Member Case
Lead case is: 3:20-bk-32299

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Keith L Phillips
Case #: 3:20-bk-32314
Case Filed:May 14, 2020
Terminated:Jun 30, 2022

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors5,001-10,000
Est. Assets$10,000,000,001 to $50 billion
Est. Liabilities $10,000,000,001 to $50 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Intelsat International Systems, LLC
7900 Tysons One Pl
McLean, VA 22102-5971
Represented By
Michael A. Condyles
Kutak Rock LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
John P. Fitzgerald, III
Office of the US Trustee - Region 4 -R 701 E. Broad Street, Ste. 4304
Richmond, VA 23219


Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago
Thursday, June 30, 2022
8 8 court Case Closed - Chapter 11 Thu 06/30 1:08 PM
Case Closed. The Chapter 11 case having been fully administered, the case is hereby closed. (Cummings, James)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Directing Thu 06/30 1:07 PM
Final Decree Closing Certain Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 350(a) and Federal of Bankruptcy Procedure 3022 (Cummings, James)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 11, 2020
6 6 misc Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists Sat 07/11 3:11 PM
Non-Individual Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists (Statement of Financial Affairs) filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Intelsat International Systems, LLC. (Condyles, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists Sat 07/11 3:09 PM
Non-Individual Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Intelsat International Systems, LLC. (Condyles, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 15, 2020
4 4 12 pgs order Order on Motion for Joint Administration Fri 05/15 11:35 AM
Order Granting Motion for Joint Administration Related [+], Related Case 3:20-bk-32299. An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of Virginia directing joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Intelsat S.A.; and its related entities, Intelsat Virginia Holdings LLC; Intelsat Connect Finance S.A.; Intelsat (Luxembourg) S.A.; Intelsat Envision Holdings LLC; Intelsat US LLC; Intelsat Investment Holdings S.a.r.l.; Intelsat Holdings S.A.; Intelsat Investments S.A.; Intelsat UK Financial Services Ltd.; Intelsat Jackson Holdings S.A.; Intelsat Align S.a.r.l; Intelsat License Holdings LLC; Intelsat Subsidiary (Gibraltar) Limited; Intelsat Holdings LLC; Intelsat Finance Bermuda Ltd.; Intelsat Satellite LLC; Intelsat License LLC; Intelsat Ventures S.a. r.l; Intelsat Global Sales & Marketing Ltd.; Intelsat International Systems, LLC; PanAmSat International Holdings, LLC; Intelsat International Employment LLC; PanAmSat Europe Corporation; Intelsat Genesis GP LLC; Intelsat Service and Equipment LLC; Southern Satellite LLC; Southern Satellite Licensee LLC; PanAmSat International Sales, LLC; Intelsat Genesis Inc.; Intelsat Alliance LP; Intelsat US Finance LLC; PanAmSat India LLC; PanAmSat India Marketing L.L.C.; Intelsat Asia Carrier Services, LLC. The docket in Case No. 20-32299 KLP should be consulted for all matters affecting these cases (Cummings, James)
Related: [-] 3
Thursday, May 14, 2020
3 3 motion Joint Administration Thu 05/14 2:40 AM
Motion for Joint Administration with 20-32299 20-32305 20-32296 20-32328 20-32324 20-32297 20-32309 20-32318 20-32323 20-32313 20-32308 20-32301 20-32316 20-32300 20-32302 20-32304 20-32306 20-32311 20-32310 20-32319 20-32307 20-32303 20-32325 20-32298 20-32312 20-32294 20-32317 20-32326 20-32327 20-32315 20-32322 20-32321 20-32320 20-32295 Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief filed by Jeremy S. Williams of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Intelsat International Systems, LLC. (Williams, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 05/14 1:00 AM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition 20-32314 [misc,824] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 32529099, amount $1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 48 pgs misc Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Thu 05/14 12:59 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Intelsat International Systems, LLC. (Condyles, Michael)
Related: [-]