ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC v. Incipio, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:19-bk-80064
Lead BK case is: 8:19-bk-80064
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:20-ap-08009 |
Nature of Suit | 11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property |
Case Filed: | May 13, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jan 14, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Incipio, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC
700 Pilgrim Way
Green Bay, WI 54304 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 1:08 PM CDT |
Thursday, January 14, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Thu 01/14 9:04 AM
Order to Dismiss Adversary Case . Pursuant to the Stipulation of the parties (Fil. #21) this adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (drs) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 01/14 10:14 AM
Adversary Case Closed 20-08009 TLS ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC v. Incipio, LLC CASE DISMISSED on 1/14/21 . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, January 13, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation
Wed 01/13 4:35 PM
Stipulation Between ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC and Incipio, LLC Re: the dismissal of the adversary proceeding with prejudice Filed by Lauren R. Goodman on behalf of ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC. (Goodman, Lauren) |
|
Tuesday, November 03, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order Matter Settled
Tue 11/03 10:02 AM
Order Settling Adversary Complaint . The parties have advised the Court that this matter is settled. The November 2, 2020 deadline to file a joint preliminary pretrial statement is canceled. Pursuant to Neb. R. Bankr. P. 9019-1, parties shall file a pleading by November 17, 2020 which establishes that this matter is settled, and comply with Neb. R. Bankr. P. 9013-1, if applicable. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text Only Order) (law) |
|
Monday, October 19, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
order
Administrative Order Text Only
Mon 10/19 2:07 PM
Order . By agreement of the parties, the deadline to file the joint preliminary pretrial statement is extended to November 2, 2020. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (law) |
|
Wednesday, October 07, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
order
Administrative Order Text Only
Wed 10/07 3:36 PM
Order . By agreement of the parties, the deadline to file the joint preliminary pretrial statement is extended to October 19, 2020. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (law) |
|
Thursday, October 01, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
order
Administrative Order Text Only
Thu 10/01 1:23 PM
Order . By agreement of the parties, the deadline to file the joint preliminary pretrial statement is extended to October 8, 2020. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (law) |
|
Friday, September 18, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
order
Administrative Order Text Only
Fri 09/18 8:31 AM
Order . By agreement of the parties, the deadline to file the joint preliminary pretrial statement is extended to October 1, 2020. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
Thursday, September 10, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Certificate of Service
Thu 09/10 1:38 PM
Certificate of Service Initial Disclosures of Defendant Incipio, LLC Filed by Defendant Incipio, LLC (Shortridge, R.) |
|
Friday, September 04, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
order
Administrative Order Text Only
Fri 09/04 12:14 PM
Order . By agreement of the parties, the deadline to file a joint preliminary pretrial statement is extended to September 18, 2020. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text Only Order) (law) |
|
Wednesday, August 19, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
utility
Corrective Entry
Wed 08/19 4:24 PM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: THE PREVIOUS CORRECTIVE ENTRY WAS ENTER IN THE INCORRECT CASE. THE PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT IS ENTERED IN THIS CASE CORRECTLY AND THE DUE DATE IS 9/8/2020. SEE PRETRIAL ORDER FOR DETAILS AT FILING11 . . (nmw) |
|
Wednesday, August 12, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
utility
Corrective Entry
Wed 08/12 9:56 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER WAS ENTERED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. . (nmw) |
|
Friday, July 10, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
court
Preliminary Pretrial Order
Fri 07/10 2:11 PM
Preliminary Pretrial Order . Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 9/8/2020. (nmw) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 07/10 1:41 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Incipio, LLC (Kaplan, Charles) |
|
Thursday, July 09, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 07/09 2:04 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Charles F Kaplan on behalf of Incipio, LLC. (Kaplan, Charles) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 07/09 1:55 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by R. J. Shortridge on behalf of Incipio, LLC. (Shortridge, R.) |
|
Monday, May 18, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Certificate of Service
Mon 05/18 5:41 PM
Certificate of Service of Sebastian V. Higgins Regarding Complaint for Turnover (against Incipio, LLC) Filed by Prime Clerk LLC (Pagan, Chanel) |
|
Thursday, May 14, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 05/14 8:51 AM
Summons Service Executed Filed by Plaintiff ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC. ORIGINALLY, THE INCORRECT EVENT WAS USED. CORRECTIONS HAVE BEEN MADE. Modified on 5/14/2020 (nmw). LINKAGE REMOVED. Modified on 5/14/2020 (nmw) |
|
Wednesday, May 13, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 05/13 4:18 PM
Receipt of Payment through Internet([LINK 20-08009 TLS] ) [misc,payment] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A8266861, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Payment through Internet
Wed 05/13 4:17 PM
Internet Payment of Complaint for Turnover . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Michael T. Eversden on behalf of ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC. (Eversden, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Wed 05/13 3:15 PM
Summons Issued on Incipio, LLC Date Issued 5/13/2020, Answer Due 6/12/2020 . (nmw) |
|
2 | 2
court
Notice of Failure to Pay Filing Fee
Wed 05/13 3:13 PM
Notice of Failure to Pay Filing Fee . Notice Fee 14 Day Deadline due by 5/27/2020. (nmw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 05/13 3:07 PM
Adversary case 20-08009 Complaint for Turnover by ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC against Incipio, LLC. NOS: 11 . Fee Amount $ 0 Filed by Michael T. Eversden on behalf of ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property))(Eversden, Michael) |