Kansas District Court
Judge:John W Broomes
Referred: Gwynne E Birzer
Case #: 2:20-cv-02228
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:May 04, 2020
Terminated:Apr 12, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Oct 31, 2020 4:53 AM CDT
Defendant
Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc.
Represented By
Meghan E. Lewis
Sandberg Phoenix & Von Gontard, Pc - Kc
contact info
Jonathan Toren
Cozen & O'Connor - Wa
contact info
Katrina L. Smeltzer
Sandberg Phoenix & Von Gontard, Pc - Kc
contact info
Maria Louise Cousineau
Cozen & O'Connor
contact info
Defendant
Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Represented By
M. Keith Moskowitz
Dentons Us, Llp - Chicago
contact info
Gregory T. Wolf
Dentons Us, Llp - Kc
contact info
Plaintiff
MGPI Processing, Inc.
100 Commercial Street
Atchison, KS 66002
Represented By
Scott C. Hecht
Stinson, Llp - Walnut
contact info
Christina Dawn Arnone
Stinson, Llp - Walnut
contact info
Christopher Sevedge
Stinson, Llp - Walnut
contact info

GPO Nov 17 2020
ORDER granting 37 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff must file the First Amended Complaint by 11/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 11/17/20. (adc)
GPO Sep 10 2021
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Allied World's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 55) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment against Allied World (Doc. 88) is DENIED. Indian Harbor's motion for summary judgment against Plaintiffs (Doc. 84) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. As discussed in this order, the motion is GRANTED as to "potential future claims" and/or "dormant claims that may be revived in the future" against Plaintiffs. Indian Harbor has no obligation to indemnify Plaintiffs for such claims or defend Plaintiffs from such claims. Indian Harbor's motion is otherwise DENIED. Conversely, Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment against Indian Harbor (Doc. 91) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as stated in this order. The court determines Indian Harbor is obligated to indemnify and defend Plaintiffs on the Underlying Claims identified in this order. Plaintiffs' motions to strike (Docs. 75, 119) are DENIED. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 9/10/2021. (mam)

Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 12, 2022
130 130 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 04/12 2:18 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by MGP Ingredients, Inc., MGPI Processing, Inc.. (Hecht, Scott)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 04/12 3:36 PM
***Civil Case Terminated per 130 Stipulation of Dismissal. (ca)
Related: [-]