Macke v. HT Airsystems of Florida, LLC.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Anne C Conway |
Referred: | Daniel C Irick |
Case #: | 6:20-cv-00787 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | May 06, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 02, 2020 7:19 AM EST |
Defendant
HT Airsystems of Florida, LLC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Macke
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, February 04, 2021 | ||
31 | 31
2
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Thu 02/04 2:45 PM
ORDER adopting 29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS GRANTING 28 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval and Motion to Dismiss the Case with Prejudice and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Robert Macke. Case is dismissed with prejudice and clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 2/4/2021. (Copies mailed/emailed)(AKC) |
|
Wednesday, February 03, 2021 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 02/03 4:13 PM
NOTICE by Robert Macke re29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re28 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval and Motion to Dismiss the Case with Prejudice and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Robert Macke. (Harne, Alexander) |
|
Tuesday, February 02, 2021 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 02/02 4:29 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 28 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval and Motion to Dismiss the Case with Prejudice and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Robert Macke. It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that the Motion (Doc. 28) be GRANTED; the Court find the Agreement (Doc. 28-1) to be a fair and reasonable settlement of Plaintiff's claims under the FLSA; the case be DISMISSED with prejudice; and the Clerk be directed to close the case. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 2/2/2021. (RN) |
|
Friday, December 18, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Settlement
Fri 12/18 8:12 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement by Robert Macke.(Storch, Noah) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement | ||
Tuesday, December 15, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Tue 12/15 10:12 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 26 Joint Motion for Three Day Extension to File Joint Motion for Approval. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 12/15/2020. (Irick, Daniel) |
|
Monday, December 14, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Extension of Time to File
Mon 12/14 9:54 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Settlement by Robert Macke. (Storch, Noah) |
|
Wednesday, November 25, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
order
*Order pdf
Wed 11/25 3:27 PM
ORDER for the parties to file a joint motion, by December 14, 2020, containing their supporting documents regarding the natureof the claims, the terms of settlement, and pertinent information regarding any allowance for fees. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 11/25/2020. (EC1) |
|
Friday, November 20, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of settlement
Fri 11/20 3:36 PM
NOTICE of settlement by Robert Macke (Harne, Alexander) |
|
Monday, September 28, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of mediation conference/hearing
Mon 09/28 2:52 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on December 16, 2020 10:00 a.m. before James L. Nulman. (Harne, Alexander) |
|
Tuesday, September 15, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
utility
Case Referred to Mediation
Tue 09/15 10:25 AM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation (mediator TBD). (MEJ) |
|
Monday, September 14, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
order
Case management and scheduling order
Mon 09/14 5:08 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/21/2020, Joinder of Parties due by 9/21/2020, Discovery due by 4/2/2021, Dispositive motions due by 6/3/2021, Pretrial statement due by 11/15/2021, All other motions due by 7/2/2021, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 11/2/2020, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 12/11/2020, Jury Trial set for 1/3/2022 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 B before Judge Anne C. Conway., Conduct mediation hearing by 5/3/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates, select a mediator from the court's approved list, reserve a conference date and file a notice with the court WITHIN 14 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER advising the court of the scheduled mediation date. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 9/14/2020. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC) |
|
Wednesday, September 09, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Case Management Report
Wed 09/09 1:19 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Storch, Noah) |
|
Wednesday, September 02, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Settlement/Trial report
Wed 09/02 1:21 PM
Joint SETTLEMENT report by HT Airsystems of Florida, LLC.. (Sugerman, Marc) Modified docket text on 9/2/2020 (MEJ) |
|
Thursday, July 23, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically
Thu 07/23 9:44 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 17 Unopposed Motion To Appear Telephonically for the Settlement Conference and Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 7/23/2020. (Irick, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, July 22, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Appear Telephonically
Wed 07/22 3:44 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Noah E. Storch to appear telephonically for the Settlement Conference and Case Management Conference by Robert Macke. (Storch, Noah) |
|
Thursday, July 16, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
respoth
Answer to court interrogatories
Thu 07/16 2:22 PM
ANSWER to court interrogatories re:13 FLSA scheduling order with deadlines by Robert Macke. (Storch, Noah) |
|
Wednesday, June 17, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Wed 06/17 2:53 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re11 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 by HT Airsystems of Florida, LLC.. (Sugerman, Marc) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Wed 06/17 2:51 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re13 FLSA scheduling order with deadlines per Local Rule 1.04(d) by HT Airsystems of Florida, LLC.. Related case(s): no (Sugerman, Marc) |
|
Friday, June 05, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
order
FLSA scheduling order with deadlines
Fri 06/05 5:02 PM
FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER. By 6/25/2020 parties shall serve copies upon each other as stated in the order; Answer to court interrogatories due by 7/16/2020, By 8/13/2020 parties are to meet and confer; Settlement Report due by 9/2/2020. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 6/5/2020. (RN) |
|
Thursday, June 04, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
order
Standing Order
Thu 06/04 2:54 PM
*ENTERED IN ERROR(RN) |
|
Wednesday, June 03, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
order
Related case/interested persons/ECF-2
Wed 06/03 3:28 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER (FLSA), INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing for DEFENDANT. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/17/2020. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/17/2020. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 6/3/2020. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 06/03 2:16 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by HT Airsystems of Florida, LLC..(Sugerman, Marc) |
|
Friday, May 22, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons returned executed
Fri 05/22 3:41 PM
RETURN of service executed on 05/13/2020 by Robert Macke as to HT Airsystems of Florida, LLC.. (Harne, Alexander) |
|
Friday, May 08, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations
Fri 05/08 10:10 AM
ORDER OF REFERENCE (FLSA). This case is hereby referred to the Magistrate Judge for case management, ruling on all non-dispositive motions, and the issuance of Report and Recommendations on dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 5/7/2020. (counsel emailed)(AKC) |
|
Thursday, May 07, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons issued
Thu 05/07 10:04 AM
SUMMONS issued as to HT Airsystems of Florida, LLC. (MEJ) |
|
Wednesday, May 06, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Wed 05/06 5:07 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re4 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 by Robert Macke. (Harne, Alexander) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Wed 05/06 4:58 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Robert Macke. Related case(s): no (Harne, Alexander) |
|
4 | 4
order
Related case/interested persons/ECF-2
Wed 05/06 4:32 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER (FLSA) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/20/2020. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/20/2020. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 5/6/2020. (counsel mailed/emailed)(AKC) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of appearance
Wed 05/06 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Thomas Harne on behalf of Robert Macke (Harne, Alexander) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 05/06 2:06 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:20-cv-787-Orl-22DCI. (SJB) |
|
1 | 1
13
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 05/06 1:00 PM
COMPLAINT against HT Airsystems of Florida, LLC. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16780819) filed by Robert Macke.(Storch, Noah) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet |