Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 9:19-bk-90151

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ronald H Sargis
Case #: 9:20-ap-09005
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:May 12, 2020
Terminated:Mar 23, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Irma C. Edmonds
Represented By
Aaron A. Avery
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Thursday, June 15, 2023
virtual Change of Address by Attorney Thu 06/15 11:14 AM
On 6/15/2023, Change of Address Submitted for Attorney Dane Exnowski through Pacer Service Center. Address changed to: 301 E. Ocean Boulevard Suite 1720 Long Beach CA 90802. IF YOUR CLIENT IS RECEIVING MAIL AT YOUR ADDRESS, IT IS YOUR RESPONSIBILITY TO SUBMIT A CHANGE OF ADDRESS FORM (EDC 2-085)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 02, 2022
37 37 misc 9036 Entry - Bounce Back Tue 08/02 12:50 PM
On 07/29/2022, an electronic notification sent to Dane W. Exnowski at dane.exnowski@mccalla.com was returned to the Court as undeliverable. As a result, the Clerks Office deleted this email from our e-Filing system, and, on 08/02/2022, mailed the attached letter to Dane W. Exnowski at his/her primary postal address. (auto)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 23, 2021
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 03/23 8:21 AM
Adversary Proceeding 9:20-ap-9005 Closed (fdis)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 07, 2021
36 36 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sun 03/07 9:17 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 05, 2021
35 35 notice BNC Service of Document Fri 03/05 9:42 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
34 34 order Generic Order - Links to Non-Motion Fri 03/05 9:40 AM
Order Granting31 Stipulation ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. (fdis)
Related: [-]
34 34 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding/Notice of Removal (Sua Sponte) Fri 03/05 9:41 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding/Notice of Removal. (fdis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
33 33 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 03/03 2:50 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order,30 Motion/Application for Entry of Order on Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Adversary Proceeding,31 Stipulation,32 Declaration (fdis)
Related: [-]
32 32 related Declaration Wed 03/03 2:48 PM
Declaration of Irma C. Edmonds in support of30 Motion/Application for Entry of Order on Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Adversary Proceeding (fdis)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Stipulation Wed 03/03 2:44 PM
Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Irma C. Edmonds (fdis)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Generic Motion/Application - Including Amended Motion Wed 03/03 2:42 PM
Motion/Application for Entry of Order on Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Irma C. Edmonds (fdis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 29, 2020
29 29 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Thu 10/29 4:08 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of28 Certificate Re: BDRP Conference (fdis)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Certificate Re: BDRP Thu 10/29 3:57 PM
Certificate Re: BDRP Conference (fdis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 28, 2020
27 27 order Extend Time (Order) Wed 10/28 11:08 AM
Order Granting24 Motion/Application to Extend Time [DWE-1] (fdis)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Set/Continue/Reschedule Hearing Wed 10/28 11:13 AM
Order to Continue Pre-Trial Conference [DWE-1] Re:1 (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)) : Complaint 20-09005 by Irma C. Edmonds against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6761808) (jlns) ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/9/2021 at 02:00 PM at Modesto Courtroom, Department E (fdis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
26 26 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 10/28 7:48 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order,24 Motion/Application to Extend Time [DWE-1],25 Stipulation (fdis)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Stipulation Wed 10/28 7:46 AM
Stipulation to Extend Deadlines Under Court's July 20, 2020 Scheduling Order [DWE-1] Filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (fdis)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Extend Time - Including Amended Motion Wed 10/28 7:43 AM
Ex Parte Motion/Application to Extend Deadlines Under Court's July 20, 2020 Scheduling Order [DWE-1] Filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (fdis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
23 23 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Wed 09/23 9:16 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2020
22 22 order Set/Continue/Reschedule Hearing Mon 09/21 1:01 PM
Order Setting Pre-Trial Conference Re:1 (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)) : Complaint 20-09005 by Irma C. Edmonds against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6761808) (jlns) ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/29/2021 at 02:00 PM at Modesto Courtroom, Department E (fdis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
21 21 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 09/02 8:41 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of18 Order Appointing Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (BDRP) (smis)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 30, 2020
20 20 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sun 08/30 9:22 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2020
19 19 notice BNC Service of Document Fri 08/28 3:01 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (pdes)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Appointing BDRP Fri 08/28 2:58 PM
Order Appointing Mark Gorton as Resolution Advocate and Assignment to Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (BDRP) (pdes)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 23, 2020
17 17 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Thu 07/23 9:17 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 20, 2020
16 16 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Tue 07/21 8:51 AM
Scheduling Order Re:1 Complaint - Pre-Trial Hearing TBD 2021 at 2:00 PM at Modesto Courtroom, Department E; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Discovery due by 1/19/2021. (fdis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 16, 2020
15 15 misc Status Conference Held/Concluded AND Pre-Trial Conference Date Set * Fri 07/17 11:46 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference Held/Concluded Re:1 Complaint; Pre-Trial Conference TBD 2021 at 02:00 PM at Modesto Courtroom, Department E (mpem)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 14, 2020
14 14 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 07/14 4:53 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of13 Discovery Plan (fdis)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Discovery Plan Tue 07/14 4:52 PM
Joint Discovery Plan Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Irma C. Edmonds (fdis)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 10, 2020
12 12 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Fri 07/10 11:03 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of11 Answer to Complaint (fdis)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/10 11:02 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (fdis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
misc Entry - CM - Proposed Order/Notice of Hearing Request by Telephone Wed 06/10 8:32 AM
A voice mail was left with the Law Office of Dane W. Exnowski on 6/10/20 regarding Failure to Submit a Proposed Order Re:9 Stipulation (fdis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
10 10 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 06/10 8:33 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of9 Stipulation (fdis)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Stipulation Wed 06/10 8:29 AM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline Re:1 Complaint Filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (fdis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 13, 2020
8 8 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Thu 05/14 8:10 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of1 Complaint,2 Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program,3 Order to Confer,4 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet,7 Reissued Summons (fdis)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Reissued Summons (NO FORM Produced) Wed 05/13 3:11 PM
Copy of Reissued Summons Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 7/16/2020 at 02:00 PM at Modesto Courtroom, Department E (msts) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2020 (msts)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 12, 2020
6 6 misc Reissued Summons Tue 05/12 4:02 PM
Copy of Reissued Summons Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 7/16/2020 at 02:00 PM at Modesto Courtroom, Department E (jlns)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Summons Issued Tue 05/12 2:27 PM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 8/5/2020 at 02:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 33, Department E (jlns)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Tue 05/12 2:26 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (jlns)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order to Confer Tue 05/12 2:25 PM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (jlns)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc BDRP Tue 05/12 2:25 PM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (jlns)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Tue 05/12 2:25 PM
(21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)) : Complaint 20-09005 by Irma C. Edmonds against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6761808) (jlns)
Related: [-]