Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:13-bk-70334

Pennsylvania Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jeffery A Deller
Case #: 7:20-ap-07013
Nature of Suit31 Bankruptcy - Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - §363(h)
Case Filed:May 12, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Clinton D. Simmons
201 Cliffside Acres Rd
Everett, PA 15537
Represented By
Clinton D. Simmons
contact info
Defendant
Joan Mellott
99 West Riverview Ave.
Englewood, FL 34223
Represented By
Joan Mellott
contact info
Defendant
Nyle Mellott
99 West Riverview Ave.
Englewood, FL 34223
Represented By
Nyle Mellott
contact info
Defendant
Sunco Enterprises, Inc.
167 Posthouse Road
Breezewood, PA 15533
Represented By
Sunco Enterprises, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Simmons Realty Co., Inc.
914 N. Spring Street
Everett, PA 15537
Represented By
Simmons Realty Co., Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Bedford County Oil Company, Inc.
914 N. Spring Street
Everett, PA 15537
Represented By
Bedford County Oil Company, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Ladonna Watters
742 Ritchie Road
Everett, PA 15537
Represented By
Ladonna Watters
contact info
Defendant
Thomas Watters
742 Ritchie Road
Everett, PA 15537
Represented By
Thomas Watters
contact info
Defendant
Estate of Loretta M. Simmons
2028 West Graceville Road
Everett, PA 15537
Represented By
Estate of Loretta M. Simmons
contact info
Defendant
Robert K. Simmons
1951 West Graceville Road
Everett, PA 15537
Represented By
Robert K. Simmons
contact info
Defendant
Donan, Inc.
215 Railroad Street
Bedford, PA 15522
Represented By
Donan, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
4355 Business 220, LLC
167 Post House Road
Breezewood, PA 15533
Represented By
4355 Business 220, LLC
contact info
Defendant
720 Lincoln Highway, LLC
167 Post House Road
Breezewood, PA 15533
Represented By
720 Lincoln Highway, LLC
contact info
Defendant
201 Jefferson Street, LLC
167 Post House Road
Breezewood, PA 15533
Represented By
201 Jefferson Street, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Attilio S. DeMarco
6408 Fairbanks Lane
Frederick, MD 21701
Represented By
Attilio S. DeMarco
contact info
Defendant
William J. Miller
107 Pine Ave.
Washington Grove, MD 20880
Represented By
William J. Miller
contact info
Defendant
Community State Bank of Orbisonia
761 Elliot Street
Orbisonia, PA 17243
Represented By
Community State Bank of Orbisonia
contact info
Plaintiff
The Estate of BG Petroleum, LLC by and through the Chapter 7 Trustee, Lisa Swope
Represented By
Matthew M. Herron
The Debt Doctors, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Sunday, March 26, 2023
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 03/27 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 03/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] :31 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Friday, March 24, 2023
31 31 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 03/24 12:47 PM
Default Order Signed on 3/24/2023 All claims against 201Jefferson Street, LLC, 720 Lincoln Highway, LLC and 4355 Business 220 LLC in AdversaryProceeding No. 20-07013 are DISMISSED as moot. Related [+]. (nsha)
Related: [-] 29
Monday, February 27, 2023
30 30 court Hearing Set G - AP Mon 02/27 9:12 AM
Order Scheduling a Hearing on Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 3/31/2023 at 11:00 AM via Zoom with Judge Deller. Responses due by 3/21/2023. (jhel)
Related: [-] :29 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant 4355 Business 220, LLC, Defendant 201 Jefferson Street, LLC, Defendant 720 Lincoln Highway, LLC
Friday, February 24, 2023
29 29 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 02/24 3:01 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding As Moot Filed by 201 Jefferson Street, LLC, 4355 Business 220, LLC, 720 Lincoln Highway, LLC (Burdette, Allison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 14, 2020
28 28 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 12/14 1:28 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Matthew HAAR Filed by on behalf of 201 Jefferson Street, LLC, 4355 Business 220, LLC, 720 Lincoln Highway, LLC. (HAAR, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 11, 2020
27 27 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 12/11 10:25 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Allison Leigh Burdette Filed by on behalf of 201 Jefferson Street, LLC, 4355 Business 220, LLC, 720 Lincoln Highway, LLC. (Burdette, Allison)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 18, 2020
26 26 misc Status Report Tue 08/18 2:13 PM
Status Report Filed by Plaintiff The Estate of BG Petroleum, LLC by and through the Chapter 7 Trustee, Lisa Swope Related [+]. (Herron, Matthew)
Related: [-] : 22 Hearing Held
Monday, July 20, 2020
25 25 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/20 8:06 PM
Answer to Complaint Miller Defendants' Response to Trustee's Motion for Authority to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens and Other Interests Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 6004 Regarding the Hearing on no hearing date scheduled. Filed by 201 Jefferson Street, LLC, 4355 Business 220, LLC, 720 Lincoln Highway, LLC, Attilio S. DeMarco, William J. Miller(Grego, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
24 24 utility Corrective Entry Mon 07/20 9:31 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT USED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED AS AN ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT USING THE EVENT FOUND UNDER ADVERSARY / ANSWERS / COMPLAINT, 3RD, CROSS, COUNTER. Related [+]. (dkam)
Related: [-] :23 Response filed by Defendant Attilio S. DeMarco, Defendant 4355 Business 220, LLC, Defendant 201 Jefferson Street, LLC, Defendant 720 Lincoln Highway, LLC, Defendant William J. Miller
Friday, July 17, 2020
23 23 answer Response Fri 07/17 3:07 PM
Response to Trustee's Motion for Authority to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens and Other Interest Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 6004 Regarding the Hearing on no hearing date scheduled. Filed by 201 Jefferson Street, LLC, 4355 Business 220, LLC, 720 Lincoln Highway, LLC, Attilio S. DeMarco, William J. Miller Related [+]. (Grego, Samuel) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT USED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED AS AN ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT USING THE EVENT FOUND UNDER ADVERSARY / ANSWERS / COMPLAINT, 3RD, CROSS, COUNTER. Modified on 7/20/2020 (dkam)
Related: [-] :1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff The Estate of BG Petroleum, LLC by and through the Chapter 7 Trustee, Lisa Swope
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Saturday, June 20, 2020
22 22 court Hearing Held - AP Sat 06/20 4:46 AM
TEXT ORDER signed by Judge Jeffery A. Deller: AND NOW, this 19th day of June, 2020, it is hereby ORDERED that all Defendants who have not answered the adversary complaint shall file their answer by no later than July 19, 2020. Failure to file an answer or otherwise defend may result in the entry of a default judgment against a non-answering Defendant. The Sale Hearing scheduled for June 26, 2020 is hereby CANCELLED, and shall be rescheduled upon application by the Chapter 7 Trustee. Within 60 days of the date of this Text Order, the Chapter 7 Trustee shall file a written status report. Related [+]. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's Order and Notice in this matter. (msch)
Related: [-] :1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff The Estate of BG Petroleum, LLC by and through the Chapter 7 Trustee, Lisa Swope
Monday, June 15, 2020
21 21 misc Certificate of Service Mon 06/15 4:03 PM
Certificate of Service Regarding the Hearing on 6/26/2020. Filed by Bedford County Oil Company, Inc., Estate of Loretta M. Simmons, Joan Mellott, Nyle Mellott, Clinton D. Simmons, Robert K. Simmons, Simmons Realty Co., Inc., Sunco Enterprises, Inc., Ladonna Watters, Thomas Watters Related [+].(Petak, Kevin)
Related: [-] :18 Response,20 Answer to Complaint, Answer to Complaint
Att: 1 Clerk's Mailing Matrix
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 06/15 3:43 PM
Answer to Complaint (filed in response to Corrective Entry) Regarding the Hearing on 06/26/20., Answer to Complaint Regarding the Hearing on 06/26/20. Filed by Bedford County Oil Company, Inc., Estate of Loretta M. Simmons, Joan Mellott, Nyle Mellott, Clinton D. Simmons, Robert K. Simmons, Simmons Realty Co., Inc., Sunco Enterprises, Inc., Ladonna Watters, Thomas Watters(Petak, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
19 19 utility Corrective Entry Mon 06/15 9:57 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT USED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED AS AN ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT USING THE EVENT FOUND UNDER ADVERSARY / ANSWERS / COMPLAINT, 3RD, CROSS, COUNTER. Related [+]. (mgut)
Related: [-] :18 Response filed by Defendant Clinton D. Simmons, Defendant Robert K. Simmons, Defendant Bedford County Oil Company, Inc., Defendant Simmons Realty Co., Inc., Defendant Sunco Enterprises, Inc., Defendant Thomas Watters, Defendant Ladonna Watters, Defendant Estate of Loretta M. Simmons, Defendant Nyle Mellott, Defendant Joan Mellott
Friday, June 12, 2020
18 18 answer Response Fri 06/12 4:33 PM
Response Regarding the Hearing on 06/26/20. Filed by Bedford County Oil Company, Inc., Estate of Loretta M. Simmons, Joan Mellott, Nyle Mellott, Clinton D. Simmons, Robert K. Simmons, Simmons Realty Co., Inc., Sunco Enterprises, Inc., Ladonna Watters, Thomas Watters Related [+]. (Petak, Kevin) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT USED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED AS AN ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT USING THE EVENT FOUND UNDER ADVERSARY / ANSWERS / COMPLAINT, 3RD, CROSS, COUNTER. Modified on 6/15/2020 (mgut)
Related: [-] :1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff The Estate of BG Petroleum, LLC by and through the Chapter 7 Trustee, Lisa Swope,3 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 28, 2020
17 17 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 05/28 10:23 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Mitchell Jay Rotbert Filed by Plaintiff The Estate of BG Petroleum, LLC by and through the Chapter 7 Trustee, Lisa Swope (Rotbert, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice
Wednesday, May 27, 2020
16 16 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/27 10:48 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Kevin J. Petak Filed by Defendant Thomas Watters (Petak, Kevin)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/27 10:45 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Kevin J. Petak Filed by Defendant Ladonna Watters (Petak, Kevin)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/27 10:42 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Kevin J. Petak Filed by Defendant Sunco Enterprises, Inc. (Petak, Kevin)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/27 10:38 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Kevin J. Petak Filed by Defendant Bedford County Oil Company, Inc. (Petak, Kevin)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/27 10:22 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Kevin J. Petak Filed by Defendant Simmons Realty Co., Inc. (Petak, Kevin)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/27 10:15 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Kevin J. Petak Filed by Defendant Robert K. Simmons (Petak, Kevin)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/27 10:11 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Kevin J. Petak Filed by Defendant Nyle Mellott (Petak, Kevin)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/27 10:07 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Kevin J. Petak Filed by Defendant Joan Mellott (Petak, Kevin)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/27 9:51 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Kevin J. Petak Filed by Defendant Estate of Loretta M. Simmons (Petak, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
7 7 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 05/26 4:39 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Kevin J. Petak Filed by Defendant Clinton D. Simmons (Petak, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 18, 2020
6 6 crditcrd none Mon 05/18 8:18 AM
Receipt of Complaint 20-07013 JAD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 15045045, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 15, 2020
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 05/15 12:35 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Nicholas A. Miller Filed by Plaintiff The Estate of BG Petroleum, LLC by and through the Chapter 7 Trustee, Lisa Swope (Miller, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 05/15 8:56 AM
Summons Service Executed on 201 Jefferson Street, LLC 5/15/2020; 4355 Business 220, LLC 5/15/2020; 720 Lincoln Highway, LLC 5/15/2020; Bedford County Oil Company, Inc. 5/15/2020; Community State Bank of Orbisonia 5/15/2020; Attilio S. DeMarco 5/15/2020; Donan, Inc. 5/15/2020; Estate of Loretta M. Simmons 5/15/2020; Joan Mellott 5/15/2020; Nyle Mellott 5/15/2020; William J. Miller 5/15/2020; Robert O Lampl Law Office 5/15/2020; Clinton D. Simmons 5/15/2020; Robert K. Simmons 5/15/2020; Simmons Realty Co., Inc. 5/15/2020; Sunco Enterprises, Inc. 5/15/2020; Ladonna Watters 5/15/2020; Thomas Watters 5/15/2020 . (Herron, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 13, 2020
3 3 court Summons Issued Wed 05/13 3:04 PM
Seventeen Summons Issued on 201 Jefferson Street, LLC Date Issued 5/13/2020, Answer Due 6/12/2020; 4355 Business 220, LLC Date Issued 5/13/2020, Answer Due 6/12/2020; 20 Lincoln Highway, LLC Date Issued 5/13/2020, Answer Due 6/12/2020; Bedford County Oil Company, Inc. Date Issued 5/13/2020, Answer Due 6/12/2020; Community State Bank of Orbisonia Date Issued 5/13/2020, Answer Due 6/12/2020; Attilio S. DeMarco Date Issued 5/13/2020, Answer Due 6/12/2020; Donan, Inc. Date Issued 5/13/2020, Answer Due 6/12/2020; Estate of Loretta M. Simmons Date Issued 5/13/2020, Answer Due 6/12/2020; Joan Mellott Date Issued 5/13/2020, Answer Due 6/12/2020; Nyle Mellott Date Issued 5/13/2020, Answer Due 6/12/2020; William J. Miller Date Issued 5/13/2020, Answer Due 6/12/2020; Clinton D. Simmons Date Issued 5/13/2020, Answer Due 6/12/2020; Robert K. Simmons Date Issued 5/13/2020, Answer Due 6/12/2020; Simmons Realty Co., Inc. Date Issued 5/13/2020, Answer Due 6/12/2020; Sunco Enterprises, Inc. Date Issued 5/13/2020, Answer Due 6/12/2020; Ladonna Watters Date Issued 5/13/2020, Answer Due 6/12/2020; Thomas Watters Date Issued 5/13/2020, Answer Due 6/12/2020. Sale Hearing scheduled for 6/26/2020 at 11:00 AM at tcbm Telephone Conference - Deller. (msch)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/13 2:26 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice and Service of Papers by Robert O Lampl Filed by Creditor Robert O Lampl Law Office (Lampl, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 12, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/12 2:30 PM
Adversary case 20-07013 Complaint for Authorization to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens and Other Interests by The Estate of BG Petroleum, LLC by and through the Chapter 7 Trustee, Lisa Swope against Community State Bank of Orbisonia, William J. Miller, Attilio S. DeMarco, 201 Jefferson Street, LLC, 720 Lincoln Highway, LLC, 4355 Business 220, LLC, Donan, Inc., Clinton D. Simmons, Robert K. Simmons, Estate of Loretta M. Simmons, Nyle and Joan Mellott, Thomas Watters, Ladonna Watters, Bedford County Oil Company, Inc., Simmons Realty Co., Inc., Sunco Enterprises, Inc.. Fee Amount $ 350. Nature of Suit: (31 (Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - 363(h))) (Herron, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Proposed Order