Colorado District Court
Judge:Philip A Brimmer
Case #: 1:20-cv-01440
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 20, 2020
Terminated:May 25, 2022
Case in other court:Denver District Court, 2020CV31454
Last checked: Monday Nov 16, 2020 3:30 AM MST
Defendant
First Transit, Inc.
Represented By
William A. Rogers, III
Dietze & Davis, P.C.
contact info
Nathan Andrew Klotz
Dietze & Davis, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jody Strogoff
Represented By
Ethan Andrew McQuinn
Dan Caplis Law Firm LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
38 38 misc Stipulation of Dismissal of Case Wed 05/25 4:49 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case With Prejudice by Plaintiff Jody Strogoff. (McQuinn, Ethan)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC Thu 05/26 7:01 PM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to38 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case With Prejudice filed in this case. Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 20, 2021
order Minute Order Mon 09/20 4:54 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/20/2021. The Trial Preparation Conference is re-set for 10/7/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 701 before Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. A five-day Jury Trial re-set for 10/24/2022 at 8:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Please refer to the Order Setting Case for Trial [Docket No.34 ] for additional information. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 14, 2021
order Order on Motion to Continue Tue 09/14 10:42 AM
ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/14/2021 re:35 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial is GRANTED. Counsel shall jointly contact Chambers via conference call (303-335-2794) or email (Brimmer_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov) no later than September 22, 2021 to reschedule the trial preparation conference and jury trial. Text Only Entry(pabsec)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 13, 2021
35 35 motion Continue Mon 09/13 3:25 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial by Defendant First Transit, Inc.. (Rogers, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
34 34 3 pgs order Order Tue 09/07 3:21 PM
ORDER Setting Case for Trial by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/7/2021. A five-day Jury Trial set for 7/18/2022 08:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 7/1/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 701 before Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. ORDERED in the absence of a previously-imposed deadline, all motions to exclude expert testimony must be filed sixty days before the trial preparation conference. Fourteen days before the trial preparation conference, counsel and any pro se party shall submit proposed jury instructions and verdict forms. (sphil, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 02, 2021
33 33 order Pretrial Order Thu 09/02 3:54 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/2/2021. (babia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Plaintiff's Exhibit List,
Att: 2 Defendant's Exhibit List
32 32 minutes Pretrial Conference - Final ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 09/02 3:38 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for Final Pretrial Conference proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/2/2021. Pretrial Order APPROVED and SIGNED. The 5-day Jury Trial is set to begin on 7/18/2022 08:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. The Trial Preparation Conference is set for 7/1/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 701 before Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. FTR: B. Abiakam. (babia)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 27, 2021
31 31 trial Exhibit List Fri 08/27 8:54 AM
Exhibit List by Plaintiff Jody Strogoff. (McQuinn, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 26, 2021
30 30 misc Proposed Pretrial Order Thu 08/26 5:36 PM
Proposed Pretrial Order by Defendant First Transit, Inc..(Klotz, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff Exhibit List,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Exhibit List
Monday, August 16, 2021
order Minute Order Mon 08/16 8:57 AM
MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the Court upon its review of28 Proposed Final Pretrial Order (the "Proposed Order"). In the Proposed Order, the parties state that they will "file their witness [and exhibit] lists at least seven days before the trial preparation conference" pursuant to Chief Judge Brimmer's Practice Standards. Chief Judge Brimmer's Practice Standards, however, require that the parties utilize the Final Pretrial Order form available on the Court's website, and that form requires the parties to list their proposed witnesses and exhibits in a specific format in the proposed final pretrial order. Accordingly, the Proposed Order is STRICKEN and the parties shall submit a revised joint Proposed Pretrial Order by 8/26/2021 that includes their proposed witnesses and exhibits in the format prescribed in the Court's form. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2021 11:15 AM is VACATED and RESET for 9/2/2021 09:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties may participate in the conference telephonically by calling 888.808.6929 at the scheduled time and utilizing access code: 2805116#. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/16/2021. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 13, 2021
28 28 misc Proposed Pretrial Order Fri 08/13 3:35 PM
Proposed Pretrial Order by Defendant First Transit, Inc.. (Klotz, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 28, 2021
27 27 order Minute Order Wed 07/28 11:45 AM
MINUTE ORDER Per the request of the parties, the Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2021 09:00 AM is VACATED and RESET for 8/18/2021 11:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties may participate in the conference telephonically by calling 888.808.6929 at the scheduled time and utilizing access code: 2805116#. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. The parties shall submit a joint Proposed Pretrial Order by 8/11/2021. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/28/2021. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
26 26 minutes Discovery Hearing Tue 03/30 11:51 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for Telephonic Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/30/2021. FTR: 402. (morti, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 15, 2021
25 25 order Minute Order Mon 03/15 3:17 PM
MINUTE ORDER Per the request of the parties, this matter is set for a Telephonic Discovery Hearing on 3/30/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall participate in the hearing by calling 888.808.6929 at the scheduled time and utilizing access code: 2805116#. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. Pursuant to Magistrate Judge Varholak's Practice Standards, on or before 3/24/2021, the parties shall submit via email to Varholak_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov a brief joint statement setting forth the issues in dispute. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/15/2021. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 18, 2020
24 24 order Scheduling Order Tue 08/18 11:33 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/18/2020. (slibi, )
Related: [-]
23 23 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/18 11:32 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 8/18/2020. Discovery due by 4/26/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 5/26/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. FTR: Courtroom A402. (slibi, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2020
22 22 order Minute Order Fri 08/07 4:38 PM
MINUTE ORDER The parties shall participate in the Scheduling Conference set for 8/18/2020 11:15 AM TELEPHONICALLY by calling 888.808.6929 at the scheduled time and utilizing access code: 2805116#. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/07/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 20, 2020
21 21 order Minute Order Mon 07/20 12:06 PM
MINUTE ORDER Per the request of the parties, the Scheduling Conference set for 8/18/2020 09:30 AM is VACATED and RESET for 8/18/2020 11:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/20/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
Related: [-]
20 20 order Minute Order Mon 07/20 10:54 AM
MINUTE ORDER This matter is set for a Scheduling Conference on 8/18/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/20/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 07/20 8:00 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for non-dispositive matters . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/20/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 17, 2020
18 18 order Minute Order Fri 07/17 4:18 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/17/2020, re:17 Response to Order to Show Cause, filed by First Transit, Inc. ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause [Docket No. 14] is hereby DISCHARGED . (sphil, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 16, 2020
17 17 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Thu 07/16 4:04 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re14 by Defendant First Transit, Inc..(Klotz, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Email Exchange,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Assessor's Property Summary,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Registered Voter Information
Monday, July 13, 2020
16 16 order Minute Order Mon 07/13 6:19 PM
MINUTE ORDER In light of14 Order to Show Cause, the Scheduling Conference set for 7/17/2020 09:15 AM is VACATED to be reset if the Order to Show Cause is discharged. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/13/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2020
15 15 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Thu 07/09 10:40 AM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant First Transit, Inc.. (Klotz, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 07, 2020
14 14 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 07/07 1:40 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/7/2020. ORDERED that, on or before July 16, 2020 , defendant shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed due to the Court's lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (sphil, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 06, 2020
13 13 order Minute Order Mon 07/06 4:28 PM
MINUTE ORDER The parties shall participate in the Scheduling Conference set for 7/17/2020 9:15 AM TELEPHONICALLY by calling 888.808.6929 at the scheduled time and utilizing access code: 2805116#. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. The Court thanks the parties in advance for their patience and flexibility as the Court implements this new technology. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/06/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Letter Reassigning Case Mon 07/06 3:03 PM
CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to11 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-v-01440-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2020
11 11 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Thu 07/02 3:07 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant First Transit, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Klotz, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
10 10 2 pgs order Order Tue 05/26 11:35 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/26/20 Setting Deadline for Filing Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction Form and Setting Scheduling Conference. Consent Form due by 7/2/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/10/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 7/17/2020 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (nmarb, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 22, 2020
9 9 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Fri 05/22 3:04 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, )
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs misc Memorandum Returning Case Fri 05/22 3:03 PM
MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-1440-STV (angar, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 21, 2020
7 7 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 05/21 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Ethan A. McQuinn by Ethan Andrew McQuinn on behalf of Jody StrogoffAttorney Ethan Andrew McQuinn added to party Jody Strogoff(pty:pla) (McQuinn, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 20, 2020
6 6 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Thu 05/21 8:55 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Case Assigned to Judge Thu 05/21 8:53 AM
Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases Thu 05/21 8:51 AM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Complaint Thu 05/21 8:50 AM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against First Transit, Inc., filed by Jody Strogoff.(cmadr, )
Related: [-]
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/20 3:07 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Jody H. Strogoff.(Rogers, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 05/20 3:03 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jody H. Strogoff from Denver District Court, Case Number 2020V31454. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7303940), filed by Jody H. Strogoff.(Rogers, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 A-State Court Complaint and Jury Demand,
Att: 2 B-State Court Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 C-1 2020-04-23 Complaint and Jury Demand,
Att: 4 C-2 2020-04-23 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 C-3 2020-04-23 Summons to First Transit, Inc.,
Att: 6 C-4 2020-04-23 Delay Reduction Order,
Att: 7 C-5 2020-04-23 Pre-Trial Order,
Att: 8 D-State Court Notice of Removal,
Att: 9 E-District Court Civil Cover Sheet