Original Case: 1:14-md-02543

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:20-cv-00710
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2020
Terminated:May 11, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday May 13, 2020 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
GM Ignition Switch MDL Plaintiffs
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Robert Hilliard
Hilliard Munoz Gonzales LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Glender Atkinson, and all unfiled claimants
Represented By
Brett A. Emison
Langdon and Emison, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2020 4:27 AM EDT
Friday, February 07, 2020
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Glender Atkinson, FILED. [2787516] [20-710] [Entered: 02/26/2020 12:51 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 2349 pgs Case FILED
Att: 3 21 pgs Supporting Document
2 2 10 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, dated 11/08/2019, RECEIVED.[2787518] [20-710] [Entered: 02/26/2020 12:54 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Glender Atkinson, district court receipt # ANYSDC-18717605, FILED.[2787520] [20-710] [Entered: 02/26/2020 12:54 PM]
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2787523] [20-710] [Entered: 02/26/2020 12:56 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 2392 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED