Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodolfo A Ruiz, II
Case #: 9:20-cv-80796
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:May 13, 2020
Terminated:May 28, 2020
Last checked: Monday Nov 09, 2020 6:08 AM EST
Defendant
Martini, Hughes & Grossman
Plaintiff
Dysteny T. Chapman
Represented By
Alexander James Adducci Taylor
Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, June 05, 2020
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Fri 06/05 6:38 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dysteny T. Chapman (Taylor, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 28, 2020
5 5 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 05/28 2:41 PM
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. See attached document for full details. (fc)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Thu 05/28 12:58 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Dysteny T. Chapman (Taylor, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 14, 2020
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 05/14 8:26 AM
Summons Issued as to Martini, Hughes & Grossman. (scn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 13, 2020
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 05/14 8:23 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (scn)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/13 6:55 PM
COMPLAINT against Martini, Hughes & Grossman. Filing fees $ 400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-12883909, payment transferred from : 20CV80795, filed by Dysteny T. Chapman.(Taylor, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)