Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Nitza I Quinones Alejandro
Case #: 2:20-cv-02144
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:May 04, 2020
Terminated:Sep 22, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Oct 31, 2020 5:10 AM EDT
Defendant
HAYT, HAYT & LANDAU, LLC
Represented By
ASHLEY ANN PALAIA
The Law Offices Of Frederic I Weinberg & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
KHALIFA HARLEY
Represented By
MICHAEL P. FORBES
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 22, 2020
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 09/22 1:14 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by KHALIFA HARLEY (FORBES, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 13, 2020
5 5 1 pgs order Order Thu 08/13 1:07 PM
ORDERED THAT COURT NOTES THAT DEFENDANT HAYT, HAYT & LANDAU, LLC HAS FAILED TO FILE AN ANSWER OR TO OTHERWISE PLEAD. UNDER THESE CIRCUMSTANCES, PLAINTIFF MAY FILE A REQUEST WITH THE CLERK OF COURT FOR ENTRY OF A DEFAULT IN ACCORDANCE WITH FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 55. IF THE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT IS NOT FILED WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS OF THIS ORDER, THE COURT WILL ENTER AN ORDER DISMISSING THE CASE AGAINST THE ABOVE-NAMED DEFENDANT FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 8/13/20. 8/13/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2020
4 4 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 06/24 2:54 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT HAS UNTIL 7/13/20 TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 6/23/20. 6/23/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 22, 2020
3 3 misc Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts) Mon 06/22 11:56 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by HAYT, HAYT & LANDAU, LLC. (PALAIA, ASHLEY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
2 2 service Affidavit of Service Wed 06/10 3:47 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by US MAIL RESTRICTED/CERTIFIED/RETURN RECEIPT re: served summons and complaint upon Martin Rubin, esquire of Hayt Haty & Landau, LLC by US Mail/Restricted Delivery/Certified/Return Receipt on May 27, 2020 (FORBES, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 05, 2020
service Summons Issued Tue 05/05 11:46 AM
Summons Issued as to HAYT, HAYT & LANDAU, LLC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 5/5/2020 (bw, )
Related: [-]
Monday, May 04, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Mon 05/04 3:39 PM
COMPLAINT against HAYT, HAYT & LANDAU, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14272107.), filed by KHALIFA HARLEY.(FORBES, MICHAEL) Modified on 5/4/2020 (lisad, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A,
Att: 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B
misc Jury Demand Tue 05/05 10:43 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by KHALIFA HARLEY. (lisad, )
Related: [-]