Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Nanette K Laughrey
Case #: 2:20-cv-04088
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 19, 2020
Terminated:Oct 01, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Nov 15, 2020 2:38 AM CST
Defendant
Jason Ambler
401 Monroe St
Jefferson City, MO 65101
Represented By
Paul Francis Gordon
Baty Otto Coronado, P.C.-Kcmo
contact info
Defendant
City of Jefferson, Missouri
320 E. McCarty Street
Jefferson City, MO 65101
Represented By
David S. Baker
Fisher, Patterson, Sayler & Smith - Opks
contact info
Defendant
Mark Edwards
401 Monroe St
Jefferson City, MO 65101
Represented By
Paul Francis Gordon
Baty Otto Coronado, P.C.-Kcmo
contact info
Defendant
Jeremy P Jones
317 Old Gibler Rd.
Jefferson City, MO 65109
Represented By
Beth C. Boggs
Boggs, Avellino, Lach & Boggs, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Sam's East, Inc.
702 SW 8th St.
Bentonville, AR 72716
Represented By
Beth C. Boggs
Boggs, Avellino, Lach & Boggs, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Roger Schroeder
401 Monroe St
Jefferson City, MO 65101
Represented By
David S. Baker
Fisher, Patterson, Sayler & Smith - Opks
contact info
Plaintiff
Brice Lee Walther
903 E. Ash St.
Columbia, MO 65201
Represented By
Matthew B. Woods
Eng & Woods
contact info
Andrew L Veatch
Eng & Woods
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, October 01, 2020
41 41 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Thu 10/01 4:25 PM
Order of Dismissal. The above-styled action is DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event, however, that the settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case, provided that such motion is filed within 45 days of the date of this Order. In addition, the Court retains jurisdiction over enforcement of the settlement agreed to by the parties. Signed on 10/1/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 28, 2020
40 40 discov Certificate of Service Mon 09/28 11:15 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brice Lee Walther of Plaintiffs Notice of Subpoena duces tecum to Missouri Dpeartment of Probation and Parole Custodian of Records filed by Matthew B. Woods on behalf of Plaintiff Brice Lee Walther.(Woods, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Subpoena
Thursday, September 24, 2020
39 39 discov Certificate of Service Thu 09/24 4:30 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jeremy P Jones, Sam's East, Inc. filed by Beth C. Boggs on behalf of Defendants Jeremy P Jones, Sam's East, Inc..(Boggs, Beth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
38 38 discov Certificate of Service Wed 09/23 2:58 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Jefferson, Missouri, Roger Schroeder for their Responses to the 1st ROGS/RFP from Plaintiff and from Sam's East filed by David S. Baker on behalf of Defendants City of Jefferson, Missouri, Roger Schroeder.(Baker, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
37 37 discov Certificate of Service Fri 09/18 11:56 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Ambler, Mark Edwards Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Requests for Production filed by Paul Francis Gordon on behalf of Defendants Jason Ambler, Mark Edwards.(Gordon, Paul)
Related: [-]
36 36 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Fri 09/18 8:38 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. The parties' Joint Motion for Protective Order, Doc.34 , is granted. Prior to filing any document under seal or in redacted form, a party must move for and be granted leave to file the document under seal. Signed on 9/18/2020 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Levin, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2020
35 35 discov Certificate of Service Thu 09/17 12:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brice Lee Walther re29 Certificate of Service Plaintiffs Responses to Defendant Amblers and Edwardss First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Plaintiff and Plaintiffs Responses to Defendant Edwardss First Request for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiff. filed by Matthew B. Woods on behalf of Plaintiff Brice Lee Walther. Related document:29 Certificate of Service filed by Mark Edwards, Jason Ambler.(Woods, Matthew)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Protective Order Thu 09/17 10:37 AM
Joint MOTION for protective order filed by David S. Baker on behalf of Jason Ambler, City of Jefferson, Missouri, Mark Edwards, Jeremy P Jones, Sam's East, Inc., Roger Schroeder. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/1/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Baker, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 09, 2020
33 33 discov Certificate of Service Wed 09/09 1:13 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brice Lee Walther re24 Certificate of Service of Plaintiffs Supplemental Response to Defendant Sams East Incs First Request for Production of Documents Request #9 filed by Matthew B. Woods on behalf of Plaintiff Brice Lee Walther. Related document:24 Certificate of Service filed by Sam's East, Inc., Jeremy P Jones.(Woods, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
32 32 discov Certificate of Service Wed 09/02 4:40 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Ambler, Mark Edwards Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Admissions filed by Paul Francis Gordon on behalf of Defendants Jason Ambler, Mark Edwards.(Gordon, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
31 31 discov Certificate of Service Tue 09/01 2:21 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Jefferson, Missouri, Roger Schroeder for their Responses to Plaintiff's 1st RFA filed by David S. Baker on behalf of Defendants City of Jefferson, Missouri, Roger Schroeder.(Baker, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2020
30 30 discov Certificate of Service Mon 08/31 9:46 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brice Lee Walther re24 Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant Sams East Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production and Defendant Jones's First Set of Interrogatories filed by Matthew B. Woods on behalf of Plaintiff Brice Lee Walther. Related document:24 Certificate of Service filed by Sam's East, Inc., Jeremy P Jones.(Woods, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 27, 2020
29 29 discov Certificate of Service Thu 08/27 4:31 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Ambler, Mark Edwards filed by Paul Francis Gordon on behalf of Defendants Jason Ambler, Mark Edwards.(Gordon, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 26, 2020
28 28 discov Certificate of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures Wed 08/26 8:58 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Matthew B. Woods on behalf of Plaintiff Brice Lee Walther.(Woods, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 25, 2020
27 27 discov Certificate of Service Tue 08/25 1:32 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brice Lee Walther filed by Matthew B. Woods on behalf of Plaintiff Brice Lee Walther.(Woods, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 14, 2020
26 26 discov Certificate of Service Fri 08/14 3:49 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sam's East, Inc. for Discovery Directed to Defendants Roger Schroeder and City of Jefferson filed by Beth C. Boggs on behalf of Defendant Sam's East, Inc..(Boggs, Beth)
Related: [-]
25 25 discov Certificate of Service Fri 08/14 3:47 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sam's East, Inc. for Discovery Directed to Defendants Jason Ambler and Mark Edwards filed by Beth C. Boggs on behalf of Defendant Sam's East, Inc..(Boggs, Beth)
Related: [-]
24 24 discov Certificate of Service Fri 08/14 3:45 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jeremy P Jones, Sam's East, Inc. for Discovery Directed to Plaintiff filed by Beth C. Boggs on behalf of Defendants Jeremy P Jones, Sam's East, Inc..(Boggs, Beth)
Related: [-]
23 23 discov Certificate of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures Fri 08/14 2:26 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Paul Francis Gordon on behalf of Defendants Jason Ambler, Mark Edwards.(Gordon, Paul)
Related: [-]
22 22 discov Certificate of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures Fri 08/14 2:06 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by David S. Baker on behalf of Defendants City of Jefferson, Missouri, Roger Schroeder.(Baker, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
notice Notice of Filing Wed 08/05 1:06 AM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2020
21 21 adr Designation of Mediator Mon 08/03 11:30 AM
DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Wally Bley(Woods, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 23, 2020
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 07/23 4:25 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of Jeremy P Jones, Sam's East, Inc..(Boggs, Beth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2020
19 19 order Rules of trial Thu 07/09 9:54 AM
RULES OF TRIAL. Signed on 7/9/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Scheduling Order Thu 07/09 9:53 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/8/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 7/29/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2021 at 11:00 AM Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City. Jury Trial set for 11/29/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City. Signed on 7/9/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo on PTC
Tuesday, July 07, 2020
17 17 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 07/07 4:31 PM
Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff, and by Defendants Ambler and Edwards, and by City of Jefferson, Missouri, Roger Schroeder. (Baker, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 01, 2020
16 16 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 07/01 5:35 PM
ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. The Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Defendants Sam's East, Inc. and Jeremy Jones, Doc.15 , is granted. These Defendants must file their responsive pleading on or before July 21, 2020. Signed on 07/01/2020 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Thompson, Amy)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 07/01 4:56 PM
MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply filed by Beth C. Boggs on behalf of Jeremy P Jones, Sam's East, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/15/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Boggs, Beth)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/01 4:55 PM
NOTICE of appearance by Beth C. Boggs on behalf of Jeremy P Jones, Sam's East, Inc. (Attorney Beth C. Boggs added to party Jeremy P Jones(pty:dft), Attorney Beth C. Boggs added to party Sam's East, Inc.(pty:dft))(Boggs, Beth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2020
notice Notice of Filing Wed 06/24 1:08 AM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 22, 2020
13 13 17 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 06/22 3:19 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of Jason Ambler, Mark Edwards.(Gordon, Paul)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/22 10:35 AM
NOTICE of appearance by Paul Francis Gordon on behalf of Jason Ambler, Mark Edwards (Attorney Paul Francis Gordon added to party Jason Ambler(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Francis Gordon added to party Mark Edwards(pty:dft))(Gordon, Paul)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Rule 16 Notice Mon 06/22 10:09 AM
ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey.Proposed scheduling order due by 7/13/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 7/6/2020. Signed on 6/22/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 19, 2020
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/19 4:21 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of City of Jefferson, Missouri, Roger Schroeder.(Attorney David S. Baker added to party City of Jefferson, Missouri(pty:dft), Attorney David S. Baker added to party Roger Schroeder(pty:dft))(Baker, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 16, 2020
9 9 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Tue 06/16 8:02 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Brice Lee Walther. Sam's East, Inc. served on 6/10/2020, answer due 7/1/2020. (Woods, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2020
8 8 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Mon 06/15 7:58 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Brice Lee Walther. Jeremy P Jones served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020. (Woods, Matthew)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Mon 06/15 7:57 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Brice Lee Walther. Mark Edwards served on 6/5/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Woods, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
6 6 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Wed 06/10 10:34 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Brice Lee Walther. Jason Ambler served on 6/1/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Woods, Matthew)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Wed 06/10 10:32 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Brice Lee Walther. City of Jefferson, Missouri served on 6/2/2020, answer due 6/23/2020. (Woods, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Wed 06/10 10:29 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Brice Lee Walther. Roger Schroeder served on 6/1/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Woods, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 19, 2020
3 3 order Notice of Pretrial Procedure Tue 05/19 3:14 PM
ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 5/19/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of MAPN Tue 05/19 12:15 PM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (James, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
1 1 48 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 05/19 11:05 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Matthew B. Woods on behalf of Brice Lee Walther. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6863321. Service due by 8/17/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Woods, Matthew) (James, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (5/19/2020) Civil Cover Sheet
service Summons Issued Tue 05/19 1:21 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jason Ambler, City of Jefferson, Missouri, Mark Edwards, Jeremy P Jones, Sam's East, Inc. and Roger Schroeder and emailed to plaintiff's counsel. (Lock, Tania)
Related: [-]