Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:20-cv-01882
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 15, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 11, 2020 4:52 AM EST
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
individually and as successor in interest to The Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Defendant
3M Company, The
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Incorporated
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
12321 Hatcherville Road
Baytown, TX 77521
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
individually and as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
Plaintiff
Patrick Garcia
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Norma Garcia
Represented By
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
Terminated: 09/25/2020
Represented By
Rebekah E Blake
Jones Day
contact info
Theodore M Grossman
Jones Day
contact info
Defendant
Dyneon LLC
Terminated: 09/25/2020
Defendant
Ele Corporation
Terminated: 08/12/2020
Defendant
Fire Services Plus Inc
Terminated: 09/25/2020
Defendant
Kidde PLC
Terminated: 09/25/2020
Defendant
Daikin Industries Ltd
Terminated: 09/25/2020
Defendant
Narchem Corporation
Terminated: 09/25/2020
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Terminated: 09/25/2020
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
Terminated: 09/25/2020
Defendant
Solvay Specialty Polymers USA LLC
Terminated: 06/02/2020
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Terminated: 09/25/2020
Defendant
AGC Inc
Terminated: 09/25/2020
Defendant
Angus Fire Armour Corp.
Terminated: 09/25/2020
Defendant
Angus International Safety Group LTD
Terminated: 09/25/2020
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Terminated: 09/25/2020
Represented By
Steven D Weber
Parker Poe Adams And Bernstein LLP
contact info
Charles E Raynal, IV
Parker Poe Adams And Bernstein LLP
contact info
Robert H Jordan
Parker Poe Adams And Bernstein LLP
contact info
Defendant
Arkema France SA
Terminated: 09/25/2020
Defendant
BASF Corporation
Terminated: 08/17/2020
Represented By
Matthew A Holian
Dla Piper Llp Us - Boston
contact info
John R Wellschlager
Dla Piper Llp Us Md
contact info
Delia G Frazier
Dla Piper Llp Us - Atlanta
contact info
Defendant
Chubb Fire & Security LTD
Terminated: 09/25/2020


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, October 05, 2023
60 60 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/06 9:02 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter A Farrell on behalf of Archroma U.S., Inc.(Farrell, Peter) Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al. QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE Counsel: Please note correct filing procedures for future filings. Refiled correctly, as of original filing date, in management case AND SPREAD to applicable member cases , to which the document relates as listed on document ( to create attorney/party association in applicable member cases ), per Judge's filing instructions/preferences per CMO No. 1.(sshe, )
Related: [-]