Townsend v. Merchant E-Solutions, Inc.
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Leigh Martin May |
Referred: | Linda T Walker |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-02141 |
Nature of Suit | 751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act |
Cause | 29:2601 Family and Medical Leave Act |
Case Filed: | May 19, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jan 07, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 15, 2020 7:22 AM EST |
Defendant
Merchant E-Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Travelers Bond & Financial Products
|
|
Plaintiff
Lanisha Townsend
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, January 07, 2021 | ||
misc
Clerks Entry of Dismissal
Thu 01/07 9:37 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING29 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (jpk) |
||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Thu 01/07 9:39 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker terminated from case. (jpk) |
||
Wednesday, January 06, 2021 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 01/06 2:29 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Merchant E-Solutions, Inc.. (Mocek, Joyce) |
|
Monday, December 14, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 12/15 9:48 AM
ORDER granting27 Motion for Extension of Time. This matter is before the Court on the parties' Joint Motion to Extend all Post- Discovery Deadlines. In light of the parties' upcoming mediation and the Court's Order granting an extension of the discovery period, the parties' Motion is hereby GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that all post-discovery deadlines be extended by sixty-four (64) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 12/14/2020. (tmf) |
|
Friday, December 11, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 12/11 5:59 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time ALL POST-DISCOVERY DEADLINES by Merchant E-Solutions, Inc..(Mocek, Joyce) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, December 10, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Thu 12/10 12:54 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery ends on 2/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 12/9/2020. (tmf) |
|
Wednesday, December 09, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 12/09 10:00 AM
NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (ddm) (ADI) |
|
Tuesday, December 08, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Tue 12/08 9:33 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Merchant E-Solutions, Inc..(Mocek, Joyce) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 17, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 11/17 5:17 PM
NOTICE by Merchant E-Solutions, Inc. Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoenas for Production of Documents (Mocek, Joyce) |
|
Wednesday, October 14, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
discov
Certificate of Service
Wed 10/14 5:25 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Defendant Merchant E-Solutions, Inc.'s Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Production) by Merchant E-Solutions, Inc..(Mocek, Joyce) |
|
21 | 21
discov
Certificate of Service
Wed 10/14 5:24 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Defendant Merchant E-Solutions, Inc.'s Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories) by Merchant E-Solutions, Inc..(Mocek, Joyce) |
|
Tuesday, September 29, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 09/29 8:55 AM
EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (adg) (ADI) |
|
Wednesday, September 02, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 09/02 11:47 AM
SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (aaq) (ADI) |
|
Monday, August 31, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
discov
Certificate of Service
Mon 08/31 12:53 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant and Plaintiff's First Request for Production to Defendant by Lanisha Townsend.(Hall, Anthony) |
|
Friday, August 28, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 08/28 4:14 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Merchant E-Solutions, Inc. for Defendant's First Requests for Production of Documents and Things toPlaintiff (Mocek, Joyce) |
|
16 | 16
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 08/28 4:12 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Merchant E-Solutions, Inc. for Defendant's First Interrogatories to Plaintiff (Mocek, Joyce) |
|
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice
Fri 08/28 12:45 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR DISCOVERY AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT PRACTICE: re:12 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery will end on December 24, 2020. Any motions for summary judgment must be filed by January 25, 2021, and if no motions for summary judgment are filed, the Proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order will be due on January 27, 2021. If a motion for summary judgment is filed, the Consolidated Pretrial Order will be due thirty (30) days after the District Court's final ruling on the motion for summary judgment, if there are matters left to be tried. See order for further specifics. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 8/28/2020. (tmf) |
|
Wednesday, August 26, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
discov
Certificate of Service
Wed 08/26 5:37 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Lanisha Townsend.(Hall, Anthony) |
|
13 | 13
discov
Certificate of Service
Wed 08/26 4:39 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Defendant's Initial Disclosures by Merchant E-Solutions, Inc..(Mocek, Joyce) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan
Wed 08/26 4:16 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Merchant E-Solutions, Inc.. (Mocek, Joyce) |
|
Tuesday, August 04, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 08/04 11:59 AM
SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (jpa) (ADI) |
|
misc
Clerks Notation for LOA/CIP
Tue 08/04 4:31 PM
Clerks Notation re9 Certificate of Interested Persons (rlb) |
||
Tuesday, July 28, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/28 2:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie Pulley on behalf of Merchant E-Solutions, Inc. (Pulley, Natalie) |
|
Monday, July 27, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons
Mon 07/27 1:48 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Merchant E-Solutions, Inc.. (Mocek, Joyce) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/27 1:47 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by Merchant E-Solutions, Inc.. Discovery ends on 12/24/2020.(Mocek, Joyce) |
|
Monday, July 13, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 07/13 8:43 AM
FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI) |
|
Thursday, July 02, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 07/02 10:36 AM
FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI) |
|
Thursday, June 04, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 06/04 10:18 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lanisha Townsend. Merchant E-Solutions, Inc. waiver mailed on 5/28/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Hall, Anthony) |
|
Wednesday, May 27, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 05/27 8:56 AM
THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (dgs) (ADI) |
|
Thursday, May 21, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 05/21 12:22 PM
SECOND AMENDMENT TO THE GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/30/20. (eop) |
|
Tuesday, May 19, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 05/21 12:20 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Merchant E-Solutions, Inc.. (eop) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 05/21 12:19 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Lanisha Townsend. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9711259)(eop) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |