Oregon District Court
Case #: 3:20-cr-00144
Case Filed:May 05, 2020
Last checked: Thursday May 07, 2020 12:24 AM PDT
Defendant
Zacharias Adrian Cavasos (1)
Represented By
Thomas Eugene Price
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jennifer J. Martin
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2020 12:29 AM PDT
Thursday, March 12, 2020
1 1 Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman as to Zacharias Adrian Cavasos (1) (sss) Modified to unseal per Order on Oral Motion on 3/13/2020 (sss). [3:20-mj-00048]
Related: [-]
3 3 Motion to Seal Complaint and Arrest Warrant filed by USA as to Defendant Zacharias Adrian Cavasos. (sss) [3:20-mj-00048]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER Granting3 Motion to Seal Complaint and Arrest Warrant as to Zacharias Adrian Cavasos (1) Signed on 3/12/2020 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (sss) [3:20-mj-00048]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 13, 2020
5 5 Minutes of Proceedings: First Appearance on Complaint held before Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman as to Zacharias Adrian Cavasos (USM #81857-065) on 3/13/2020. ORDER granting the Government's oral motion to unseal the case. ORDER appointing counsel: Thomas E. Price for Zacharias Adrian Cavasos. Defendant advised of rights. Defendant waives reading of the Complaint and waives preliminary hearing. Defendant proceeds as named. Defendant does not seek release and is detained for risk of non-appearance and as a danger to the community. Defendant may seek review of detention at a later date. Arraignment is set for 4/9/2020 at 01:30 PM in Portland before the duty magistrate judge. Counsel Present for the Government: Jennifer J. Martin. Counsel Present for Defendant: Michelle M. Sweet for Thomas E. Price. Restraint Order: NR. (Court Reporter Ryan White) (gw) [3:20-mj-00048]
Related: [-]
6 6 Order of Detention as to Defendant Zacharias Adrian Cavasos (USM #81857-065). Signed on 3/13/2020 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw) [3:20-mj-00048]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 16, 2020
7 7 Request for Discovery by Zacharias Adrian Cavasos (Price, Thomas) [3:20-mj-00048]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 17, 2020
8 8 Unopposed Motion for Excludable Delay filed by USA as to Defendant Zacharias Adrian Cavasos. (Martin, Jennifer) [3:20-mj-00048]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 19, 2020
9 9 Objections to8 by Zacharias Adrian Cavasos (captioned as Withdrawal of Limited Speedy Trial Waiver and Objection to Continuance of Arraignment) (Price, Thomas) [3:20-mj-00048]
Related: [-]
10 10 Unopposed Motion for Protective Order filed by USA as to Defendant Zacharias Adrian Cavasos. (Martin, Jennifer) [3:20-mj-00048]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER: Granting8 Motion for Excludable Delay as to Zacharias Adrian Cavasos (1). Ordered on 3/19/2020 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw) [3:20-mj-00048]
Related: [-]
12 12 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Granting10 Motion for Protective Order as to Zacharias Adrian Cavasos (1). Signed on 3/19/2020 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw) [3:20-mj-00048]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 23, 2020
13 13 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 3/13/2020 as to Zacharias Adrian Cavasos. (sss) [3:20-mj-00048]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 02, 2020
14 14 SCHEDULING ORDER as to Zacharias Adrian Cavasos (USM #81857-065): In light of the Order (ECF No. 11) granting the Government's Unopposed Motion to Suspend Speedy Trial Clock (ECF No.8 ), the arraignment previously set for 4/9/2020 at 1:30 PM in Portland before the duty magistrate judge is CANCELED and will be reset at a later date. Ordered on 4/2/2020 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw) [3:20-mj-00048]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 30, 2020
15 15 Motion for Release from Custody by Defendant Zacharias Adrian Cavasos. (Price, Thomas) [3:20-mj-00048]
Related: [-]
16 16 Scheduling Order as to Zacharias Adrian Cavasos (USM # 81857-065) - The Government is to file a response to Defendant's Motion for Release from Custody15 by 5/4/2020. Review of Detention Hearing SET for Wednesday, May 6, 2020 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 14B before the duty magistrate judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (pjg) [3:20-mj-00048]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 04, 2020
17 17 8 pgs Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by USA as to Zacharias Adrian Cavasos regarding Motion for Release from Custody 15 filed by Defendant Zacharias Adrian Cavasos (Martin, Jennifer) [3:20-mj-00048]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 05, 2020
18 18 Indictment Related [+] as to Zacharias Adrian Cavasos (1) count(s) 1, Sexual Abuse of a Minor. (sb)
Related: [-] dacted
19 19 Indictment Unredacted Version Filed Under Seal as to Defendant Zacharias Adrian Cavasos. (sb)
Related: [-]
20 20 Defendant Information Relative to a Criminal Case Sheet as to Defendant Zacharias Adrian Cavasos. (In accordance with Fed. R. Crim. P. 49.1 this form document containing personal data identifiers is filed under seal) . (sb)
Related: [-]
21 21 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown. (sb)
Related: [-]