California Central District Court
Judge:John A Kronstadt
Referred: Steve Kim
Case #: 2:20-cv-04081
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:2409(a) Quiet Title Action
Case Filed:May 04, 2020
Terminated:May 03, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Oct 31, 2020 4:53 AM PDT
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Michael Khoo
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Joshua L. Sohn
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Sarbonne Estate, Inc.
Represented By
Michael R Farrell
Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory And Natsis LLP
contact info
David C Scheper
Scheper Kim And Harris LLP
contact info
Tim C Hsu
Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory And Natsis LLP
contact info
Norman M Aspis
Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory And Natsis LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, June 30, 2022
34 34 3 pgs stip Dismiss Case Thu 06/30 3:42 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to [F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii)] Stipulation for Dismissal of Action with Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Sarbonne Estate, Inc..(Farrell, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
33 33 1 pgs order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 05/04 11:10 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. In light of Plaintiff's Notice of Pending Settlement (Dkt. 32), the Court orders that the action is dismissed without prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction to vacate this Order and to reopen the action within 120 days from the date of this Order; provided, however, any request by any party(ies) that the Court do so, shall make a showing of good cause as to why the settlement has not been completed within the 120-day period, what further settlement processes are necessary, and when the party(ies) making such a request reasonably expect the process to be concluded. This Order does not preclude the filing of a stipulation of dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41, which does not require the approval of the Court. Such a stipulation shall be filed within the aforementioned 120-day period, or by such later date ordered by the Court pursuant to a stipulation by the parties that conforms the requirements of a showing of good cause stated above. All dates and deadlines are vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED.(Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (yl)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2022
32 32 notice Settlement Mon 05/02 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Plaintiff Sarbonne Estate, Inc.'s Notice of Pending Settlement filed by Plaintiff Sarbonne Estate, Inc.. (Farrell, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 02, 2021
31 31 attorney Change of Address Tue 03/02 10:17 AM
NOTICE of Change of firm name and address by David C Scheper attorney for Plaintiff Sarbonne Estate, Inc.. Changing firm name to Winston & Strawn LLP and address to 333 South Grand Avenue, 38th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90071-1543. Filed by Plaintiff Sarbonne Estate, Inc.. (Scheper, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 18, 2021
29 29 32 pgs transcript -Transcript Mon 01/18 5:42 PM
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12/14/20 - 8:30 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Lisa M. Gonzalez; csrlisag@aol.com, phone number csrlisag2@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/8/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/18/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/19/2021. (Gonzalez, Lisa)
Related: [-]
textonly Notice of Filing Transcript Mon 01/18 5:43 PM
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 12/14/20 - 8:30 a.m. re Transcript29 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Gonzalez, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 14, 2020
28 28 minutes Motion Hearing Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction For Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 01/06 1:41 PM
MINUTES OF DEFENDANT UNITED STATES' RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS (DKT.17 ); MOTION OF SARBONNE ESTATE, INC., FOR ORDER DEEMING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT UNDER FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, RULE 15(D) (DKT.19 ); SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge John A. Kronstadt. The Motions are taken UNDER SUBMISSION, and a written ruling will be issued. The Scheduling Conference is DEFERRED pending resolution of the Motions. The Court has reviewed the parties' December 4, 2020 Joint Report (Dkt.23 ). If the Motion to Dismiss is denied, a separate scheduling order will issue based on that submission. Court Reporter: Lisa Gonzalez. (lom)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 11, 2020
27 27 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines Fri 12/11 12:57 PM
ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION ADVANCING THE HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF SARBONNE ESTATE INC.'S MOTION FOR ORDER DEEMING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT UNDER FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, RULE 15(D) FROM MARCH 8, 2021 TO DECEMBER 14, 2020 (DKT.24 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the relief requested in the Stipulation is GRANTED as follows: (1) The hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Order Deeming First Amended Complaint as Supplemental Complaint Under FRCP, Rule 15(d) (the "Motion to Deem" (Dkt.19 )) is advanced from March 8, 2021 to December 14, 2020 at 8:30 a.m.; and (2) The hearing on the Motion to Deem is consolidated with the hearing on Defendant's Renewed Motion to Dismiss (the "Motion to Dismiss" (Dkt.17 )), such that the Motions shall be heard simultaneously on December 14, 2020. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 07, 2020
26 26 motion Appear Mon 12/07 12:31 PM
REQUEST for Leave of Joshua L. Sohn and Michael W. Khoo to Appear for Telephonic Hearing (i.e. Request to Appear Telephonically) filed by Defendant United States of America. Request set for hearing on 12/14/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Sohn, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Sunday, December 06, 2020
25 25 notice Notice of Decision by other Court Sun 12/06 11:25 AM
NOTICE of Decision: by Texas Court in Co-Pending Action filed by Defendant United States of America.(Sohn, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, December 04, 2020
24 24 5 pgs stip Order Fri 12/04 12:34 PM
STIPULATION for Order Advancing Hearing Date on Plaintiff Sarbonne Estate, Inc.'s Motion for Order Deeming First Amended Complaint as Supplemental Complaint Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 15(D) (ECF 19), From March 8, 2021 to December 14, 2020 filed by Plaintiff Sarbonne Estate, Inc..(Farrell, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
23 23 misc Report Fri 12/04 12:23 PM
JOINT RULE 16(B)/26(F) REPORT filed by Plaintiff Sarbonne Estate, Inc.. (Farrell, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 14, 2020
22 22 respm Response in Support of Motion Wed 10/14 4:30 PM
RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Deeming First Amended Complaint as Supplemental Complaint Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 15(D) 19 filed by Plaintiff Sarbonne Estate, Inc.. (Farrell, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
21 21 respm Reply (Motion related) Wed 09/23 11:09 AM
REPLY in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Opposition to SEI Rule 15(d) Motion Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 17 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Deeming First Amended Complaint as Supplemental Complaint Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 15(D) 19 filed by Defendant United States of America.(Sohn, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Michael W. Khoo
Thursday, September 17, 2020
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 09/17 1:13 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Khoo counsel for Defendant United States of America. Adding Michael W. Khoo as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attorney Michael Khoo added to party United States of America(pty:dft))(Khoo, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 09, 2020
19 19 11 pgs motion Order Wed 09/09 3:54 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Deeming First Amended Complaint as Supplemental Complaint Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 15(D) filed by Plaintiff Sarbonne Estate, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/8/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Farrell, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
18 18 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Wed 09/09 3:45 PM
OPPOSITION TO re: Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 17 filed by Plaintiff Sarbonne Estate, Inc..(Farrell, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice In Support Thereof (with Exhibit A)
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
17 17 motion Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Wed 08/19 10:10 AM
Renewed NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 12/14/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Sohn, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 12, 2020
16 16 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 08/12 4:16 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DEEMING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS MOOT (DKT.12 )] by Judge John A Kronstadt: In light of the First Amended Complaint (Dkt.15 ), the Motion to Dismiss is deemed MOOT. Should the Defendant wish to renew its motion based on the First Amended Complaint, such motion shall be filed on or before August 19, 2020, with the hearing to remain scheduled for December 14, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. If Defendant does not wish to renew its motion, counsel shall contact the Deputy Clerk. In the event Defendant does not renew its motion, the Scheduling Conference will be taken under submission; the Rule 26 Meeting Report deadline remains December 4, 2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 10, 2020
15 15 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Mon 08/10 12:58 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant United States of America amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Sarbonne Estate, Inc.(Farrell, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 through 7,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Tuesday, July 21, 2020
14 14 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 07/21 4:15 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/4/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 12/14/2020 at 8:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (cw)
Related: [-]
13 13 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 07/21 4:12 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT UNITED STATES OF AMERICA'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DKT.12 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, continues the Motion from December 7, 2020 to December 14, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel shall refer to the Court's Standing Order with respect to the briefing schedule for motions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 20, 2020
12 12 motion Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 07/20 5:07 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 12/7/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Sohn, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Monday, June 22, 2020
11 11 notice Appearance Mon 06/22 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Joshua L Sohn on behalf of Defendant United States of America (Attorney Joshua L Sohn added to party United States of America(pty:dft))(Sohn, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA (60 days) Wed 06/10 2:27 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sarbonne Estate, Inc., upon Defendant United States of America served on 5/21/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk, Lillian Arratia. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Attorney General William Barr; Assistant Attorney General Lee J. Lofthus. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk, Lillian Arratia; Attorney General William Barr; Assistant Attorney General Lee J. Lofthus. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Aspis, Norman)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 21, 2020
9 9 notice Clerical Error (G-11) Thu 05/21 1:19 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)7 . Summons was Issued without Signature of Deputy Clerk. See attached Corrected Summons. (et)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Friday, May 08, 2020
8 8 81 pgs order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 05/08 12:06 PM
STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (droj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 05/06 10:52 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant United States of America. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 05/06 10:42 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 05/06 10:42 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 04, 2020
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 05/04 3:04 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sarbonne Estate, Inc., identifying United States of America, Sarbonne Estate, Inc., Tarwood Finance, Ltd.. (Farrell, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Mon 05/04 2:54 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Sarbonne Estate, Inc.. (Farrell, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 05/04 2:51 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sarbonne Estate, Inc.. (Farrell, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 05/04 2:41 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26324823 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Sarbonne Estate, Inc.. (Attorney Michael R Farrell added to party Sarbonne Estate, Inc.(pty:pla))(Farrell, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 54 pgs Exhibit 1 through 7