Original Case: 1:18-cv-05292

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:20-cv-01544
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:May 12, 2020
Terminated:Oct 28, 2020
Last checked: Thursday May 14, 2020 4:26 AM EDT
Petitioner - Appellee
Isacco Jacky Saada
Represented By
Richard Min
Burger Green & Min LLP
contact info
Respondent - Appellant
Narkis Aliza Golan
Represented By
Daniel H. Levi
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/08/2022 2:21 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 12, 2020
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, FILED. [2838047] 20-1544 [Entered: 05/12/2020 05:19 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 17 pgs Case FILED
2 2 13 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 05/05/2020, RECEIVED.[2838056] 20-1544 [Entered: 05/12/2020 05:27 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Narkis Aliza Golan, district court receipt # ANYEDC-12786852, FILED.[2838058] 20-1544 [Entered: 05/12/2020 05:29 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2838061] 20-1544 [Entered: 05/12/2020 05:32 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 17 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED