Colorado District Court
Judge:Lewis T Babcock
Case #: 1:20-cv-01297
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:May 07, 2020
Terminated:Nov 30, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 03, 2020 1:16 AM MST
Defendant
Superior Precision Sheet Metal Corp.
Represented By
Patrick John Miller
Sherman & Howard Llc-Denver
contact info
Dana M. Svendsen
Sherman & Howard Llc-Denver
contact info
Plaintiff
Annesha R Guyette
Represented By
Gary M. Kramer
Gary Kramer Law, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Monday, November 30, 2020
24 24 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 11/30 10:48 AM
ORDER: Pursuant to the Joint Notice of Settlement and Stipulated Notice of Dismissal23 , this matter shall be dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own fees and costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/30/2020. (ebuch)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 25, 2020
23 23 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Wed 11/25 2:19 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Annesha R Guyette (Kramer, Gary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
22 22 2 pgs order Order Wed 10/07 8:53 AM
ORDER re:21 Scheduling Order, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/6/2020. (jgonz, )
Related: [-]
21 21 order Scheduling Order Wed 10/07 8:52 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/6/2020. Discovery due by 7/16/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 8/30/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/11/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. (jgonz, )
Related: [-]
20 20 order Protective Order Tue 10/06 4:27 PM
STUPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/6/2020. (jgonz, )
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 10/06 2:07 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting13 Motion for Protective Order. The proposed protective order will be entered. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/6/2020. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
Related: [-]
18 18 order Memorandum Tue 10/06 1:49 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding13 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order filed by Superior Precision Sheet Metal Corp. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/6/2020. Text Only Entry (ebuch)
Related: [-]
17 17 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 10/06 1:47 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/6/2020. (ebuch)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Letter Reassigning Case Tue 10/06 8:39 AM
CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to15 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-01297-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 05, 2020
15 15 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Mon 10/05 4:20 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Annesha R Guyette All parties do not consent.. (Kramer, Gary)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 10/05 4:19 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Annesha R Guyette. (Kramer, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 01, 2020
13 13 motion Protective Order Thu 10/01 3:08 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Superior Precision Sheet Metal Corp..(Svendsen, Dana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - (Proposed) Stipulated Protective Order
Monday, September 21, 2020
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/21 12:21 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Superior Precision Sheet Metal Corp..(Svendsen, Dana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 26, 2020
11 11 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 08/26 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Dana M. Svendsen on behalf of Superior Precision Sheet Metal Corp.Attorney Dana M. Svendsen added to party Superior Precision Sheet Metal Corp.(pty:dft) (Svendsen, Dana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 11, 2020
10 10 3 pgs order Order Tue 08/11 4:25 PM
ORDER Setting Initial Case Deadlines, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/11/2020. Consent Form due by 10/5/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/5/2020. (jgonz, )
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order Tue 08/11 9:44 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for August 31, 2020, is vacated. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/11/2020. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 ) Modified on 8/11/2020 top correct docket text (jgonz, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2020
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 08/07 2:57 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Miller, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 06, 2020
7 7 notice Notice of Case Association Thu 08/06 3:35 PM
NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Patrick John Miller on behalf of Superior Precision Sheet Metal Corp. (Miller, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 24, 2020
6 6 service Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Fri 07/24 11:59 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Annesha R Guyette. Superior Precision Sheet Metal Corp. waiver sent on 7/24/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (Kramer, Gary)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 29, 2020
5 5 4 pgs order Order Mon 06/29 2:14 PM
AMENDED ORDER SETTING Scheduling Conference for 8/31/2020 09:45 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 8/24/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/29/2020. (ksena)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 13, 2020
4 4 4 pgs order Order Wed 05/13 3:28 PM
ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 7/13/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 7/6/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/13/2020. (ksena)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2020
3 3 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Fri 05/08 10:13 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (alave, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Fri 05/08 10:11 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/07 4:59 PM
COMPLAINT against Superior Precision Sheet Metal Corp., dba Micro Metals, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7286417)Attorney Gary M. Kramer added to party Annesha R Guyette(pty:pla), filed by Annesha R Guyette.(Kramer, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet