ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC v. United Furniture Industries, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:19-bk-80064
Lead BK case is: 8:19-bk-80064
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:20-ap-08008 |
Nature of Suit | 11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property |
Case Filed: | May 13, 2020 |
Terminated: | Aug 10, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
United Furniture Industries, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC
700 Pilgrim Way
Green Bay, WI 54304 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 10, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 08/10 7:52 AM
Adversary Case Closed 20-08008 TLS ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC v. United Furniture Industries, Inc. Case dismissed 07/26/2021 . (nmw) |
||
Monday, July 26, 2021 | ||
32 | 32
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Mon 07/26 7:58 AM
Order Granting Joint Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC , The motion is granted. This adversary case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text Only Order) (law) |
|
Friday, July 23, 2021 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 07/23 11:11 AM
Joint Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC (Eversden, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, June 16, 2021 | ||
30 | 30
order
Administrative Order Text Only
Wed 06/16 8:43 AM
Order . The parties have previously advised that this matter is settled and were ordered to file a settlement agreement or other pleading by June 15, 2021. See Order #29. Defendant has now called and requested additional time. The parties shall have until July 1, 2021 to file a settlement agreement, motion to dismiss or similar filing indicating this matter is settled. If the settlement is not finalized by that date, the Joint Preliminary Pretrial Statement must be filed instead. No further extensions will be granted. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
Tuesday, June 01, 2021 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order Matter Settled
Tue 06/01 8:37 AM
Order Settling the Adversary Complaint . The parties have advised the Court that this matter is settled. The June 1, 2021 deadline for filing an amended joint preliminary pretrial statement is canceled and pursuant to Neb. R. Bankr. P. 9019-1, parties shall file a pleading by June 15, 2021 which establishes that this matter is settled, and comply with Neb. R. Bankr. P. 9013-1, if applicable. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text Only Order) (law) |
|
Monday, February 01, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Certificate of Service
Mon 02/01 4:13 PM
Certificate of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure of Core Information of Defendant United Furniture Industries, Inc. Filed by Defendant United Furniture Industries, Inc. (Shortridge, R.) |
|
Wednesday, January 27, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 01/27 3:32 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by R. J. Shortridge on behalf of United Furniture Industries, Inc.. (Shortridge, R.) |
|
26 | 26
order
Administrative Order Text Only
Wed 01/27 11:35 AM
Order . The Court has reviewed the Preliminary Pretrial Statement and finds that it is binding on the parties even though it is ambiguous. Specifically, Part II, paragraphs 4 and 7 acknowledge that the issues in the Complaint are core over which the Court has jurisdiction and that the parties consent to entry of final judgment by this bankruptcy court. In Part III, paragraphs 1 and 2, the parties designate jurisdiction and venue as unresolved legal issues, which is directly contrary to the stipulations in Part II. Absent a specific motion challenging jurisdiction or venue by February 15, 2021, the parties shall be bound by the stipulations in Part II of the pretrial statement and Paragraphs 1 and 2 of Part III shall be deemed stricken. The Court further finds that despite receiving extensions of time to file the pretrial statement amounting to three extra months, by listing at least 33 unresolved legal issues, the parties have not made a good faith and material effort early in this case to narrow down the facts and issues in dispute, which is the primary purpose of the pre trial statement in this Court. Accordingly, to allow the parties time for further discovery, the parties are ordered to file an updated and amended Joint Pretrial Statement by June 1, 2021 . Further, notwithstanding the proposed deadline in the pretrial statement, the parties are hereby ordered to meet and confer regarding mediation by April 1, 2021 , and the amended and updated pretrial statement shall include a detailed report as to those efforts. In addition, notwithstanding the deadline proposed in the pretrial statement, the deadline for filing motions for summary judgment shall be August 1, 2021 . ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text Only Order) (law) |
|
Tuesday, January 26, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Preliminary Pretrial Statement
Tue 01/26 8:10 PM
Preliminary Pretrial Statement Filed by Plaintiff ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC (Eversden, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, January 19, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
order
Administrative Order Text Only
Tue 01/19 11:52 AM
Order Extending Deadline to File Joint Preliminary Pretrial Statement . Upon request and agreement of the parties, the deadline to file the Joint Preliminary Pretrial Statement is extended to January 26, 2021. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (law) |
|
Thursday, December 17, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
order
Administrative Order Text Only
Thu 12/17 10:19 AM
Order Extending Deadline to File Joint Preliminary Pretrial Statement . Upon request and agreement of the parties, the deadline to file the Joint Preliminary Pretrial Statement is extended to January 18, 2021. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (law) |
|
Tuesday, November 17, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
order
Administrative Order Text Only
Tue 11/17 2:23 PM
Order Extending Deadline to File Joint Preliminary Pretrial Statement . Upon request and agreement of the parties, the deadline to file the Joint Preliminary Pretrial Statement is extended to December 17, 2020. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (law) |
|
Friday, October 16, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
order
Administrative Order Text Only
Fri 10/16 11:32 AM
Order Extending Deadline to File Joint Preliminary Pretrial Statement . Upon request and agreement of the parties, the deadline to file the Joint Preliminary Pretrial Statement is extended to November 17, 2020. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
Wednesday, August 19, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
court
Preliminary Pretrial Order
Wed 08/19 4:20 PM
Preliminary Pretrial Order . Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 10/18/2020. (nmw) |
|
Friday, July 24, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 07/24 1:25 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant United Furniture Industries, Inc. (Phillips, Donald) |
|
Friday, July 10, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
order
Extend Time
Fri 07/10 11:02 AM
Order Granting Second Motion to Extend Deadline to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Turnover Filed by Defendant United Furniture Industries, Inc. . The motion is granted. The deadline for Defendant to file an answer or otherwise plead is extended to July 24, 2020. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text Only Order) (law) |
|
utility
Update Answer Deadline
Fri 07/10 11:02 AM
United Furniture Industries, Inc. Answer Deadline Reset for 7/24/2020 . (law) |
||
Thursday, July 09, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extend Time
Thu 07/09 4:29 PM
Second Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Turnover Filed by Defendant United Furniture Industries, Inc. (Hill, John) |
|
Thursday, June 11, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
order
Extend Time
Thu 06/11 3:01 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Deadline to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Turnover Filed by Defendant United Furniture Industries, Inc. . The motion is granted. The deadline for Defendant to file an answer or otherwise plead is extended to July 10, 2020. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text Only Order) (law) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 06/11 3:00 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by John Hill on behalf of United Furniture Industries, Inc.. (Hill, John) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Extend Time
Thu 06/11 2:27 PM
Motion to Extend Time Filed by Defendant United Furniture Industries, Inc. (Posey, Rosamond) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 06/11 10:00 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Donald Andrew Phillips on behalf of United Furniture Industries, Inc.. (Phillips, Donald) |
|
12 | 12
order
District Court re: Order Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/11 8:46 AM
Text only order was entered in Nebraska U.S. District Court Case 8:18-mc-00094-UNA granting a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for attorney D. Andrew Phillips (nmw) |
|
11 | 11
order
District Court re: Order Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/11 8:38 AM
Text only order was entered in Nebraska U.S. District Court Case 8:18-mc-00094-UNA granting a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for attorney John S. Hill (nmw) |
|
utility
Update Answer Deadline
Thu 06/11 3:02 PM
United Furniture Industries, Inc. Answer Deadline Reset for 7/10/2020 . (law) |
||
Wednesday, June 10, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 06/10 3:06 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Rosamond Posey on behalf of United Furniture Industries, Inc. CORRECTIVE ENTRY: ORIGINALLY, THE INCORRECT EVENT WAS USED. THIS ENTRY REPLACES9 . (nmw) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Creditor Request for Notices
Wed 06/10 3:01 PM
Creditor Request for Notices Filed by Rosamond Posey on behalf of United Furniture Industries, Inc.. (Posey, Rosamond) RE-FILED, SEE ENTRY10 . Modified on 6/10/2020 (nmw) |
|
Tuesday, June 09, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
order
District Court re: Order Pro Hac Vice
Tue 06/09 2:48 PM
Text only order was entered in Nebraska U.S. District Court Case 8:18-mc-00094-UNA granting a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for attorney Rosamond H. Posey (nmw) |
|
Monday, May 18, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Certificate of Service
Mon 05/18 5:44 PM
Certificate of Service of Sebastian V. Higgins Regarding Complaint for Turnover (against United Furniture Industries, Inc.) Filed by Prime Clerk LLC (Pagan, Chanel) |
|
Thursday, May 14, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 05/14 8:50 AM
Summons Service Executed Filed by Plaintiff ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC. (Eversden, Michael) ORIGINALLY, THE INCORRECT EVENT WAS USED. CORRECTIONS HAVE BEEN MADE. Modified on 5/14/2020 (nmw). LINKAGE REMOVED. Modified on 5/14/2020 (nmw) |
|
Wednesday, May 13, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 05/13 4:04 PM
Receipt of Payment through Internet([LINK 20-08008 TLS] ) [misc,payment] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A8266828, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Payment through Internet
Wed 05/13 4:02 PM
Internet Payment of Complaint for Turnover . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Michael T. Eversden on behalf of ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC. (Eversden, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Wed 05/13 3:10 PM
Summons Issued on United Furniture Industries, Inc. Date Issued 5/13/2020, Answer Due 6/12/2020 . (nmw) |
|
2 | 2
court
Notice of Failure to Pay Filing Fee
Wed 05/13 3:07 PM
Notice of Failure to Pay Filing Fee . Notice Fee 14 Day Deadline due by 5/27/2020. (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 05/13 3:02 PM
Adversary case 20-08008 Complaint for Turnover by ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC against United Furniture Industries, Inc.. NOS: 11 . Fee Amount $ 0 Filed by Michael T. Eversden on behalf of ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property))(Eversden, Michael) |