Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:Gregory F Vantatenhove
Case #: 3:20-cv-00032
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 05, 2020
Terminated:Jan 05, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Nov 01, 2020 4:04 AM EST
Counter Claimant
University of Kentucky
Represented By
Kevin G. Henry
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney PLLC
contact info
Bryan Howard Beauman
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney PLLC
contact info
William Eugene Thro
University Of Kentucky
contact info
Donald C. Morgan
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney PLLC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Penny Cox
Represented By
Kevin G. Henry
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney PLLC
contact info
Bryan Howard Beauman
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney PLLC
contact info
William Eugene Thro
University Of Kentucky
contact info
Donald C. Morgan
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Amelia Long
Represented By
William Michael Hamilton
Provost Umphrey Law Firm Llp - Tn
contact info
Guy Fisher
Provost & Umphrey Law Firm Llp - Tx
contact info
Bryan C. Hix
Mcnamara & Jones
contact info
Philip Barrett Block
E. Douglas Richards, Psc
contact info
E. Douglas Richards
E. Douglas Richards, Psc
contact info
Counter Defendant
Karen Sansom
Represented By
William Michael Hamilton
Provost Umphrey Law Firm Llp - Tn
contact info
Guy Fisher
Provost & Umphrey Law Firm Llp - Tx
contact info
Bryan C. Hix
Mcnamara & Jones
contact info
Philip Barrett Block
E. Douglas Richards, Psc
contact info
E. Douglas Richards
E. Douglas Richards, Psc
contact info
Counter Defendant
Sherrie Turner
Represented By
William Michael Hamilton
Provost Umphrey Law Firm Llp - Tn
contact info
Guy Fisher
Provost & Umphrey Law Firm Llp - Tx
contact info
Bryan C. Hix
Mcnamara & Jones
contact info
Philip Barrett Block
E. Douglas Richards, Psc
contact info
E. Douglas Richards
E. Douglas Richards, Psc
contact info
Counter Defendant
Tabitha Marcum
Represented By
William Michael Hamilton
Provost Umphrey Law Firm Llp - Tn
contact info
Guy Fisher
Provost & Umphrey Law Firm Llp - Tx
contact info
Bryan C. Hix
Mcnamara & Jones
contact info
Philip Barrett Block
E. Douglas Richards, Psc
contact info
Counter Defendant
Richard Hardy, II
Represented By
William Michael Hamilton
Provost Umphrey Law Firm Llp - Tn
contact info
Guy Fisher
Provost & Umphrey Law Firm Llp - Tx
contact info
Bryan C. Hix
Mcnamara & Jones
contact info
Philip Barrett Block
E. Douglas Richards, Psc
contact info
E. Douglas Richards
E. Douglas Richards, Psc
contact info
Counter Defendant
Karen Devin
Represented By
William Michael Hamilton
Provost Umphrey Law Firm Llp - Tn
contact info
Guy Fisher
Provost & Umphrey Law Firm Llp - Tx
contact info
Bryan C. Hix
Mcnamara & Jones
contact info
Philip Barrett Block
E. Douglas Richards, Psc
contact info
E. Douglas Richards
E. Douglas Richards, Psc
contact info
Defendant
Penny Cox
Represented By
Kevin G. Henry
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney PLLC
contact info
Bryan Howard Beauman
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney PLLC
contact info
William Eugene Thro
University Of Kentucky
contact info
Donald C. Morgan
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Commonwealth of Kentucky Department of Revenue
Represented By
Raymond Campbell Connell
Ky Department Of Revenue - Collections Div.
contact info
Frank Leslie Dempsey
Ky Department Of Revenue - Collections Div.
contact info
Defendant
University of Kentucky
Represented By
Kevin G. Henry
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney PLLC
contact info
Bryan Howard Beauman
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney PLLC
contact info
William Eugene Thro
University Of Kentucky
contact info
Donald C. Morgan
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney PLLC
contact info
Official Defendant
Allison Ball
Represented By
Noah Robert Friend
Noah R. Friend Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Karen Devin
Represented By
William Michael Hamilton
Provost Umphrey Law Firm Llp - Tn
contact info
Guy Fisher
Provost & Umphrey Law Firm Llp - Tx
contact info
Bryan C. Hix
Mcnamara & Jones
contact info
Philip Barrett Block
E. Douglas Richards, Psc
contact info
E. Douglas Richards
E. Douglas Richards, Psc
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Hardy, II
Represented By
William Michael Hamilton
Provost Umphrey Law Firm Llp - Tn
contact info
Guy Fisher
Provost & Umphrey Law Firm Llp - Tx
contact info
Bryan C. Hix
Mcnamara & Jones
contact info
Philip Barrett Block
E. Douglas Richards, Psc
contact info
E. Douglas Richards
E. Douglas Richards, Psc
contact info
Plaintiff
Amelia Long
Represented By
William Michael Hamilton
Provost Umphrey Law Firm Llp - Tn
contact info
Guy Fisher
Provost & Umphrey Law Firm Llp - Tx
contact info
Bryan C. Hix
Mcnamara & Jones
contact info
Philip Barrett Block
E. Douglas Richards, Psc
contact info
E. Douglas Richards
E. Douglas Richards, Psc
contact info
Plaintiff
Tabitha Marcum
Represented By
William Michael Hamilton
Provost Umphrey Law Firm Llp - Tn
contact info
Guy Fisher
Provost & Umphrey Law Firm Llp - Tx
contact info
Bryan C. Hix
Mcnamara & Jones
contact info
Philip Barrett Block
E. Douglas Richards, Psc
contact info
E. Douglas Richards
E. Douglas Richards, Psc
contact info
Plaintiff
Karen Sansom
Represented By
William Michael Hamilton
Provost Umphrey Law Firm Llp - Tn
contact info
Guy Fisher
Provost & Umphrey Law Firm Llp - Tx
contact info
Bryan C. Hix
Mcnamara & Jones
contact info
Philip Barrett Block
E. Douglas Richards, Psc
contact info
E. Douglas Richards
E. Douglas Richards, Psc
contact info
Plaintiff
Sherrie Turner
Represented By
William Michael Hamilton
Provost Umphrey Law Firm Llp - Tn
contact info
Guy Fisher
Provost & Umphrey Law Firm Llp - Tx
contact info
Bryan C. Hix
Mcnamara & Jones
contact info
Philip Barrett Block
E. Douglas Richards, Psc
contact info
E. Douglas Richards
E. Douglas Richards, Psc
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Official Defendant
Susan Krauss
Terminated: 05/05/2020
Represented By
Kevin G. Henry
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney PLLC
contact info
Bryan Howard Beauman
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney PLLC
contact info
William Eugene Thro
University Of Kentucky
contact info
Donald C. Morgan
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 01, 2021
misc Notice of Fee Refund Approved Thu 04/01 9:40 AM
NOTICE OF FEE REFUND re38 Order; the fee transaction involving Receipt No. 0643-4830227 having been erroneously paid, the Court APPROVED the refund by processing a credit through the electronic credit card system. The credit refund transaction in the amount of $ $125.00 was successfully completed on 4/1/2021 at 9:13 a.m. cc: COR (JJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
38 38 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically Tue 03/30 10:07 AM
ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Plaintiffs Motion for Return of Duplicate Payment of Pro Hac Vice Admission Fee [R.37 .] Court being otherwise sufficiently advised, it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk return or credit counsel, E. Douglas Richards, $125 for Mr. Hamiltons duplicate filing. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 3/29/2021. (CBD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 25, 2021
utility Motion Submitted Thu 03/25 9:44 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re37 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically for duplicative pro hac vice fee for W. Michael Hamilton [R. 22 ,R. 25 ] (JJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
37 37 motion Refund of Fees Paid Electronically Wed 03/24 4:27 PM
MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically for duplicative pro hac vice fee for W. Michael Hamilton(Richards, E.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Receipt for initial pro hac vice fee,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Receipt of second pro hac vice fee,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Email from Ms. Lee,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
36 36 10 pgs order Order Terminate Motions Term Case Tue 01/05 11:27 AM
ORDER : 1. Commonwealth of Kentucky Department of Revenue's Motion for Partial Dismissal6 is GRANTED;2. Defendant University of Kentucky's Motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim8 is GRANTED;3. Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State court29 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 1/4/2021.(CBD)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Parties Tue 01/05 11:32 AM
Party Defendant University of Kentucky terminated. (CBD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 31, 2020
utility Motion Submitted Thu 12/31 12:26 PM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re29 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Karen Devin, Richard Hardy, II, Amelia Long, Tabitha Marcum, Karen Sansom for lack of supplemental jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. Section 1367 (CBD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
35 35 respoth Reply Brief Wed 12/30 6:38 PM
REPLY BRIEF to29 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand Under 28 USC Section 1367 filed by Karen Devin, Richard Hardy, II, Amelia Long, Tabitha Marcum, Karen Sansom. (Richards, E.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
34 34 respm Response to Motion Wed 12/16 6:26 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re29 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Karen Devin, Richard Hardy, II, Amelia Long, Tabitha Marcum, Karen Sansom for lack of supplemental jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. Section 1367 filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky Department of Revenue. (Connell, Raymond)
Related: [-]
33 33 respm Response to Motion Wed 12/16 4:13 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re29 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Karen Devin, Richard Hardy, II, Amelia Long, Tabitha Marcum, Karen Sansom for lack of supplemental jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. Section 1367 filed by Penny Cox, University of Kentucky.(Morgan, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1. May 5, 2020 Email Chain
Saturday, December 12, 2020
32 32 notice Notice of Filing Sat 12/12 10:03 AM
NOTICE OF FILING by Karen Devin, Richard Hardy, II, Amelia Long, Tabitha Marcum, Karen Sansom re29 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Karen Devin, Richard Hardy, II, Amelia Long, Tabitha Marcum, Karen Sansom for lack of supplemental jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. Section 1367 of Corrected Exhibit 1(Richards, E.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Corrected) - Plaintiffs' Requests for Production to University
Monday, December 07, 2020
notice Notice of Docket Modification Mon 12/07 8:51 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Raymond Connell re31 REPLY. ***Error: a link was created to the Response instead of the Motion; Entry by attorney; Clerk modified the entry to create a link to the Motion, thereby placing the reply on the Judges motion report. In the future, create a link to the subject motion. The appropriate event is Reply to Response to Motion. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (CBD)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Mon 12/07 8:53 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re6 FIRST MOTION for Partial Dismissal by Commonwealth of Kentucky Department of Revenue ,8 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Penny Cox, University of Kentucky Motion for Partial Dismissal (CBD)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 04, 2020
31 31 respoth Reply Fri 12/04 10:21 PM
REPLY to26 filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky Department of Revenue. (Connell, Raymond)
Related: [-]
30 30 respoth Reply Fri 12/04 3:45 PM
REPLY to8 in Support of University Defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal filed by Penny Cox, University of Kentucky.(Beauman, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1. Email Chain
Wednesday, November 25, 2020
29 29 motion Remand to State Court Wed 11/25 6:23 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Karen Devin, Richard Hardy, II, Amelia Long, Tabitha Marcum, Karen Sansom for lack of supplemental jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. Section 1367(Richards, E.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs Request for Production of Documents to the University,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Beauman email to Richards, May 5, 2020,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Monday, November 23, 2020
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/23 10:33 AM
ORDER: 1. The Defendant's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice [R.25 ] is GRANTED; 2. W. Michael Hamilton is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Defendants in the above styled action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 11/23/2020. (JJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2020
27 27 respm Response to Motion Fri 11/20 9:42 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re8 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Penny Cox, University of Kentucky Motion for Partial Dismissal filed by Karen Devin, Richard Hardy, II, Amelia Long, Tabitha Marcum, Karen Sansom. (Richards, E.)
Related: [-]
26 26 respm Response to Motion Fri 11/20 9:41 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re6 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss by Commonwealth of Kentucky Department of Revenue filed by Karen Devin, Richard Hardy, II, Amelia Long, Tabitha Marcum, Karen Sansom. (Richards, E.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 18, 2020
misc Bar Status Check Wed 11/18 9:05 AM
BAR STATUS Check completed as to William Michael Hamilton re25 SECOND MOTION for W. Michael Hamilton to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karen Devin, Richard Hardy, II, Amelia Long, Tabitha Marcum, Karen Sansom ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4830227). (JJ)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Wed 11/18 9:06 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re25 SECOND MOTION for W. Michael Hamilton to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karen Devin, Richard Hardy, II, Amelia Long, Tabitha Marcum, Karen Sansom ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4830227) (JJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
25 25 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/17 5:49 PM
SECOND MOTION for W. Michael Hamilton to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karen Devin, Richard Hardy, II, Amelia Long, Tabitha Marcum, Karen Sansom ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4830227)(Richards, E.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, Tennessee Supreme Court,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, November 16, 2020
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/16 4:48 PM
ORDER: 1. The Defendants Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of W. Michael Hamilton22 is DENIEDWITHOUT PREJUDICE. 2. W. Michael Hamilton shall re-submit his Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice when he has received his certificate of good standing.. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 11/16/2020. (CBD)
Related: [-]
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/16 4:45 PM
ORDER: 1. The Defendants Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice21 is GRANTED; 2. Guy G. Fisher is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Defendants. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 11/16/2020. (CBD)
Related: [-]
misc Bar Status Check Mon 11/16 9:27 AM
BAR STATUS Check completed as to William Michael Hamilton, Guy G. Fisher re22 MOTION for W. Michael Hamilton to Appear Pro Hac Vice,21 MOTION for Guy G. Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (CBD)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Mon 11/16 9:29 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re22 MOTION for W. Michael Hamilton to Appear Pro Hac Vice,21 MOTION for Guy G. Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CBD)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 13, 2020
22 22 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/13 12:18 PM
MOTION for W. Michael Hamilton to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karen Devin, Richard Hardy, II, Amelia Long, Tabitha Marcum, Karen Sansom ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4826691)(Richards, E.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
21 21 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/13 11:30 AM
MOTION for Guy G. Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karen Devin, Richard Hardy, II, Amelia Long, Tabitha Marcum, Karen Sansom ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4826540)(Richards, E.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, State Bar of Texas,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, October 30, 2020
20 20 14 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Terminate Motions Fri 10/30 10:16 AM
ORDER: 1. Plaintiff's13 MOTION to Remand is DENIED; 2. Plaintiff's request for an award of attorney's fees and costs [R.13 ] is DENIED; 3. Plaintiffs shall RESPOND to the following Motions within 21 days: a. Defendant Commonwealth of Kentucky Department of Revenue's Motion for Partial Dismissal [R.6 ] b. Defendant University of Kentucky's Motion for Partial Dismissal [R.8 ]. Defendants are then ordered to REPLY to Plaintiff's responses. 4. Plaintiffs' deadline to MOVE for PHV admission is 14 days after the entrance of this order. 5. Plaintiff's deadline to file responsive pleading to Defendant University of Kentucky's Counterclaim [R.4 ] remains CONTINUED GENERALLY. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 10/29/2020.(JJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 08, 2020
utility Motion Submitted Wed 07/08 9:37 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re13 MOTION to Remand by Karen Devin, Richard Hardy, II, Amelia Long, Tabitha Marcum, Karen Sansom to Franklin Circuit Court (CBD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 07, 2020
19 19 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 07/07 5:14 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re13 MOTION to Remand by Karen Devin, Richard Hardy, II, Amelia Long, Tabitha Marcum, Karen Sansom to Franklin Circuit Court filed by Karen Devin, Richard Hardy, II, Amelia Long, Tabitha Marcum, Karen Sansom. (Richards, E.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2020
18 18 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 06/23 9:12 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re13 MOTION to Remand by Karen Devin, Richard Hardy, II, Amelia Long, Tabitha Marcum, Karen Sansom to Franklin Circuit Court filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky Department of Revenue.(Connell, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
17 17 respm Response to Motion Tue 06/23 1:47 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re13 MOTION to Remand by Karen Devin, Richard Hardy, II, Amelia Long, Tabitha Marcum, Karen Sansom to Franklin Circuit Court filed by Penny Cox, University of Kentucky.(Beauman, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to Response to Motion to Remand 5 5-2020 Email Chain,
Att: 2 Proposed Order to Motion to Remand
Thursday, June 18, 2020
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 06/18 4:21 PM
ORDER: 1)14 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. 2) Following deadlines are CONTINUED GENERALLY pending resolution of Plas'13 Motion to Remand, a. Plas' deadline to file responsive pleading to Dft University of Kentuckys Counterclaim4 ; b. Plas' deadline to file a Response to the Motion for Partial Dismissal6 ; c. Plas' deadline to file a Response to the Motion for Partial Dismissal8 ; d. Plas' deadline to move for admission pro hac vice of attorneys W. Michael Hamilton11 and Guy Fisher10 . 3) In the event Plas' Motion to Remand13 is denied, a separate order will issue setting briefing schedule for the foregoing motions. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 6/18/2020. (SCD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
utility Motion Submitted Tue 06/09 8:46 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re14 MOTION for Extension of Time by Karen Devin, Richard Hardy, II, Amelia Long, Tabitha Marcum, Karen Sansom to file responses to Counterclaim and Motions to Dismiss, and to file pro hac vice materials (CBD)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2020
15 15 respoth Response Mon 06/08 5:13 PM
RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time filed by Penny Cox, University of Kentucky. (Morgan, Donald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 03, 2020
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Wed 06/03 9:12 AM
Attorney Update. Attorney Philip Barrett Block for Karen Devin,Philip Barrett Block for Karen Devin,Philip Barrett Block for Richard Hardy, II,Philip Barrett Block for Richard Hardy, II,Philip Barrett Block for Amelia Long,Philip Barrett Block for Amelia Long,Philip Barrett Block for Tabitha Marcum,Philip Barrett Block for Tabitha Marcum,Philip Barrett Block for Karen Sansom,Philip Barrett Block for Karen Sansom,Philip Barrett Block for Sherrie Turner,Philip Barrett Block for Sherrie Turner added. (CBD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
14 14 motion Extension of Time Tue 06/02 6:21 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time by Karen Devin, Richard Hardy, II, Amelia Long, Tabitha Marcum, Karen Sansom to file responses to Counterclaim and Motions to Dismiss, and to file pro hac vice materials(Richards, E.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
13 13 motion Remand Tue 06/02 6:17 PM
MOTION to Remand by Karen Devin, Richard Hardy, II, Amelia Long, Tabitha Marcum, Karen Sansom to Franklin Circuit Court(Richards, E.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, June 01, 2020
12 12 notice Notice of Filing Mon 06/01 9:58 PM
NOTICE OF FILING by Karen Devin, Richard Hardy, II, Amelia Long, Tabitha Marcum, Karen Sansom re9 Order, of Compliance with Court's Order on refiling state-court motions (Richards, E.)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 22, 2020
11 11 notice Attorney Notice Fri 05/22 3:59 PM
NOTICE TO ATTORNEY William Michael Hamilton by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application(CBD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 ECF Registration Form,
Att: 2 Attorney Admission Packet,
Att: 3 PHV Info,
Att: 4 Data Sheet
10 10 notice Attorney Notice Fri 05/22 3:57 PM
NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Guy Fisher by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application(CBD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 ECF Registration Form,
Att: 2 Attorney Admission Packet,
Att: 3 PHV Info,
Att: 4 Data Sheet
Thursday, May 21, 2020
9 9 1 pgs order Order Thu 05/21 5:03 PM
ORDER: It is ordered that the parties SHALL REFILE motions pending in state court at the time of removal which require a ruling from this Court, if any, w/in 10 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 5/21/2020.(SCD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 20, 2020
utility Motion Submitted Wed 05/20 2:55 PM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re MOTION for Declaratory Judgment Filed as part of the State Court Record (R. 1 -3 at page 463) (CBD) (CBD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 13, 2020
8 8 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 05/13 5:30 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Penny Cox, University of Kentucky Motion for Partial Dismissal(Morgan, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Opinion & Order Moore v. Univ. of Kentucky,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 12, 2020
7 7 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 05/12 10:50 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint, by Allison Ball.(Friend, Noah)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Dismiss Tue 05/12 8:06 PM
FIRST MOTION to Dismiss by Commonwealth of Kentucky Department of Revenue(Connell, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
5 5 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 05/12 7:57 PM
FIRST ANSWER to Amended Complaint, by Commonwealth of Kentucky Department of Revenue.(Connell, Raymond)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim Tue 05/12 4:32 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Karen Sansom by Penny Cox, University of Kentucky.(Beauman, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
misc Conflict Check Wed 05/06 10:58 AM
Conflict Check run. (CBD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 05, 2020
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Wed 05/06 10:56 AM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Penny Cox, University of Kentucky. (CBD)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 05/06 10:55 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-627( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4662086), filed by Penny Cox, University of Kentucky.(CBD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Exhibit B. Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit C. State Case No. 18-CI-627 Pleadings,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
motion Dismiss Wed 05/06 11:00 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Commonwealth of Kentucky Department of Revenue Filed as part of the State Court Record (R. 1 -3 at page 53) (CBD)
Related: [-]
motion Dismiss Wed 05/06 11:02 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Penny Cox, University of Kentucky Filed as part of the State Court Record (R. 1 -3 at page 72) (CBD)
Related: [-]
respm Response to Motion Wed 05/06 11:04 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re MOTION to Dismiss by Penny Cox, University of Kentucky, MOTION to Dismiss by Commonwealth of Kentucky Department of Revenue filed by Karen Devin, Richard Hardy, II, Amelia Long, Tabitha Marcum, Karen Sansom, Sherrie Turner. Filed as part of the State Court Record (R. 1 -3 at page 233) (CBD)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Wed 05/06 11:07 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Karen Devin, Richard Hardy, II, Amelia Long, Tabitha Marcum, Sherrie Turner by Penny Cox, University of Kentucky. Filed as part of the State Court Record (R. 1 -3 at page 418) (CBD)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Counterclaim Wed 05/06 11:09 AM
ANSWER to Counterclaim, by Karen Devin, Richard Hardy, II, Amelia Long, Tabitha Marcum, Sherrie Turner. Filed as part of the State Court Record (R. 1 -3 at page 453) (CBD)
Related: [-]
motion Declaratory Judgment Wed 05/06 11:11 AM
MOTION for Declaratory Judgment by Karen Devin, Richard Hardy, II, Amelia Long, Tabitha Marcum, Karen Sansom, Sherrie Turner Filed as part of the State Court Record (R. 1 -3 at page 463) (CBD)
Related: [-]
respm Response to Motion Wed 05/06 11:13 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re MOTION for Declaratory Judgment filed by Allison Ball, University of Kentucky. Filed as part of the State Court Record (R. 1 -3 at page 499 and 561) (CBD)
Related: [-]
respm Response to Motion Wed 05/06 11:14 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re MOTION for Declaratory Judgment filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky Department of Revenue. Filed as part of the State Court Record (R. 1 -3 at page 511) (CBD)
Related: [-]
respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 05/06 11:15 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re MOTION for Declaratory Judgment filed by Karen Devin, Richard Hardy, II, Amelia Long, Tabitha Marcum, Karen Sansom, Sherrie Turner. Filed as part of the State Court Record (R. 1 -3 at page 587) (CBD)
Related: [-]
cmp Amended Complaint Wed 05/06 11:17 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allison Ball, Commonwealth of Kentucky Department of Revenue, Penny Cox, University of Kentucky, filed by Tabitha Marcum, Amelia Long, Karen Devin, Karen Sansom, Sherrie Turner, Richard Hardy, II. Filed as part of the State Court Record (R. 1 -3 at page 604) (CBD)
Related: [-]