Arkansas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Bianca M Rucker
Case #: 2:14-bk-71315
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Sep 18, 2015
Claims Deadline:Dec 23, 2015
Converted:Jul 23, 2015
Terminated:Jan 03, 2022
Discharge Objection Deadline:Aug 05, 2014

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Acme Holding Company, Inc.
PO Box A
Mulberry, AR 72947-0480
Represented By
Stanley V Bond
Attorney At Law
contact info
Johnathan Dwaine Horton
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
R. Ray Fulmer, II
Chapter 7 Panel Trustee P.O. Box 185
Fort Smith, AR 72902
Represented By
R Ray Fulmer, II
Ledbetter, Cogbill, Arnold & Harrison, L
contact info
James E. Smith, Jr.
Williams & Anderson, PLC
contact info
Stanley V Bond
Attorney At Law
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee (ust)
Office Of U. S. Trustee 200 W Capitol, Ste. 1200
Little Rock, AR 72201

GPO Jul 23 2015
Order and Memorandum Opinion Converting Case to Chapter 7(RE: related document(s) 74 Disclosure Statement Filed by Stanley V Bond on behalf of Debtor Acme Holding Company, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Plan of Reorganization # 2 Appendix to Disclosure Statement # 3 Notice of Opportunity to Object) filed by Debtor Acme Holding Company, Inc., 77 Objection to ADEQUACY OF DEBTOR'S DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (RE: related document(s)74 Disclosure Statement Filed by Stanley V Bond on behalf of Debtor Acme Holding Company, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Plan of Reorganization # 2 Appendix to Disclosure Statement # 3 Notice of Opportunity to Object) filed by Debtor Acme Holding Company, Inc.) Filed by James Paul Beachboard on behalf of Creditor Chambers Bank filed by Creditor Chambers Bank, 78 Objection to (RE: related document(s)74 Disclosure Statement Filed by Stanley V Bond on behalf of Debtor Acme Holding Company, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Plan of Reorganization # 2 Appendix to Disclosure Statement # 3 Notice of Opportunity to Object) filed by Debtor Acme Holding Company, Inc.) Filed by Charles S. Trantham on behalf of Creditor C Holdings, LLC filed by Creditor C Holdings, LLC, 83 Joinder in Objection to Disclosure Statement (Redocketed to reflect document filed #82) (RE: related document(s)74 Disclosure Statement Filed by Stanley V Bond on behalf of Debtor Acme Holding Company, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Plan of Reorganization # 2 Appendix to Disclosure Statement # 3 Notice of Opportunity to Object) filed by Debtor Acme Holding Company, Inc.) Filed by Rex M. Terry on behalf of Creditors Hildene Asset Management, LLC, Hildene Opportunities Master Fund, Ltd. (Williams, Lisa) Modified on 11/24/2014 . filed by Creditor Hildene Asset Management, LLC, Creditor Hildene Opportunities Master Fund, Ltd., 86 Motion to Dismiss Case or in the Alternative to Convert to Chapter 7 Filed by James Paul Beachboard on behalf of Chambers Bank filed by Creditor Chambers Bank, 92 Motion to Convert Chapter 11 to Chapter 7 Joinder of Motion filed by Chambers Bank (Doc. #86). Filed by Rex M. Terry on behalf of Hildene Asset Management, LLC, Hildene Opportunities Master Fund, Ltd. filed by Creditor Hildene Asset Management, LLC, Creditor Hildene Opportunities Master Fund, Ltd., 94 Motion to Convert Chapter 11 to Chapter 7 Joinder of Motion filed by Chambers Bank (Doc. #86). Filed by Charles S. Trantham on behalf of C Holdings, LLC filed by Creditor C Holdings, LLC, 97 Amended Disclosure Statement Filed by Stanley V Bond on behalf of Debtor Acme Holding Company, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix # 2 NOOTO) filed by Debtor Acme Holding Company, Inc., 107 Objection to Adequacy of (RE: related document(s)97 Amended Disclosure Statement Filed by Stanley V Bond on behalf of Debtor Acme Holding Company, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix # 2 NOOTO) filed by Debtor Acme Holding Company, Inc.) Filed by James Paul Beachboard on behalf of Creditor Chambers Bank filed by Creditor Chambers Bank, 109 Objection to Joinder of Hildene Asset Management, LLC and Hildene Opportunities Master Fund, Limited in Chambers Bank's Objection to Amended Disclosure Statement (RE: related document(s)97 Amended Disclosure Statement Filed by Stanley V Bond on behalf of Debtor Acme Holding Company, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix # 2 NOOTO) filed by Debtor Acme Holding Company, Inc.) Filed by Ethan Andrew Brecher, Rex M. Terry on behalf of Creditors Hildene Asset Management, LLC, Hildene Opportunities Master Fund, Ltd. filed by Creditor Hildene Asset Management, LLC, Creditor Hildene Opportunities Master Fund, Ltd., 110 C Holdings, LLC Joinder in Objection to Amended Disclosure Statement (RE: related document(s)97 Amended Disclosure Statement Filed by Stanley V Bond on behalf of Debtor Acme Holding Company, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix # 2 NOOTO) filed by Debtor Acme Holding Company, Inc.) Filed by Charles S. Trantham on behalf of Creditor C Holdings, LLC (Trantham, Charles) Modified text on 1/28/2015 . filed by Creditor C Holdings, LLC, 116 Amended Motion to Dismiss Case or in the Alternative to Convert to Chapter 7 Filed by James Paul Beachboard on behalf of Chambers Bank filed by Creditor Chambers Bank, 120 Miscellaneous Document Supplement to Amended Disclosure Statement (RE: related document(s) 97 Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor Acme Holding Company, Inc.) filed by Stanley V Bond Debtor Acme Holding Company, Inc.. filed by Debtor Acme Holding Company, Inc., 121 Correspondence Document re: Hearings on Motions to Dimiss/Convert filed by Stanley V Bond Debtor Acme Holding Company, Inc.. filed by Debtor Acme Holding Company, Inc.) Entered on 7/23/2015 (Mobley, Ashley)

1. Ailing bank's holdings sold off (arkansasonline.com)
Submitted Mon 07/27/2015
2. Acme Holding: No Dividends Weigh Heavily (arkansasbusiness.com)
Submitted Mon 04/27/2015
3. Bankruptcy Judge Considers Allied Bank Auction (arkansasbusiness.com)
Submitted Mon 04/13/2015
Docket last updated: 07/24/2015 7:00 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2014
1 1 7 pgs Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Fee Amount $1213 filed by Stanley V Bond of Attorney at Law on behalf of Acme Holding Company, Inc.. Disclosure Statement due by 8/27/2014. (Bond, Stanley)
Related: [-]
2 2 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/6/2014 at 11:00 AM at Fort Smith Division. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 8/5/2014. (Boyle, Cecilia)
Related: [-]
3 3 RECEIPT of Chapter11 Voluntary Petition(2:14-bk-71315) [caseupld,1105u] (1213.00) Filing Fee. receipt number 5400706, amount $1213.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]