Member Case
Lead case is: 1:20-bk-11204

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 15
Judge:John T Dorsey
Case #: 1:20-bk-11207
Case Filed:May 22, 2020
Terminated:Jun 24, 2021

Debtor
JustFly Inc.

,
Represented By
JustFly Inc.
contact info
Last checked: never
Foreign Representative
FlightHub Group Inc.
Represented By
FlightHub Group Inc.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 37 minutes ago
Thursday, June 24, 2021
court Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 06/24 3:15 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (JS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 23, 2021
4 4 order Final Decree Wed 06/23 10:32 AM
Order Approving Entry of Final Decree Related [+] Signed on 6/23/2021 (RC)
Related: [-] ument(s)1
Friday, May 22, 2020
3 3 order Order-Joint Admin Fri 05/22 6:05 PM
Order (A) Directing Joint Administration of Cases Under Chapter 15 of the Bankruptcy Code and (B) Authorizing the Filing of a Consolidated List Under Bankruptcy Rule 1007. An order has been entered in this chapter 15 case in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 15 cases of: JustFly Corp., Case No. 20-11204 (JTD); FlightHub Group Inc., Case No. 20-11205 (JTD); FlightHub Service Inc., Case No. 20-11206 (JTD); JustFly Inc., Case No. 20-11207 (JTD); SSFP Corp., Case No. 20-11208 (JTD); and 11644670 Canada Inc., Case No. 20-11209 (JTD). The docket in Case No. 20-11204 (JTD) should be consulted for all matters affecting this chapter 15 case. Signed on 5/22/2020 (RC)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Joint Administration - Motion Fri 05/22 9:36 AM
Motion for Joint Administration of Cases Under Chapter 15 of the Bankruptcy Code and Authorizing the Filing of a Consolidated List Under Bankruptcy Rule 1007 Filed by FlightHub Group Inc., JustFly Inc.. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order
1 1 misc RETIRED - Petition Foreign Proceeding (Chapter 15) Fri 05/22 4:46 AM
Chapter 15 Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding. Filed by FlightHub Group Inc., JustFly Inc.. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Fri 05/22 8:20 AM
Judge John T. Dorsey added to case (SH)
Related: [-]