Delaware District Court
Judge:Mark A Kearney
Case #: 1:20-cv-00677
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:May 19, 2020
Terminated:Jun 22, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Nov 15, 2020 6:35 AM EST
Defendant
City Of Wilmington
Represented By
Rosamaria Tassone-DiNardo
City Of Wilmington Law Department
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Wolfrom
Represented By
Michele D. Allen
Allen & Associates
contact info
Emily A. Biffen
Allen & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
39 39 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 07/27 3:03 PM
ORDER, the settlement conference scheduled on August 2, 2021 is canceled. Signed by Judge Marilyn Heffley on 07/27/2021. (smg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 22, 2021
38 38 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 06/22 9:03 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: This action is DISMISSED with prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (See Order for further details) (copy to pltf.) (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Mark A. Kearney on 6/22/2021. (myr)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 21, 2021
37 37 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 06/21 11:35 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by City Of Wilmington. (Tassone-DiNardo, Rosamaria)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 24, 2021
36 36 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Mon 05/24 10:55 AM
ORDER approving35 Stipulation and amending paragraph nine of the May 12, 2021 Order (ECF Doc. No.32 ) solely to permit initial expert disclosures to be due no later than June 4, 2021 with no further amendment to the May 12, 2021 Order. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Judge Mark A. Kearney on 5/24/2021. (kmd)
Related: [-]
35 35 misc Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time) Mon 05/24 9:41 AM
Joint STIPULATION and Order to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadline re32 Scheduling Order,, by City Of Wilmington. (Tassone-DiNardo, Rosamaria)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 17, 2021
34 34 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 05/17 11:15 AM
ORDER, a SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE in the above-captioned case will be held on August 2, 2021 at 9:30 A.M., before the Honorable Marilyn Heffley, United States Magistrate Judge, via telephone. Signed by Judge Marilyn Heffley on 5/17/2021. (nmg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 13, 2021
33 33 discov Notice of Service Thu 05/13 5:39 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Request for Production of Documents Directed to Defendant and Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Document Production filed by Michael Wolfrom.(Allen, Michele)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
32 32 order Scheduling Order - General Wed 05/12 4:49 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to Magistrate Judge Heffley for all settlement purposes. Fact Discovery completed by 6/30/2021. Opening Expert Reports due by 5/25/2021. Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 6/25/2021. Motions in Limine due by 7/7/2021. Responses to Motions in Limine due by 7/21/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/17/2021. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 9/3/2021 at 08:45 AM before Judge Mark A. Kearney. A 3-day Jury Trial is set for 9/9/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Mark A. Kearney. Signed by Judge Mark A. Kearney on 5/12/2021. (nmg)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Status Conference Telephone Conference Wed 05/12 10:30 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark A. Kearney on this 12th day of May 2021- Pretrial/ Rule 16 Conference, Status Conference, and Telephone Conference. (Total Time in Court: 35 minutes)(Court Reporter N/A.) (myr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 11, 2021
31 31 order Scheduling Order - General Tue 05/11 4:27 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Telephonic Status and Trial Scheduling Conference is rescheduled for 5/12/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Mark A. Kearney. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Mark A. Kearney on 5/11/2021. (nmg)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 10, 2021
30 30 order Scheduling Order - General Mon 05/10 3:54 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephonic Status and Trial Scheduling Conference is set for 5/13/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark A. Kearney. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Mark A. Kearney on 5/10/2021. (kmd)
Related: [-]
29 29 1 pgs order Order Mon 05/10 11:55 AM
ORDER: DESIGNATION OF DISTRICT JUDGE FOR SERVICE IN ANOTHER DISTRICT WITHIN THE CIRCUIT, designating and assigning the Honorable Mark A. Kearney of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Judge D. Brooks Smith on 5/10/2021. (rjb)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 05/10 11:55 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Mark A. Kearney of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Please include the initials of the Judge (MAK) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 30, 2021
28 28 discov Notice of Service Fri 04/30 4:30 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiff and Plaintiff's Supplemental Document Production filed by Michael Wolfrom.(Allen, Michele)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
27 27 discov Notice of Service Mon 04/26 4:24 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Supplemental Initial Disclosures filed by City Of Wilmington.(Tassone-DiNardo, Rosamaria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 21, 2021
26 26 discov Notice to Take Deposition Wed 04/21 4:57 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sergeant Andrea Janvier, Sergeant Scott Chaffin, and Sergeant Robert Fox on May 19, 2021 filed by Michael Wolfrom.(Allen, Michele)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 15, 2021
25 25 discov Notice to Take Deposition Thu 04/15 12:09 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael Wolfrom on May 4, 2021 filed by City Of Wilmington.(Tassone-DiNardo, Rosamaria)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 26, 2021
24 24 discov Notice of Service Fri 03/26 1:47 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Document Production filed by Michael Wolfrom.(Allen, Michele)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
23 23 order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 03/24 9:10 AM
SO ORDERED, re22 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Discovery Deadlines to filed by Michael Wolfrom. See stipulation for further details and deadlines. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/24/2021. (fms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 23, 2021
22 22 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Tue 03/23 10:34 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Discovery Deadlines to - filed by Michael Wolfrom. (Allen, Michele)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 17, 2021
21 21 discov Notice of Service Wed 03/17 4:06 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's First Supplemental Set of Interrogatories Directed to Defendant and Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's First Supplmental Request for Production Directed to Defendant re18 Notice of Service filed by City Of Wilmington.(Tassone-DiNardo, Rosamaria)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 12, 2021
20 20 6 pgs order Order Setting Mediation Conferences Fri 03/12 8:12 AM
ORDER Setting Telephonic Mediation Conferences: A Telephonic Mediation Conference is set for 4/28/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/12/2021. (lih)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 05, 2021
19 19 discov Notice of Service Fri 03/05 4:45 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Responses and Objections to Defendant's First Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents filed by Michael Wolfrom.(Allen, Michele)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 15, 2021
18 18 discov Notice of Service Mon 02/15 4:40 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Supplemental Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents filed by Michael Wolfrom.(Allen, Michele)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2021
17 17 discov Notice of Service Fri 01/29 12:20 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant City of Wilmington's First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Plaintiff and Defendant City of Wilmington's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiff filed by City Of Wilmington.(Tassone-DiNardo, Rosamaria)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
16 16 discov Notice of Service Tue 12/15 2:31 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant City of Wilmington's Response to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Defendant City of Wilmington's Response to Plaintiff's First Set of Request for Production of Documents along with Bates Stamped Documents 1 to 827. re14 Notice of Service filed by City Of Wilmington.(Tassone-DiNardo, Rosamaria)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2020
15 15 5 pgs order Order Setting Mediation Conferences Fri 10/30 1:07 PM
ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Mediation Conference is set for 4/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/30/2020. (lih)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
14 14 discov Notice of Service Tue 10/20 1:20 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents filed by Michael Wolfrom.(Allen, Michele)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 09, 2020
order Oral Order 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 10/09 10:20 AM
ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the teleconference previously set in this matter for 10/7/2020 is RESCHEDULED to 10/22/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call by dialing into 302-573-4557. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/9/2020. (lih)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 14, 2020
13 13 discov Notice of Service Mon 09/14 3:37 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Disclosures Made Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) filed by City Of Wilmington.(Tassone-DiNardo, Rosamaria)
Related: [-]
12 12 discov Notice of Service Mon 09/14 3:02 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures filed by Michael Wolfrom.(Allen, Michele)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 09, 2020
11 11 4 pgs order Order Setting Teleconference Wed 09/09 4:05 PM
ORDER Setting Teleconference: plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 10/7/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/9/2020. (lih)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Scheduling Order - General Wed 09/09 2:41 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 10/15/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 10/15/2020. Discovery due by 4/23/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 9/8/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/22/2021. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 1/12/2022 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. A Jury Trial is set for 1/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/9/2020. (nmf)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Proposed Order Wed 09/09 11:30 AM
PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Michael Wolfrom.(Allen, Michele)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
utility Remark Wed 09/09 2:46 PM
The 9/16/2020 Scheduling Conference is canceled per the entry of the unopposed scheduling order at D.I.10 . (nmf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Mediation - Magistrate Judge only Wed 09/09 2:47 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at[LINK:https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/forms/StandingOrderforADR-Mediation.pdf] (cak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
8 8 1 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference Tue 09/01 10:42 AM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 9/16/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. If the parties have no disputes about the scheduling order, the Court will not require the parties to appear at a conference. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/1/2020. (nmf)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2020
7 7 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 08/21 11:08 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint by Michael Wolfrom. (Allen, Michele)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2020
6 6 respm Brief - Opening Brief in Support Fri 08/07 4:33 PM
OPENING BRIEF in Support re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by City Of Wilmington.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/21/2020. (Tassone-DiNardo, Rosamaria)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Dismiss/Fail to State Claim Fri 08/07 4:31 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by City Of Wilmington.(Tassone-DiNardo, Rosamaria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/07 2:39 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by City Of Wilmington.(Tassone-DiNardo, Rosamaria)
Related: [-]
utility - CORRECTING ENTRY Fri 08/07 3:36 PM
CORRECTING ENTRY: The motion to dismiss and opening brief (formerly D.I. Nos. 5 and 6) have been removed from the docket and will be refiled shortly. (fms)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 12, 2020
3 3 service Waiver of Service Exexuted - 60 day ddl Fri 06/12 11:14 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Wolfrom: For City Of Wilmington waiver sent on 6/8/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Allen, Michele)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 27, 2020
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/27 11:50 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 19, 2020
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Tue 05/19 2:03 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/19 2:03 PM
COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against City Of Wilmington - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-2939279.) - filed by Michael Wolfrom. (lak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
service No Summons Issued Tue 05/19 2:04 PM
No Summons Issued. (lak)
Related: [-]