Member Case
Lead case is: 4:20-bk-32519

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David R Jones
Case #: 4:20-bk-32513
Case Filed:May 07, 2020
Terminated:Mar 30, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50,001-100,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Bergdorf Goodman Inc.
745 5th Ave
New York, NY 10151-0099
Represented By
Matthew D Cavenaugh
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


Docket last updated: 2 minutes ago
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
9 9 court Entry Fri 10/01 1:18 PM
An order has been entered in this case directing that all further reporting concerning the administration of the assets and liabilities in this case will occur only in the case of Neiman Marcus Group LTD LLC, Case No. 20-32519 The docket in Case No. 20-32519 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (emiller)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Final Decree (No Form) Fri 10/01 1:16 PM
Final Decree Closing Certain of the Chapter 11 Cases Signed on 3/30/2021 (emiller)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
7 7 claims Withdrawal of Claim Wed 09/23 12:32 PM
Withdrawal of Claim: 22 by North Carolina Dept. of Revenue (sgue)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 12, 2020
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Creditors) Wed 08/12 10:16 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by American Express Travel Related Services Co, Inc (Bharatia, Shraddha)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 10, 2020
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 05/10 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/10/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings
Saturday, May 09, 2020
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/09 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/09/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order for Joint Administration
Friday, May 08, 2020
order Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists Fri 05/08 6:00 AM
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2020
1 1 77 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Thu 05/07 9:55 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Bergdorf Goodman Inc.. (Cavenaugh, Matthew)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Thu 05/07 1:18 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 20-32513 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22100349. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]