ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC v. Southern Telecom, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:19-bk-80064
Lead BK case is: 8:19-bk-80064
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:20-ap-08007 |
Nature of Suit | 11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property |
Case Filed: | May 13, 2020 |
Terminated: | Nov 17, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Southern Telecom, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC
700 Pilgrim Way
Green Bay, WI 54304 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, November 17, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Certificate of Service
Tue 11/17 1:17 PM
Certificate of Service on Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC (Goodman, Lauren) |
|
20 | 20
court
Entry
Tue 11/17 1:06 PM
US District Court case number is 8:20-mc-00286-UNA. . (nmw) |
|
19 | 19
appeal
Transmittal of Record to District Court
Tue 11/17 9:06 AM
Transmittal of Record to District Court . (nmw) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 11/17 1:07 PM
Adversary Case Closed 20-08007 TLS ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC v. Southern Telecom, Inc. DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered on 11/2/20 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, November 04, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Wed 11/04 11:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 11/04/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, November 02, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
court
Courts Certificate Of Mailing
Mon 11/02 10:02 AM
Court's Certificate of Mailing to Defendant . (law) |
|
16 | 16
order
Default Judgment
Mon 11/02 9:52 AM
Default Judgment . Default Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff, Shopko Stores Operating Co., LLC, against Defendant, Southern Telecom, Inc., in the amount of $104,911.90, with post-judgment interest thereon at the rate provided in 28 U.S.C. § 1961. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (See PDF) (law) |
|
15 | 15
order
Default Judgment
Mon 11/02 9:50 AM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC. . The motion is granted. Separate Default Judgment to be entered. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text Only Order) (law) |
|
Friday, October 30, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Default Judgment
Fri 10/30 4:06 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC. CORRECTIVE ENTRY: ORIGINALLY, THE INCORRECT EVENT WAS USED. THIS ENTRY REPLACES12 . (nmw) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Affidavit/Declaration
Fri 10/30 3:28 PM
Declaration of Brad Rivard in Support of Motion for Entry of Default Judgment. Filed by Lauren R. Goodman on behalf of ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC. (Goodman, Lauren). LINKAGE CORRECTED. Modified on 10/30/2020 (nmw) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Generic Motion
Fri 10/30 3:26 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC (Goodman, Lauren) RE-FILED, SEE ENTRY14 . Modified on 10/30/2020 (nmw) |
|
Tuesday, October 13, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
order
Show Cause
Tue 10/13 10:15 AM
Order to Show Cause for Failure of Plaintiff to Move for Relief Show Cause due by 11/3/2020. (nmw) |
|
Friday, July 10, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 07/10 11:50 AM
Alias Summons Service Executed on Southern Telecom, Inc. 7/10/2020 . (Eversden, Michael) |
|
9 | 9
court
Alias Summons Issued
Fri 07/10 8:01 AM
Alias Summons Issued on Southern Telecom, Inc. Date Issued 7/10/2020, Answer Due 8/9/2020 . (nmw) |
|
Thursday, July 09, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Praecipe for Alias Summons
Thu 07/09 5:52 PM
Praecipe for Clerk to Issue an Alias Summons by Michael T. Eversden on behalf of ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC against Southern Telecom, Inc.. (Eversden, Michael) |
|
Monday, May 18, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Certificate of Service
Mon 05/18 5:47 PM
Certificate of Service of Sebastian V. Higgins Regarding Complaint for Turnover (against Southern Telecom, Inc.) Filed by Prime Clerk LLC (Pagan, Chanel) |
|
Thursday, May 14, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 05/14 8:49 AM
Summons Service Executed Filed by Plaintiff ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC. ORIGINALLY, THE INCORRECT EVENT WAS USED. CORRECTIONS HAVE BEEN MADE. Modified on 5/14/2020 (nmw). LINKAGE REMOVED. Modified on 5/14/2020 (nmw) |
|
Wednesday, May 13, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 05/13 4:16 PM
Receipt of Payment through Internet([LINK 20-08007 TLS] ) [misc,payment] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A8266848, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Payment through Internet
Wed 05/13 4:15 PM
Internet Payment of Complaint for Turnover . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Michael T. Eversden on behalf of ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC. (Eversden, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Wed 05/13 3:00 PM
Summons Issued on Southern Telecom, Inc. Date Issued 5/13/2020, Answer Due 6/12/2020 . (nmw) |
|
2 | 2
court
Notice of Failure to Pay Filing Fee
Wed 05/13 2:59 PM
Notice of Failure to Pay Filing Fee . Notice Fee 14 Day Deadline due by 5/27/2020. (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 05/13 2:52 PM
Adversary case 20-08007 Complaint for Turnover by ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC against Southern Telecom, Inc.. NOS: 11 . Fee Amount $ 0 Filed by Michael T. Eversden on behalf of ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property))(Eversden, Michael) |