Oklahoma Northern District Court
Judge:Claire V Eagan
Referred: Susan E Huntsman
Case #: 4:20-cv-00204
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 13, 2020
Terminated:Nov 03, 2021
Last checked: Monday Nov 09, 2020 3:55 AM CST
Defendant
Western Feed Mills, Inc.
Represented By
Brian Michael Keester
Rhodes Hieronymus Jones Tucker & Gable PLLC
contact info
Randall Edwin Long
Rhodes Hieronymus Jones Tucker & Gable PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Adcock
Represented By
Bradford D Barron
Barron Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mike Dye
Represented By
Bradford D Barron
Barron Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
EJ Gagan
Represented By
Bradford D Barron
Barron Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rebecca Gagan
Represented By
Bradford D Barron
Barron Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Gagan
Represented By
Bradford D Barron
Barron Law Firm PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
40 40 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 11/23 1:25 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal, closing case, by Western Feed Mills, Inc. (Keester, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 03, 2021
39 39 order 01 - Order Case - Administratively Closed Deadlines - Strike/Terminate Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Documents - Link to Document(s) Wed 11/03 4:27 PM
ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Upon notice of settlement (Dkt. # 38) and pursuant to LCvR 41.1, this case is administratively closed pending either an order of the Court reopening the action, or until this case is dismissed with prejudice by stipulation of the parties. All scheduling order deadlines, including the November 3, 2021 settlement conference, the March 3, 2022 pretrial conference, and the March 21, 2022 jury trial, are hereby stricken. The parties shall file a fully-executed joint stipulation of dismissal no later than February 4, 2022. , administratively closing the case (terminates case), striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s), setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Dismissal Papers due by 2/4/2022) Related [+] (RGG, Chambers)
Related: [-] 38 Notice of Settlement,35 Settlement Conference Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s), State Court Petition/Complaint,37 Scheduling Order,, Setting/Resetting Scheduling Order Date(s),
38 38 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 11/03 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Western Feed Mills, Inc. (Keester, Brian)
Related: [-]
utility Case - Terminate Civil/Miscellaneous Case Thu 11/04 9:32 AM
***Civil Case Terminated (see document number39 ) (sc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
37 37 order 05 - Scheduling Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Date(s) Wed 09/15 5:09 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (AMENDED) , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 12/13/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 1/18/2022, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/22/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 3/3/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan, Jury Trial set for 3/21/2022 at 09:15 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan) (crp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
36 36 order 02 - Minute Order Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Wed 09/15 4:40 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan the joint motion to extend deadlines by 60 days (Dkt. # 29) is granted. An amended scheduling order will be entered forthwith ; granting29 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (crp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
35 35 order 13 - Settlement Conference Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Wed 09/15 9:26 AM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): before ASJ Hugh M. Robert in his office ( Settlement Conference set for 11/3/2021 at 09:30 AM before Adjunct Settlement Judge) (LML, Chambers)
Related: [-]
34 34 order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Strike/Terminate Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference Wed 09/15 9:18 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little The Joint Motion to Extend and Continue Settlement Conference and Request for New Adjunct Settlement Judge (Doc. 32) is granted. The Settlement Conference set on September 21, 2021 before ASJ R. Tom Hillis is hereby stricken. A new Settlement Conference Order will be entered forthwith. ; striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s); granting32 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (LML, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 10, 2021
33 33 order 02 - Minute Order Documents - Refer Motion(s) Fri 09/10 1:02 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , referring motion(s) to Magistrate Judge Christine D. Little Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
Related: [-] 32 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference
32 32 motion Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference Fri 09/10 12:18 PM
Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference by Western Feed Mills, Inc. (Keester, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
31 31 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Parties to Reflect Correct Case Number Documents - Link to Document(s) Wed 09/08 2:16 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , Parties are to take notice that documents are being filed in this matter which incorrectly cite the case number. The correct case number, 20-CV-0204-CVE-SH, should be noted and corrected on all future pleadings. Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
Related: [-] 29 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) , 25 Minute Order,, Reassigning Case,, Changing Case Number,
30 30 order 02 - Minute Order Documents - Link to Document(s) Wed 09/08 2:09 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Counsel for defendant is advised that request to reset settlement conference MUST BE FILED AS A SEPARATE MOTION. Counsel is directed to proceed accordingly. Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
Related: [-] 29 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s)
29 29 motion Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Wed 09/08 2:05 PM
Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) by Western Feed Mills, Inc. (Keester, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
28 28 order 05 - Scheduling Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Date(s) Wed 07/14 4:36 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (SECOND AMENDED) , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 10/12/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 11/16/2021, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/21/2021, Pretrial Conference set for 1/4/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan, Jury Trial set for 1/18/2022 at 09:15 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan) (crp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
27 27 order 02 - Minute Order Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Wed 07/14 4:17 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan the joint motion to extend all deadlines by 30 days (Dkt. # 26) is granted. An amended scheduling order will be entered forthwith ; granting26 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (crp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 13, 2021
26 26 motion Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Tue 07/13 2:24 PM
Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) by Western Feed Mills, Inc. (Keester, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
25 25 order 02 - Minute Order Case - Reassigned Case - Number Changed Tue 04/20 12:04 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk reassigning the magistrate judge in this case pursuant to General Order 21-15 , reassigning case to Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman, Magistrate Judge Christine D Little no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 20-cv-204-CVE-SH (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 15, 2021
24 24 order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference Mon 03/15 1:34 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little The Settlement Conference set on 4/6/2021 at 9:30 a.m. is stricken and reset for 9/21/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before ASJ R. Tom Hillis. Plaintiff's Settlement Conference Statement is due 9/7/2021. Defendant's Settlement Conference Statement is due 9/14/2021. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Settlement Conference set for 9/21/2021 at 09:30 AM before Adjunct Settlement Judge); granting22 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (LML, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 11, 2021
23 23 order 02 - Minute Order Documents - Refer Motion(s) Thu 03/11 1:06 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , referring motion(s) to Magistrate Judge Christine D. Little Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
Related: [-] 22 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference
22 22 motion Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference Thu 03/11 12:55 PM
Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference by Western Feed Mills, Inc. (Keester, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2021
21 21 order 05 - Scheduling Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Date(s) Fri 01/29 11:15 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (AMENDED) , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 9/10/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 10/15/2021, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/22/2021, Pretrial Conference set for 11/29/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan, Jury Trial set for 12/20/2021 at 09:15 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan) (crp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
20 20 order 02 - Minute Order Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Fri 01/29 10:57 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan the joint motion to extend all deadlines by 180 days (Dkt. # 19) is granted. An amended scheduling order will be entered forthwith ; granting19 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (crp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
19 19 motion Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Wed 01/27 3:35 PM
Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) by Western Feed Mills, Inc. (Keester, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
18 18 order 13 - Settlement Conference Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Tue 12/08 10:54 AM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): before ASJ R. Tom Hillis ( Settlement Conference set for 4/6/2021 at 09:30 AM before Adjunct Settlement Judge) (sdc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 09, 2020
17 17 order 05 - Scheduling Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Date(s) Documents - Link to Document(s) Mon 11/09 9:48 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (AMENDED) , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 3/15/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 4/19/2021, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/27/2021, Pretrial Conference set for 6/3/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan, Jury Trial set for 6/21/2021 at 09:15 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan) Related [+] (RGG, Chambers)
Related: [-] 16 Minute Order,, Reassigning Case,, Changing Case Number,13 Scheduling Order,, Setting/Resetting Scheduling Order Date(s),
Saturday, November 07, 2020
16 16 order 02 - Minute Order Case - Reassigned Case - Number Changed Sat 11/07 12:49 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk reassigning the magistrate judge in this case pursuant to General Order 20-37 , reassigning case to Magistrate Judge Christine D Little, Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 20-cv-204-CVE-CDL (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (srt, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 05, 2020
15 15 order 02 - Minute Order Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Thu 11/05 9:24 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that plaintiffs' unopposed motion 14 is granted. An amended scheduling order will be entered. ; granting14 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Thu 11/05 8:58 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Related [+] by Robert Adcock, Mike Dye, EJ Gagan, Rebecca Gagan, Richard Gagan (Barron, Bradford)
Related: [-] 13 Scheduling Order,, Setting/Resetting Scheduling Order Date(s),
Tuesday, June 23, 2020
13 13 order 05 - Scheduling Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Date(s) Tue 06/23 2:23 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (Initial) , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 1/15/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 2/19/2021, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/22/2021, Pretrial Conference set for 3/30/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan, Jury Trial set for 4/19/2021 at 09:15 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan) (crp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 22, 2020
12 12 misc Joint Status Report per Local Rule 16.1 Mon 06/22 12:28 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Western Feed Mills, Inc. (Keester, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 20, 2020
11 11 order 01 - Order Directing - Parties to File Joint Status Report Wed 05/20 3:57 PM
ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 6/22/2020) (RGG, Chambers)
Related: [-]
10 10 respoth Answer Wed 05/20 3:27 PM
ANSWER Related [+] by Western Feed Mills, Inc. (Long, Randall)
Related: [-] State Court Petition/Complaint
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement (Corporate) Wed 05/20 1:37 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Western Feed Mills, Inc. (Long, Randall)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Status Report on Removed Action Wed 05/20 1:12 PM
STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Western Feed Mills, Inc. (Long, Randall)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Jury Demand Wed 05/20 12:43 PM
JURY DEMAND by Western Feed Mills, Inc. (Long, Randall)
Related: [-]
6 6 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 05/20 9:00 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Western Feed Mills, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
5 5 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Removing Party(ies) to File Status Report on Removed Action Wed 05/20 8:59 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , : Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, the removing party(ies) shall file a Status Report on Removed Action within five (5) days of the filing of the notice of removal in the U.S. District Court. The form is available on the Court's website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 19, 2020
4 4 notice Appearance - Attorney Tue 05/19 3:16 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brian Michael Keester on behalf of Western Feed Mills, Inc. [Note: Attorney Brian Michael Keester added to party Western Feed Mills, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Keester, Brian)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Appearance - Attorney Tue 05/19 3:03 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Randall Edwin Long on behalf of Western Feed Mills, Inc. (Long, Randall)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Removal Tue 05/19 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Nowata County, case number CJ-2019-36 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2207776) by Western Feed Mills, Inc. (With attachments) (Long, Randall)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 05/19 10:58 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Western Feed Mills, Inc. (Long, Randall)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2019
PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Western Feed Mills, Inc. by Richard Gagan, Rebecca Gagan, Mike Dye, Robert Adcock, EJ Gagan (jjs, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]