The NMG Subsidiary LLC Jointly Administered under 20-32519.
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:20-bk-32519
Lead case is: 4:20-bk-32519
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:20-bk-32516 |
Case Filed: | May 07, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 30, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50,001-100,000 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
The NMG Subsidiary LLC
One Marcus Square 1618 Main Street
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago |
Tuesday, March 30, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
court
Entry
Fri 10/01 2:38 PM
An order has been entered in this case directing that all further reporting concerning the administration of the assets and liabilities in this case will occur only in the case of Neiman Marcus Group LTD LLC, Case No. 20-32519 The docket in Case No. 20-32519 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (emiller) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Final Decree Closing Certain of the Chapter 11 Cases Signed on 3/30/2021 (emiller) |
|
Sunday, May 10, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/10/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Saturday, May 09, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/09/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, May 08, 2020 | ||
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists
Fri 05/08 6:00 AM
|
||
Thursday, May 07, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by The NMG Subsidiary LLC. (Wertz, Jennifer) |
|
court
Case Reassigned
Thu 05/07 11:56 AM
Judge David R Jones added to case. Involvement of Judge Marvin Isgur Terminated (aalo) |
||
crditcrd
none
Thu 05/07 1:20 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 20-32516 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22100357. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |