Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Arenda L Wright Allen
Referred: Robert J Krask
Case #: 2:20-cv-00248
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:May 15, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 11, 2020 5:11 AM EST
Counter Claimant
American Arbitration Association, Inc.
Represented By
Alison Ross Wickizer Toepp
Reed Smith Llp (richmond)
contact info
Counter Defendant
Family Dollar, Inc.
Represented By
Wendy Cohen McGraw
Hunton Andrews Kurth Llp (norfolk)
contact info
Michael Randolph Shebelskie
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Lewis Franklin Powell, III
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Defendant
American Arbitration Association, Inc.
Represented By
S. Miles Dumville
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Alison Ross Wickizer Toepp
Reed Smith Llp (richmond)
contact info
Plaintiff
Family Dollar, Inc.
Represented By
Wendy Cohen McGraw
Hunton Andrews Kurth Llp (norfolk)
contact info
Michael Randolph Shebelskie
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Lewis Franklin Powell, III
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/14/2022 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, December 04, 2020
15 15 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 12/04 12:41 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by American Arbitration Association, Inc.. (Toepp, Alison)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
minutes Settlement Conference Thu 12/03 10:37 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask: Settlement Conference held on 12/2/2020. (jjon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
14 14 order Settlement Conference Order Tue 10/27 10:26 AM
Settlement Conference Order. Settlement Conference scheduled at 1:30 p.m. on December 2, 2020; memorandum due by noon on November 25, 2020. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 10/27/2020. (bboy, )
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 10/27 9:11 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings Settlement Conference set for 12/2/2020 at 01:30 PM in Norfolk Remote via Zoom before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (jjon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2020
13 13 3 pgs notice Notice (other) Thu 09/17 12:08 PM
NOTICE by Family Dollar, Inc. re9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Rule 7(E) Notice) (McGraw, Wendy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 10, 2020
12 12 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 09/10 5:54 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Family Dollar, Inc.. (Shebelskie, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 04, 2020
11 11 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 09/04 12:26 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by American Arbitration Association, Inc.. (Toepp, Alison)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2020
10 10 respoth Brief in Support Fri 08/21 3:40 PM
Brief in Support to9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Family Dollar Brief in support of Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Family Dollar, Inc..(Shebelskie, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Shebelskie,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 08/21 3:32 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim by Family Dollar, Inc.(Shebelskie, Michael) Modified Text on 8/21/2020 (afar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 04, 2020
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/04 12:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by S. Miles Dumville on behalf of American Arbitration Association, Inc. (Dumville, S.)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2020
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 08/03 2:16 PM
Defendant American Arbitration Association, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Family Dollar, Inc. by American Arbitration Association, Inc..(Toepp, Alison)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 17, 2020
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 07/17 1:28 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Arbitration Association, Inc.. (Toepp, Alison)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 07/17 10:20 AM
ORDER re4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is HEREBY ORDERED that the Consent Motion is GRANTED, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the time for Defendant American Arbitration Association, Inc. to serve a responsive pleading or other responsive motions shall be extended by, through and including August 3, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 07/17/2020. (bboy, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 16, 2020
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 07/16 1:52 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by American Arbitration Association, Inc..(Toepp, Alison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, Proposed Order
utility Motions Referred Thu 07/16 3:03 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Robert J. Krask.4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, (bboy, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2020
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/29 11:00 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Family Dollar, Inc.. American Arbitration Association, Inc. waiver sent on 5/21/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (Shebelskie, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 18, 2020
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 05/18 3:38 PM
Case Reassigned to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen. District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith no longer assigned to the case. (afar)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 15, 2020
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/15 2:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Family Dollar, Inc.. (Shebelskie, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/15 2:08 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7206383.), filed by Family Dollar, Inc..(Shebelskie, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Fri 05/15 3:01 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )
Related: [-]