New Jersey District Court
Judge:Claire C Cecchi
Referred: Andre M Espinosa
Case #: 2:20-cv-05832
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:May 13, 2020
Terminated:Jun 16, 2021
Last checked: Monday Nov 09, 2020 6:06 AM EST
Defendant
RALPH DANIEL, P.A.
Represented By
SHANNON M. CARROLL
Brach Eichler
contact info
KEITH J. ROBERTS
Brach Eichler LLC
contact info
Defendant
KEITH JOHNSON, M.D.
Represented By
SHANNON M. CARROLL
Brach Eichler
contact info
KEITH J. ROBERTS
Brach Eichler LLC
contact info
Defendant
SAMMY MASRI, M.D.
Represented By
SHANNON M. CARROLL
Brach Eichler
contact info
KEITH J. ROBERTS
Brach Eichler LLC
contact info
Defendant
OASIS MEDICAL AND SURGICAL WELLNESS GROUP, LLC
Represented By
SHANNON M. CARROLL
Brach Eichler
contact info
KEITH J. ROBERTS
Brach Eichler LLC
contact info
Defendant
SUJAL PATEL, M.D.
Represented By
SHANNON M. CARROLL
Brach Eichler
contact info
KEITH J. ROBERTS
Brach Eichler LLC
contact info
Defendant
SAMUEL SCHENKER, M.D.
Represented By
SHANNON M. CARROLL
Brach Eichler
contact info
KEITH J. ROBERTS
Brach Eichler LLC
contact info
Defendant
RALPH WHEELER, M.D.
Represented By
SHANNON M. CARROLL
Brach Eichler
contact info
KEITH J. ROBERTS
Brach Eichler LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
GEICO CASUALTY CO.
Represented By
GENE Y. KANG
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
MICHAEL VANUNU
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
GENE Y. KANG
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
MICHAEL VANUNU
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GEICO INDEMNITY CO.
Represented By
GENE Y. KANG
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
MICHAEL VANUNU
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.
Represented By
GENE Y. KANG
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
MICHAEL VANUNU
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 81 minutes ago
Wednesday, June 16, 2021
30 30 1 pgs order Stipulation and Order Wed 06/16 1:42 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE and without costs, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 41(a)(1). Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 6/16/2021. (ld, )
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 06/16 1:44 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
29 29 1 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Tue 06/15 1:20 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. (KANG, GENE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 06, 2021
28 28 1 pgs order Order Fri 05/07 2:50 PM
ORDER granting the parties a 30-day extension that the factual discovery deadline is extended from 5/31/2021 to 6/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 5/6/2021. (sm)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Order Thu 05/06 4:28 PM
TEXT ORDER The status conference previously scheduled for June 8, 2021 is re-scheduled. The undersigned will hold a telephone status conference on Monday, June 28, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. The parties shall file a concise status letter by June 24, 2021. To join the conference, dial 866-434-5269 and enter access code 1874589#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 5/6/2021. (mp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
26 26 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 05/04 12:29 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Letter requesting for factual discovery deadline be extended from May 31, 2021 to June 30, 2021. by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. (VANUNU, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 09, 2021
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 04/09 1:23 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel no longer assigned to the case. (krg, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 26, 2021
25 25 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 03/26 2:08 PM
TEXT ORDER: A telephone status conference is set for June 8, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. Please mark your calendars accordingly. The parties shall file a joint letter, at least three days before the conference, advising of the status of discovery and any other issues to be addressed. The Court's Case Management Order can be found[LINK:here] . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 3/26/2021. (as, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 25, 2021
minutes Status Conference Fri 03/26 2:03 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/25/2021. (Court Reporter/Recorder None.) (as, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 23, 2021
24 24 1 pgs order Order Wed 03/24 4:13 PM
ORDER granting the parties a 30-day extension of the upcoming fact discovery deadline from 4/30/2021 to 5/31/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 3/23/2021. (sm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 22, 2021
23 23 misc Letter Mon 03/22 4:29 PM
Letter from Michael Vanunu, Esq. re 22 Order,,, Set Hearings,,. (VANUNU, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 14, 2020
22 22 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 12/14 2:25 PM
TEXT ORDER: A telephone status conference is set for March 25, 2021 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and access code is 310-0383#. Please mark your calendars accordingly. The parties shall file a joint letter, at least three days before the conference, advising of the status of discovery and any other issues to be addressed. The Court's Case Management Order can be found at https://www.njd.uscourts.gov/sites/njd/files/CaseManagementOrder.pdf. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 12/14/2020. (as, )
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Mon 12/14 2:24 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/14/2020. (Court Reporter/Recorder None.) (as, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 09, 2020
21 21 misc Letter Wed 12/09 1:46 PM
Letter from Counsel for all parties jointly submit this correspondence in advance of the upcoming status conference scheduled for Monday, December 14, 2020. re18 Scheduling Order. (VANUNU, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 05, 2020
20 20 order Discovery Confidentiality Order Fri 11/06 5:30 PM
Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 11/5/2020. (sm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 28, 2020
19 19 motion Protective Order Wed 10/28 8:51 AM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order / Proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO..(VANUNU, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Michael Vanunu, Esq. in Support of proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order
Thursday, September 10, 2020
18 18 order Scheduling Order Thu 09/10 4:12 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/10/2020. (sm)
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 09/10 2:56 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 9/10/2020. (Court Reporter/Recorder None.) (as, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2020
17 17 discov Joint Discovery Plan Thu 09/03 8:46 AM
Joint Discovery Plan by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO..(VANUNU, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 27, 2020
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/27 9:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL VANUNU on behalf of GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. (VANUNU, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 27, 2020
15 15 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 07/27 4:44 PM
LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on September 10, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The Court will provide counsel with dial-in instructions. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 7/27/2020. (as, )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 24, 2020
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/24 3:17 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND and Affirmative Defenses by RALPH DANIEL, P.A., KEITH JOHNSON, M.D., SAMMY MASRI, M.D., OASIS MEDICAL AND SURGICAL WELLNESS GROUP, LLC, SUJAL PATEL, M.D., SAMUEL SCHENKER, M.D., RALPH WHEELER, M.D..(ROBERTS, KEITH)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order Fri 07/24 3:04 PM
ORDER vacating the default entered against Defendants; the time for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended until five days after the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 7/24/2020. (sm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 23, 2020
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/23 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH J. ROBERTS on behalf of RALPH DANIEL, P.A., KEITH JOHNSON, M.D., SAMMY MASRI, M.D., OASIS MEDICAL AND SURGICAL WELLNESS GROUP, LLC, SUJAL PATEL, M.D., SAMUEL SCHENKER, M.D., RALPH WHEELER, M.D. (ROBERTS, KEITH)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/23 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SHANNON M. CARROLL on behalf of RALPH DANIEL, P.A., KEITH JOHNSON, M.D., SAMMY MASRI, M.D., OASIS MEDICAL AND SURGICAL WELLNESS GROUP, LLC, SUJAL PATEL, M.D., SAMUEL SCHENKER, M.D., RALPH WHEELER, M.D. (CARROLL, SHANNON)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Letter Thu 07/23 1:34 PM
Letter from Shannon Carroll, Esq. re1 Complaint,.(CARROLL, SHANNON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent order vacating default and extending time to answer
Thursday, July 16, 2020
order Clerks Entry of Default Thu 07/16 5:05 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Oasis Medical and Surgical Wellness Group, LLC, Ralph Daniel, P.A., Keith Johnson, M.D., Sujal Patel, M.D., Sammy Masri, M.D., and Ralph Wheeler, M.D. for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (sm)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 06, 2020
9 9 misc Request for Default Mon 07/06 5:19 PM
Request for Default by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. against Oasis Medical and Surgical Wellness Group, LLC, Ralph Daniel, P.A., Keith Johnson, M.D., Sujal Patel, M.D., Sammy Masri, M.D., and Ralph Wheeler, M.D..(KANG, GENE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Entry of Default,
Att: 2 Cover Letter to Clerk of Court,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, June 24, 2020
8 8 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/24 7:14 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Barry Levy, Esq. and Max Gershenoff, Esq.; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 6/24/2020. (sm)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/24 1:29 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Barry Levy and Max Gershenoff by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO..(KANG, GENE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement,
Att: 2 Certification of Gene Y. Kang,
Att: 3 Certification of Barry Levy,
Att: 4 Certification of Max Gershenoff,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 6 Certificate of Service
Monday, June 15, 2020
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 06/15 12:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. KEITH JOHNSON, M.D. served on 5/26/2020, answer due 6/16/2020.(KANG, GENE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, June 08, 2020
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 06/08 3:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. SAMMY MASRI, M.D. served on 6/2/2020, answer due 6/23/2020; OASIS MEDICAL AND SURGICAL WELLNESS GROUP, LLC served on 6/1/2020, answer due 6/22/2020; RALPH WHEELER, M.D. served on 5/30/2020, answer due 6/22/2020.(KANG, GENE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Returned Executed on Oasis Medical and Surgical Wellness Group, LLC,
Att: 2 Summons Returned Executed on Ralph Wheeler, M.D.,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Monday, June 01, 2020
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 06/01 4:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. RALPH DANIEL, P.A. served on 5/23/2020, answer due 6/15/2020; SUJAL PATEL, M.D. served on 5/26/2020, answer due 6/16/2020.(KANG, GENE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Returned Executed on Sujal Patel, M.D.,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, May 13, 2020
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 05/13 3:29 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to RALPH DANIEL, P.A., KEITH JOHNSON, M.D., SAMMY MASRI, M.D., OASIS MEDICAL AND SURGICAL WELLNESS GROUP, LLC, SUJAL PATEL, M.D., SAMUEL SCHENKER, M.D., RALPH WHEELER, M.D.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Wed 05/13 1:12 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. identifying Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (KANG, GENE)
Related: [-]
1 1 98 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 05/13 1:07 PM
COMPLAINT against RALPH DANIEL, P.A., KEITH JOHNSON, M.D., SAMMY MASRI, M.D., OASIS MEDICAL AND SURGICAL WELLNESS GROUP, LLC, SUJAL PATEL, M.D., SAMUEL SCHENKER, M.D., RALPH WHEELER, M.D. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10809167) with JURY DEMAND, filed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO..(KANG, GENE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "1",
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/13 2:18 PM
Case assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (jr)
Related: [-]