IntelliShop, LLC v. HS Brands International, Inc.
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jack Zouhary |
Case #: | 3:20-cv-01113 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | May 21, 2020 |
Terminated: | Oct 23, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Wood County Common Pleas, 2020 CV 0218 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 17, 2020 5:17 AM EST |
Defendant
HS Brands International, Inc.
150 E. Gay St., Ste. 2400
Columbus, OH 43215 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
IntelliShop, LLC
2025 Michael Owens Way
Perrysburg, OH 43551 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, October 23, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 10/23 1:16 PM
Order of Case Dismissal approving19 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1). Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/23/2020. (D,L) |
|
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 10/23 1:16 PM
Order of Case Dismissal approving19 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1). Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/23/2020. (D,L) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Dismissal
Fri 10/23 12:28 PM
Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by IntelliShop, LLC. (Chappell, Erik) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Dismissal
Fri 10/23 12:28 PM
Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by IntelliShop, LLC. (Chappell, Erik) |
|
Friday, October 16, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
order
Stipulation & Order
Fri 10/16 4:35 PM
Stipulation & Order approving17 Proposed Stipulation and Order Extending Deadline for Amending Pleadings and Adding Parties Set Forth within Case Management Conference Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/16/2020. (D,L) |
|
Thursday, October 15, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Stipulation (atty event)
Thu 10/15 4:34 PM
Proposed Stipulation and Order Extending Deadline for Amending Pleadings and Adding Parties Set Forth within Case Management Conference Order filed by IntelliShop, LLC. (Chappell, Erik) |
|
Thursday, August 20, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
minutes
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Minute Order _ Case Management Conference
Thu 08/20 2:24 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER . CMC held on 8/20/20. Case is assigned to the Standard Track with trial in AUGUST 2021 . Case does involve electronic discovery. See attached Order for detail. Counsel are reminded to follow the amended Civil Rules re proportional discovery and civility. Counsel will stage depositions pursuant to 2015 Civil Rules amendments. See attached Civil Case Management Procedures. Discovery deadlines: Expert disclosures: Affirmative experts due by 1/18/21, Responsive experts due by 2/15/21; Expert reports due by 2/19/21, Responsive reports due by 3/12/21; Liability/Damages due by 4/19/21. Expert depositions and dispositive motions require prior Court approval. See attached Order for briefing requirements. Failure to follow will result in Clerk striking the briefing. Defendant is looking into a potential Motion to Dismiss and/or Motion to Transfer. Counsel shall follow Court's Civil Case Management Procedures. Counsel may reach out to this Court within the next 30 days to further discuss. Counsel shall file a brief Joint Status Report by 1/15/21. (30 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/20/20. (S,Na) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Case Management Procedures | ||
Monday, August 17, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event)
Mon 08/17 4:45 PM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by IntelliShop, LLC. (Chappell, Erik) |
|
Thursday, August 06, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Attorney Substitution (atty event)
Thu 08/06 9:38 AM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Jordan D. Rauch and adding attorney David A. Lockshaw, Jr filed by on behalf of HS Brands International, Inc.. (Lockshaw, David) |
|
Tuesday, July 21, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
minutes
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Case Management Conference Scheduling Order
Tue 07/21 12:42 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE NOTICE . Court reviewed and approves the Joint Status Report (Doc.12 ). Case Management Conference set for 8/20/20 at 11:00 AM. Counsel shall immediately advise Court if case resolves prior to that date. Counsel may participate by phone, and party attendance is not required. Initial Disclosures shall be exchanged no later than 2 weeks prior to the CMC. Report of Parties' Planning Meeting due 3 days prior the CMC. Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/21/20. (S,Na) |
|
Monday, July 20, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Status Report (atty event)
Mon 07/20 4:12 PM
Joint Status Report filed by All Plaintiffs. (Chappell, Erik) |
|
Monday, July 06, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
Mon 07/06 3:45 PM
Marginal Entry Order granting9 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney J. Alex Grimsley for HS Brands International, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/6/2020.(D,L) |
|
Att: 1 ACTL Code of Conduct | ||
10 | 10
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
Mon 07/06 3:42 PM
Marginal Entry Order granting8 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Amanda Newman for HS Brands International, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/6/2020.(D,L) |
|
Att: 1 ACTL Code of Conduct | ||
Monday, June 29, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 06/29 2:59 PM
Motion for attorney J. Alex Grimsley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number BOHNDC-10073152, filed by Defendant HS Brands International, Inc..(Rauch, Jordan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 06/29 2:51 PM
Motion for attorney Amanda Newman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 079780, filed by Defendant HS Brands International, Inc..(Rauch, Jordan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 06/29 2:42 PM
Motion for attorney J. Alex Grimsley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number BOHNDC-10073152, filed by Defendant HS Brands International, Inc..(Rauch, Jordan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Tuesday, June 02, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
minutes
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Minute Order _ Telephone Conference
Tue 06/02 2:23 PM
ORDER . Initial Phone Status held on 6/2/20. After discussion, counsel agreed as follows: complete initial disclosures; discuss potential resolution; all legal filings stayed until further Order of this Court; and file brief Joint Status Report by 7/20/20. (30 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 6/2/20. (S,Na) |
|
Monday, June 01, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event)
Mon 06/01 1:52 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by IntelliShop, LLC. (Chappell, Erik) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event)
Mon 06/01 1:03 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by HS Brands International, Inc.. (Rauch, Jordan) |
|
Friday, May 29, 2020 | ||
oth_evt
Notice of Hearing or Conference
Fri 05/29 12:00 PM
NOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 6/2/20 at 10:00 AM (EDT) before Judge Jack Zouhary. This Court will initiate the call. No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Phone Status. (S,Na) |
||
Wednesday, May 27, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Extension (answer complaint)
Wed 05/27 1:06 PM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time to Plead or Otherwise Move in Response to the Complaint until June 29, 2020 filed by Defendant HS Brands International, Inc.. (Rauch, Jordan) Modified on 5/27/2020 (K,AR) |
|
order
Order on Motion for extension of time to answer
Wed 05/27 1:19 PM
Order [non-document] granting3 Unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer. HS Brands International, Inc. - Answer now due 6/29/2020. Judge Jack Zouhary on 5/27/2020.(D,L) |
||
Thursday, May 21, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
oth_evt
Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake
Thu 05/21 2:15 PM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. (K,AR) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 05/21 1:03 PM
Notice of Removal from Wood County Common Pleas, case number 2020CV0218 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-9992182. Filed by HS Brands International, Inc.. (Rauch, Jordan) |
|
Att: 1 11 pgs Exhibit Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Wood County Pleadings, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Pleading Corporate Disclosure Statement | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Thu 05/21 2:10 PM
Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (K,AR) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Thu 05/21 2:13 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (K,AR) |