California Central District Court
Judge:Dolly M Gee
Referred: John E Mcdermott
Case #: 2:20-cv-04120
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 05, 2020
Terminated:Aug 05, 2020
Case in other court:Superior Court of California Los Angeles County, 20STCV15293
Last checked: Sunday Nov 01, 2020 1:32 AM PDT
Defendant
Medtronic Minimed, Inc.
Represented By
Richard R Tabura
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
Thomas Richard Pack
Maslon LLP
contact info
Ilana H Eisenstein
Dla Piper Us LLP
contact info
Nicole E Narotzky
Maslon LLP
contact info
Ginger Florence Heyman Pigott
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
Defendant
Medtronic, Inc.
Represented By
Richard R Tabura
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
Ilana H Eisenstein
Dla Piper Us LLP
contact info
Nicole E Narotzky
Maslon LLP
contact info
Ginger Florence Heyman Pigott
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Morgan Bailey
Represented By
Kevin Haverty
Williams Cedar LLC
contact info
Laura Smith
Heaviside Reed Zaic Alc
contact info
Julia Reed Zaic
Julia Reed Zaic Esq
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Miller
Represented By
Kevin Haverty
Williams Cedar LLC
contact info
Laura Smith
Heaviside Reed Zaic Alc
contact info
Julia Reed Zaic
Julia Reed Zaic Esq
contact info
Plaintiff
William Oliver
Represented By
Kevin Haverty
Williams Cedar LLC
contact info
Laura Smith
Heaviside Reed Zaic Alc
contact info
Julia Reed Zaic
Julia Reed Zaic Esq
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephen Plum
Represented By
Kevin Haverty
Williams Cedar LLC
contact info
Laura Smith
Heaviside Reed Zaic Alc
contact info
Julia Reed Zaic
Julia Reed Zaic Esq
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Topel
Represented By
Kevin Haverty
Williams Cedar LLC
contact info
Laura Smith
Heaviside Reed Zaic Alc
contact info
Julia Reed Zaic
Julia Reed Zaic Esq
contact info
Plaintiff
Pamela Weisshar
Represented By
Kevin Haverty
Williams Cedar LLC
contact info
Laura Smith
Heaviside Reed Zaic Alc
contact info
Julia Reed Zaic
Julia Reed Zaic Esq
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Moyer
Represented By
Kevin Haverty
Williams Cedar LLC
contact info
Laura Smith
Heaviside Reed Zaic Alc
contact info
Julia Reed Zaic
Julia Reed Zaic Esq
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, August 20, 2020
28 28 misc Receipt Fri 08/21 12:29 PM
Receipt of Acknowledgment of documents received by Superior Court of California Los Angeles County, case no. 20STCV15293. (lom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
27 27 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form Wed 08/05 4:54 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Stanley Mosk Courthouse. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Stanley Mosk Courthouse. (gk)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Sever Dismiss Case Wed 08/05 4:51 PM
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE DEFENDANTS MEDTRONIC MINIMED, INC. AND MEDTRONIC, INC.'S MOTION TO SEVER AND MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court concludes that it lacks subject matter jurisdiction over this matter and hereby REMANDS the case to the Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case No. 20STCV15293. Defendants' motions to sever claims7 and dismiss the action15 are DENIED without prejudice as moot. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 22, 2020
25 25 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 07/22 11:15 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Defendants' Motion to Sever7 and Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint15 presently scheduled for hearing on July 24, 2020, are appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the motions are taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 21, 2020
24 24 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/21 4:36 PM
ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: granting23 Non-Resident Attorney Nicole E Narotzky APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Medtronic Minimed, Inc., designating Ginger Pigott as local counsel. (lom)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 20, 2020
23 23 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Mon 07/20 4:27 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nicole E. Narotzky to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27277581) filed by Defendants Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Pigott, Ginger)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, July 10, 2020
22 22 respm Reply (Motion related) Fri 07/10 10:25 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b), 8(a), and 9(b) 15 filed by Defendants Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Tabura, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 07, 2020
21 21 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/07 10:13 AM
ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: granting18 Non-Resident Attorney Ilana H Eisenstein APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc., designating Inger Pigott as local counsel. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 06, 2020
20 20 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Mon 07/06 6:28 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b), 8(a), and 9(b) 15 filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Bailey, Richard Miller, Steven Moyer, William Oliver, Stephen Plum, Jennifer Topel, Pamela Weisshar.(Zaic, Julia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
19 19 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines Tue 06/30 4:25 PM
ORDER CONTINUING THE HEARING ON MEDTRONIC MINIMED, INC. AND MEDTRONIC, INC.'S MOTION TO SEVER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation14 , the Court hereby orders that the hearing on Defendants' Motion to Sever7 is rescheduled to 7/24/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (gk)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 06/30 11:41 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ilana H. Eisenstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27013140) filed by Defendants Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Pigott, Ginger)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, June 26, 2020
17 17 16 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 06/26 3:58 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever the Claims Asserted by Each Individual Plaintiff 7 filed by Defendants Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Tabura, Richard)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc For Judicial Notice Fri 06/26 2:06 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b), 8(a), and 9(b) 15 filed by Defendants Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Tabura, Richard)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Dismiss Case Fri 06/26 2:02 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b), 8(a), and 9(b) filed by Defendants Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/24/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Tabura, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, June 22, 2020
14 14 stip Continue Mon 06/22 12:36 PM
STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Sever from July 10, 2020 to July 24, 2020 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever the Claims Asserted by Each Individual Plaintiff 7 filed by Defendants Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc..(Tabura, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 16, 2020
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Tue 06/16 4:05 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA TO PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MEDTRONIC MINIMED, INC. AND MEDTRONIC, INC.S MOTION TO SEVER filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Bailey, Richard Miller, Steven Moyer, William Oliver, Stephen Plum, Jennifer Topel, Pamela Weisshar. (Zaic, Julia)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 12, 2020
12 12 22 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 06/12 9:28 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever the Claims Asserted by Each Individual Plaintiff 7 filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Bailey, Richard Miller, Steven Moyer, William Oliver, Stephen Plum, Jennifer Topel, Pamela Weisshar.(Zaic, Julia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Friday, June 05, 2020
11 11 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines Fri 06/05 2:07 PM
ORDER CONTINUING THE HEARING ON MEDTRONIC MINIMED, INC. AND MEDTRONIC, INC.'S MOTION TO SEVER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation8 , the hearing on Defendants' Motion to Sever7 is rescheduled to 7/10/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Plaintiffs' Opposition shall be due 6/12/2020. Defendants' Reply shall be due on 6/26/2020. (gk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 04, 2020
10 10 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/04 8:10 AM
ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin Haverty to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Stephen Plum, William Oliver, Steven Moyer, Morgan Bailey, Pamela Weisshar, Richard Miller, and Jennifer Topel, designating Julia Reed Zaic as local counsel9 . (gk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 03, 2020
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 06/03 3:35 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin Haverty to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Morgan Bailey, Richard Miller, Steven Moyer, William Oliver, Stephen Plum, Jennifer Topel, Pamela Weisshar (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26673042) filed by Attorney for Plaintiffs Morgan Bailey, Richard Miller, Steven Moyer, William Oliver, Stephen Plum, Jennifer Topel, Pamela Weisshar. (Zaic, Julia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
8 8 stip Continue Tue 06/02 3:34 PM
STIPULATION to Continue Motion to Sever from June 26, 2020 to July 10, 2020 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever the Claims Asserted by Each Individual Plaintiff 7 filed by Defendants Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc..(Tabura, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Continuing the Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Sever
Friday, May 29, 2020
7 7 motion Sever Fri 05/29 3:13 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever the Claims Asserted by Each Individual Plaintiff filed by Defendants Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/26/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Tabura, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Sever,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Sever
Thursday, May 21, 2020
6 6 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Thu 05/21 2:31 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Medtronic, Inc. answer now due 6/26/2020; Medtronic Minimed, Inc. answer now due 6/26/2020, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Medtronic, Inc.; Medtronic Minimed, Inc..(Tabura, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
5 5 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 05/06 3:03 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
Related: [-]
4 4 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 05/06 2:18 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 05/06 2:18 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 05, 2020
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 05/05 4:21 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc., (Tabura, Richard)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 05/05 4:16 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California, case number 20STCV15293 Receipt No: ACACDC-26342107 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Medtronic, Inc., Medtronic Minimed, Inc.. (Attorney Richard R Tabura added to party Medtronic Minimed, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Richard R Tabura added to party Medtronic, Inc.(pty:dft))(Tabura, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 and 2,
Att: 2 3 pgs Civil Cover Sheet
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Wed 05/06 2:38 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Richard Miller, Steven Moyer, Jennifer Topel, William Oliver, Morgan Bailey, Stephen Plum, Pamela Weisshar. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 4/20/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh)
Related: [-]