Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Aileen M Cannon
Referred: Patrick M Hunt
Case #: 0:20-cv-60981
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:May 19, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Nov 15, 2020 6:49 AM EST
Defendant
M.S. Management Associates, Inc.
Represented By
Fred Owen Goldberg
Berger Singerman LLP
contact info
James T. Smith
Blank Rome
contact info
Defendant
Simon Property Group, Inc.
Represented By
Fred Owen Goldberg
Berger Singerman LLP
contact info
James T. Smith
Blank Rome
contact info
Defendant
Simon Property Group, L.P.
Represented By
Fred Owen Goldberg
Berger Singerman LLP
contact info
James T. Smith
Blank Rome
contact info
Defendant
The Town Center at Boca Raton Trust
Represented By
Fred Owen Goldberg
Berger Singerman LLP
contact info
James T. Smith
Blank Rome
contact info
Mediator
Rodney Max
Plaintiff
CAFE, GELATO & PANINI LLC
Represented By
Brett Elliott von Borke
Buckner + Miles
contact info
Catherine Claire Darlson
Kelley Uustal
contact info
David Buckner
Buckner+miles
contact info
Seth Eric Miles
Buckner + Miles
contact info
Michael Aaron Hersh
Kelley Uustal
contact info
Plaintiff
DJAMES FOODS, INC.
Represented By
Seth Eric Miles
Buckner + Miles
contact info

GPO May 21 2021
5/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (mno)ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY, that Defendants' Motion to Temporarily Stay Discovery Pending a Ruling upon the Motion to Abstain or Alternatively to Dismiss [ECF No. 40] is DENIED. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 01/04 9:45 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER STAYING DEADLINES: All remaining pretrial and trial deadlines contained in the Court's Order Following Status Conference254 are STAYED pending the Court's ruling on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification195 . Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/4/2023. (sj00)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 01/04 9:55 AM
Deadlines stayed per 293 . (sj00)
Related: [-]