Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Jon E Deguilio
Referred: Michael G Gotsch, Sr
Case #: 3:20-cv-00365
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:May 07, 2020
Terminated:Aug 18, 2020
Case in other court:Elkhart Circuit Court, 20C01-2004-PL-000076
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 03, 2020 4:03 AM EST
Defendant
Robert Weed Plywood Corporation
Represented By
Robert F Seidler
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Leeann P Simpkins
Jackson Lewis Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew R Bunner
Represented By
Jonathan R Slabaugh
Sanders Pianowski LLP
contact info
Jeremy J McDonald
Sanders Pianowski LLP
contact info
Saulo Delgado
Sanders Pianowski LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, August 18, 2020
18 18 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 08/18 10:04 AM
ORDER DISMISSING this matter with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 8/18/2020. (bas)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 10, 2020
17 17 motion Stipulation to Dismiss Mon 08/10 11:59 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Plaintiff Matthew R Bunner. (Delgado, Saulo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 30, 2020
16 16 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 07/30 9:14 AM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS the15 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Dismissal Papers. Dismissal Papers due by 8/12/2020. Text only entry by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 7/30/2020. (jss)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 29, 2020
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 07/29 4:51 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dismissal Papers by Defendant Robert Weed Plywood Corporation. (Seidler, Robert)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order Wed 07/29 1:25 PM
ORDER : The parties advised the Court that the matter has settled, and the Court set the deadline for filing dismissal papers for 7/27/2020. The deadline has passed, and the dismissal papers been not filed, nor have the parties requested an extension of the deadline. The Court ORDERS the dismissal papers to be filed INSTANTER. Text only entry by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 7/29/2020. (jss)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 25, 2020
13 13 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 06/25 12:21 PM
ORDER: The parties have notified the court that they are in the process of finalizing a settlement. Therefore, the Court SETS the deadline for filing dismissal Papers for by 7/27/2020. The 6/25/2020 answer deadline is VACATED. Text only entry by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 6/25/2020. (jss)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 18, 2020
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 06/18 10:39 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Robert Weed Plywood Corporation answer due 6/25/2020. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 6/18/20. (slm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 17, 2020
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 06/17 2:35 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer [Unopposed] by Defendant Robert Weed Plywood Corporation. (Seidler, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 12, 2020
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 06/12 1:17 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Robert Weed Plywood Corporation answer due 6/18/2020. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 6/12/20. (slm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 11, 2020
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 06/11 2:22 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer [Unopposed] by Defendant Robert Weed Plywood Corporation. (Seidler, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2020
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/29 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy J McDonald on behalf of Matthew R Bunner (McDonald, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/29 9:23 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan R Slabaugh on behalf of Matthew R Bunner (Slabaugh, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 12, 2020
6 6 notice Agreed Notice to Extend Time to File Answer Tue 05/12 12:08 PM
AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Robert Weed Plywood Corporation ; answer due by June 11, 2020. (Seidler, Robert)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 05/13 11:54 AM
Set Deadline per6 Agreed Notice. Defendant Robert Weed Plywood Corporation answer due by 6/11/2020. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 08, 2020
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 05/08 12:44 PM
Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. NEW CASE. (jat)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2020
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/07 10:42 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Robert Weed Plywood Corporation. (Seidler, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/07 10:38 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Leeann P Simpkins on behalf of Robert Weed Plywood Corporation (Simpkins, Leeann)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/07 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F Seidler on behalf of Robert Weed Plywood Corporation (Seidler, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 05/07 10:25 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4219461.) from Elkhart Circuit Court, Cause No. 20C01-2004-PL-000076, filed by Robert Weed Plywood Corporation.(Seidler, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 12 pgs Exhibit A. State Court Summons and Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B. Additional State Court Filings
Friday, April 03, 2020
5 5 cmp State Court Complaint Fri 05/08 12:43 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Robert Weed Plywood Corporation, filed in Elkhart Circuit Court by Matthew R Bunner. (jat)
Related: [-]