Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mindy A Mora
Case #: 9:20-bk-15548
Case Filed:May 20, 2020
Creditor Meeting:Jun 15, 2020
Discharge Objection Deadline:Aug 14, 2020

Debtor
BLUE SKY WIRELESS, LLC
2255 Glades Rd Ste 324A
Boca Raton, FL 33431-8571
Represented By
Christina V Paradowski
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Deborah Menotte
POB 211087
West Palm Beach, FL 33421
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 05/21/2020 12:06 AM EDT
Wednesday, May 20, 2020
1 1 7 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Ch 7 [ECF] Wed 05/20 6:30 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $335] (Paradowski, Christina)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) Wed 05/20 6:38 PM
Meeting of Creditors to be held on 06/15/2020 at 09:30 AM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. (Paradowski, Christina)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 05/20 6:41 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor BLUE SKY WIRELESS, LLC. (Paradowski, Christina)
Related: [-]