Delaware District Court
Judge:Stephanos Bibas
Case #: 1:20-cv-00613
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:May 06, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 12, 2023 6:06 PM EDT
Counter Claimant
ROSS Intelligence Inc.
Represented By
Kayvan M. Ghaffari
contact info
Jacob Canter
contact info
Lisa Kimmel
contact info
Mark A. Klapow
contact info
Warrington Parker
contact info
Stephanie E. O'Byrne
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Gabriel M. Ramsey
contact info
Joshua M Rychlinski
contact info
David Ellis Moore
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info
Christopher J Banks
contact info
Crinesha B. Berry
contact info
Bindu Ann George Palapura
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info
Joachim B. Steinberg
contact info
Counter Defendant
Thomson Reuters Enterprise Centre GmbH
Represented By
Jack B. Blumenfeld
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Eric A. Loverro
contact info
Joshua L. Simmons
contact info
Dale M. Cendali
contact info
Michael J. Flynn
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
West Publishing Corporation
Represented By
Jack B. Blumenfeld
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Eric A. Loverro
contact info
Joshua L. Simmons
contact info
Dale M. Cendali
contact info
Michael J. Flynn
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Defendant
ROSS Intelligence Inc.
Represented By
Jacob Canter
contact info
Lisa Kimmel
contact info
David Ellis Moore
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info
Christopher J Banks
contact info
Mark A. Klapow
contact info
Crinesha B. Berry
contact info
Bindu Ann George Palapura
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info
Warrington Parker
contact info
Joachim B. Steinberg
contact info
Gabriel M. Ramsey
contact info
Notice Only
Fastcase, Inc.
Ashby & Geddes 500 Delaware Avenue Suite 800
Wilmington, DE 19801
Plaintiff
Thomson Reuters Enterprise Centre GmbH
Represented By
Joshua Simmons
contact info
Jack B. Blumenfeld
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Eric A. Loverro
contact info
Joshua L. Simmons
contact info
Dale M. Cendali
contact info
Michael J. Flynn
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
West Publishing Corporation
Represented By
Joshua Simmons
contact info
Jack B. Blumenfeld
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Eric A. Loverro
contact info
Joshua L. Simmons
contact info
Dale M. Cendali
contact info
Michael J. Flynn
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 29 2021
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 11 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/29/21. (ntl)
GPO Apr 26 2022
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 39 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/26/22. (ntl)
GPO Sep 25 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanos Bibas on 9/25/2023. (twk)
GPO Sep 28 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanos Bibas on 9/28/2023. (apk)
GPO Sep 27 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge Stephanos Bibas on 9/27/2024. (mpb)
GPO Feb 11 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanos Bibas on 2/11/2025. (jfm)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 10, 2025
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Thu 04/10 3:13 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Anne M. Voigts, Ranjini Acharya, Kayvan M. Ghaffari for ROSS Intelligence Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cdd)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
803 803 order Oral Order Mon 04/07 11:51 AM
ORAL ORDER: I dismiss as moot D.I.798 . Ordered by Judge Stephanos Bibas on 04/07/2025. (oam)
Related: [-]
802 802 order SO ORDERED Mon 04/07 11:46 AM
SO ORDERED: re800 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kayvan M. Ghaffari, Anne M. Voigts and Ranjini Acharya of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP. Ordered by Judge Stephanos Bibas on 04/07/2025. (oam)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
801 801 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 03 Attorneys Credit Card Payment Fri 04/04 2:05 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Kayvan M. Ghaffari, Anne M. Voigts, and Ranjini Acharya. ( re800 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kayvan M. Ghaffari, Anne M. Voigts and Ranjini Acharya of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP )( Payment of $ 150, receipt number ADEDC-4654569).(Moore, David)
Related: [-]
800 800 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/04 2:02 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kayvan M. Ghaffari, Anne M. Voigts and Ranjini Acharya of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP - filed by ROSS Intelligence Inc.. (Moore, David)
Related: [-]
799 799 order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Fri 04/04 8:21 AM
ORDER: I GRANT Ross's motion for interlocutory appeal and stay pending appeal. D.I.786 . Though I remain confident in my February 2025 summary judgment opinion, I recognize that there are substantial grounds for difference of opinion on controlling legal issues in this case. These issues have the potential to change the shape of the trial. I thus certify the following two questions to the Third Circuit: (1) whether the West headnotes and West Key Number System are original; and (2) whether Ross's use of the headnotes was fair use. A short opinion further explaining my reasoning will follow. Under the stay, the pretrial conference on April 9, 2025 and the trial the week of May 12, 2025 are postponed pending appeal. Ordered by Judge Stephanos Bibas on 04/03/2025. (jfm)
Related: [-]
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Fri 04/04 3:38 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Yar R. Chaikovsky for ROSS Intelligence Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cdd)
Related: [-]