New Jersey District Court
Judge:Esther Salas
Referred: Michael A Hammer
Case #: 2:20-cv-05804
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (
Case Filed:May 12, 2020
Re-opened:May 19, 2022
Terminated:May 19, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Nov 08, 2020 4:02 AM EST
Defendant
HORWITH TRUCK, INC.
Represented By
ANDREW S. TURKISH
Clausen Miller
contact info
CARL M. PERRI, JR.
Clausen Miller
contact info
Defendant
L.V. COMPANY INC.
Represented By
ANDREW S. TURKISH
Clausen Miller
contact info
CARL M. PERRI, JR.
Clausen Miller
contact info
Defendant
MICHAEL T. POWERS
Represented By
ANDREW S. TURKISH
Clausen Miller
contact info
CARL M. PERRI, JR.
Clausen Miller
contact info
Notice Only
arbnwk
Plaintiff
KATHERINE WOODLEY
Represented By
LAURA A. RABB
Rabb Hamill, Pa.A
contact info
JOHN J. KANE
Martin, Kane & Kuper, Esqs.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 19, 2022
26 26 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Thu 05/19 12:47 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice, and without costs. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 5/19/2022. (mxw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2022
25 25 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Wed 05/18 10:05 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by HORWITH TRUCK, INC., L.V. COMPANY INC., MICHAEL T. POWERS. (TURKISH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
24 24 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Wed 03/30 4:28 PM
60 Day Order Administratively Terminating Action Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 5/31/2022. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 3/30/2022. (jd)
Related: [-]
minutes Settlement Conference Mon 04/04 10:01 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Settlement Conference held on 3/30/2022. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 17, 2021
order Order Fri 12/17 9:32 AM
TEXT ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 3/30/2022 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer via Zoom. In addition to and wholly separate from counsel, individual clients with full settlement authority are required to attend the conference via Zoom. Each party must submit a confidential settlement memorandum on or before 3/23/2022, limited to five (5) double-spaced pages and only those exhibits that are absolutely necessary for the conference to njdnef_hammer@njd.uscourts.gov. The Court requests that any submissions containing multiple exhibits be tabbed and sent via mail or overnight delivery. Please mark your calendar accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/17/2021. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 16, 2021
22 22 misc Letter Thu 12/16 4:15 PM
Letter from Andrew S. Turkish, Esq. re 21 Order,. (TURKISH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 13, 2021
order Order Mon 12/13 10:31 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Telephone Status Conference on 12/16/2021 is cancelled. On or before 12/17/2021, the parties shall jointly propose three dates for a Zoom settlement conference in March. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/13/2021. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 09, 2021
20 20 order Scheduling Order Thu 09/09 3:47 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/9/2021. (ams, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
19 19 misc Proposed Order Wed 09/08 1:15 PM
Proposed Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by All Defendants.(TURKISH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter
Tuesday, August 24, 2021
order Order Tue 08/24 2:50 PM
TEXT ORDER: As discussed during the August 24, 2021 telephone conference, the parties will submit a jointly proposed amended scheduling order on or before September 8, 2021.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/24/2021. (Hammer, Michael)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Fri 08/27 7:09 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Status Conference held on 8/24/2021. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 18, 2021
17 17 order Order Wed 08/18 9:28 AM
TEXT ORDER: The court has reviewed Mr. Kane's August 16, 2021 letter [D.E. 16]. Counsel's request to permit another attorney from his firm to appear at the August 24, 2021 conference is granted, as long as that counsel is reasonably informed to speak to the background and status of the case.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/18/2021. (Hammer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 17, 2021
16 16 misc Letter Tue 08/17 1:16 PM
Letter from John Kane. (KANE, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 24, 2021
15 15 order Scheduling Order Mon 05/24 1:03 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for at 8/24/2021 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Fact discovery shall remain open through 7/31/2021, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/24/2021. (ams, )
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Fri 06/04 11:22 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Status Conference held on 5/24/2021. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 21, 2021
14 14 order Order Fri 05/21 8:17 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Telephone Status Conference on 5/24/2021 will be held at 12:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties will dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference. Please mark your calendar accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/21/2021. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
13 13 order Scheduling Order Tue 02/09 4:30 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 5/24/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Fact discovery shall remain open through 5/31/2021, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/9/2021. (ams, )
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Tue 02/09 5:34 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 2/9/2021. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 28, 2020
12 12 order Order Wed 10/28 11:16 AM
TEXT ORDER: There will be a telephone status conference with the Undersigned on February 9, 2021 at 11:30 a.m. Counsel shall join the call by dialing 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/28/2020. (TAD)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Wed 10/28 5:30 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/28/2020. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2020
11 11 order Order Mon 10/26 2:58 PM
TEXT ORDER: Please dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the telephone conference call on 10/28/2020 at 11:00 a.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/26/2020. (TAD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 23, 2020
10 10 order Scheduling Order Thu 07/23 8:58 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 10/28/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Fact discovery shall remain open through 3/31/2021, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/23/2020. (ams, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 22, 2020
minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 07/23 6:26 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 7/22/2020. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 20, 2020
9 9 discov Joint Discovery Plan Mon 07/20 9:37 AM
Joint Discovery Plan by HORWITH TRUCK, INC., L.V. COMPANY INC., MICHAEL T. POWERS.(TURKISH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 17, 2020
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/17 1:31 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by HORWITH TRUCK, INC., L.V. COMPANY INC., MICHAEL T. POWERS.(TURKISH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/17 1:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW S. TURKISH on behalf of HORWITH TRUCK, INC., L.V. COMPANY INC., MICHAEL T. POWERS (TURKISH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 16, 2020
6 6 misc Substitution of Attorney Thu 07/16 12:16 PM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney LAURA A. RABB terminated. Attorney JOHN J. KANE for KATHERINE WOODLEY added.. (KANE, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 14, 2020
5 5 order Order Tue 07/14 10:19 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 7/20/2020 is adjourned to 7/22/2020 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 7/20/2020. Please dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference call. Defense counsel will kindly provide this notice to plaintiff's counsel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/14/2020. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2020
4 4 order Order Mon 07/13 12:06 PM
TEXT ORDER: The parties shall dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the scheduling conference call on 7/20/2020 at 11:30 a.m. Defense counsel will kindly provide this notice to plaintiff's counsel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/13/2020. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Tue 05/26 9:08 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ek)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 24, 2020
3 3 order Order Sun 05/24 7:59 PM
TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's counsel must become an e-filer by 7/16/2020. Defendants' counsel will kindly provide plaintiff's counsel with a copy of this notice. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/24/2020. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
2 2 order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Sun 05/24 7:54 PM
TEXT ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 7/20/2020 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 7/16/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/24/2020. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 12, 2020
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 05/12 4:03 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MICHAEL T. POWERS, L.V. COMPANY INC., HORWITH TRUCK, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Union County, case number UNN-L-1140-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10804521), filed by MICHAEL T. POWERS, L.V. COMPANY INC., HORWITH TRUCK, INC..(PERRI, CARL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A: State Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 05/12 4:24 PM
Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Arbitration Tue 05/12 4:25 PM
CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)
Related: [-]