Advanced Orthopedics & Pain Management, P.L.
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mindy A Mora |
Case #: | 9:20-bk-15598 |
Case Filed: | May 21, 2020 |
Claims Deadline: | Jul 30, 2020 |
Terminated: | Sep 17, 2024 |
Plan Confirmed: | Dec 21, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Health Care Business |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Advanced Orthopedics & Pain Management, P.L.
3355 Burns Rd Ste 304
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410-4357 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
Docket last updated: 46 minutes ago |
Tuesday, September 17, 2024 | ||
307 | 307
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 09/17 12:35 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Adam, Lorraine) |