Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher M Lopez
Case #: 4:20-bk-32564
Case Filed:May 10, 2020
Plan Confirmed:Aug 14, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors10,001-25,000
Est. Assets$500,000,001 to $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $500,000,001 to $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Stage Stores, Inc.
2425 West Loop S
Houston, TX 77027-4205
Represented By
Matthew D Cavenaugh
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Hector Duran, Jr
U.S. Trustee
contact info


1. Stage Stores Files For Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Protection (bisnow.com)
Submitted Tue 05/12/2020
2. Gordmans Parent Company Files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (44news.wevv.com)
Submitted Wed 05/13/2020
Docket last updated: 41 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
utility Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY) Wed 05/07 9:13 AM
All motions, responses, documents or other pleadings that pertain to disputes concerning Jackson Walker or former Bankruptcy Judge David Jones should be filed in District Court Case Number 4:23cv4787 (dah4)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
1291 1291 order Generic Order Tue 05/06 2:15 PM
Order Referring Various Matters to Judge Lopez signed by Chief Judge Alia Moses on 5/6/2025 (dah4)
Related: [-]