROY (ANELLO, VIRGINIA)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 04, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/04 11:17 AM
MASTER SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. (pll)
Related: [-]