Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Mary S Scriven
Referred: Julie S Sneed
Case #: 8:18-cv-00611
Nature of Suit375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act
Cause31:3730 Qui Tam False Claims Act
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday May 20, 2020 11:01 PM EDT
Defendant
4927 Voorhess Road, LLC
Defendant
Safety Harbor Facility Operations, LLC
Defendant
Genesis Healthcare, LLC
Defendant
Genesis Healthcare, Inc.
Defendant
Genesis Eldercare Rehabilitation Services, LLC
Defendant
Genesis Eldercare Network Services, LLC
Defendant
St. Petersburg Facility Operations, LLC
Defendant
Consulate Management Company, LLC
Defendant
Consulate Management Company
Defendant
Bayonet Point Facility Operations, LLC
Defendant
702 South Kings Avenue Operations, LLC
Defendant
4602 Northgate Court, LLC
Defendant
3865 Tampa Road, LLC
Defendant
3825 Countryside Boulevard Operations, LLC
Defendant
2900 Twelfth Street North, LLC
Defendant
2600 Highlands Boulevard, North LLC
Defendant
1980 Sunset Point Road, LLC
Defendant
1501 SE 24th Road, LLC
Defendant
1465 Oakfield Drive Operations, LLC
Defendant
1240 Pinebrook Road LLC
Movant
United States of America
Represented By
W. Stephen Muldrow
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Sean P. Keefe
Us Attorney'S Office - Flm
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian P. Creadon
Represented By
Sarah Allen Foster
Morgan & Morgan, PA
contact info
James Dennis Young
Morgan & Morgan, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, August 20, 2020
26 26 2 pgs order Order dismissing case Thu 08/20 2:34 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/20/2020. (GMD) Modified on 8/20/2020 (GMD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 18, 2020
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Tue 08/18 9:08 AM
NOTICE by United States of America re24 Notice of voluntary dismissal (Keefe, Sean)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 17, 2020
24 24 notice Notice of voluntary dismissal Mon 08/17 9:59 AM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Brian P. Creadon, United States of America (Young, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2020
23 23 misc Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Mon 06/15 4:46 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re22 Interested persons order by Brian P. Creadon identifying Other Affiliate Brian P. Creadon for Brian P. Creadon..(Young, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Main Document Corporate Disclosure Statement
Monday, June 01, 2020
22 22 4 pgs order Interested persons order Mon 06/01 1:57 PM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/15/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/1/2020. (KAC)
Related: [-]
21 21 10 pgs order Related case order and track 2 notice Mon 06/01 1:56 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/15/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/1/2020. (KAC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 19, 2020
20 20 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 05/19 10:10 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Mary S. Scriven. New case number: 8:18-cv-611-T-35JSS. Judge James S. Moody, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (JNB)
Related: [-]
19 19 2 pgs order Order Tue 05/19 8:51 AM
ORDER : The complaint, notice of election to decline intervention, and the resulting order are unsealed . The seal shall be lifted as to all other matters occurring in this action after the date of this Order. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 5/15/2020. (MCB) Modified on 5/19/2020 (MCB).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
18 18 3 pgs notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/19 8:46 AM
NOTICE of election to decline intervention by United States of America.(By: BN)(MCB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 13, 2018
1 1 42 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA49364) filed by Brian P. Creadon. (By: BN) (MCB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet