Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11316

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:20-ap-50605
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:May 22, 2020
Terminated:Nov 30, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
FNAPath PLLC
25 Valley Estates Drive
Little Rock, AR 72212
Represented By
FNAPath PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Don A. Beskrone
Ashby & Geddes P.O. Box 272
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Benjamin W. Keenan
Ashby & Geddes
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, November 30, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Mon 11/30 8:43 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50605 Closed (LBr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 25, 2020
13 13 notice Dismissal - Notice Wed 11/25 4:26 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Don A. Beskrone (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, November 09, 2020
12 12 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Mon 11/09 4:42 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Don A. Beskrone. Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2020 at 12:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Mon 11/09 1:53 PM
Order Approving Settlement of Certain Preference and/or Fraudulent Transfer Claims Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Related [+] Order Signed on 11/9/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 8
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Mon 11/09 11:16 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Don A. Beskrone. Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2020 at 12:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Mon 11/09 11:01 AM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Motion of Don A. Beskrone, Chapter 7 Trustee, to Approve Settlement of Certain Preference and/or Fraudulent Transfer Claims Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Filed by Don A. Beskrone. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 22, 2020
8 8 motion Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion Thu 10/22 3:51 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 //Motion of Don A. Beskrone, Chapter 7 Trustee, to Approve Settlement of Certain Preference and/or Fraudulent Transfer Claims Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Filed by Don A. Beskrone. Objections due by 11/5/2020. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 09/02 4:16 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Don A. Beskrone. Hearing scheduled for 9/3/2020 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Scheduling Order Wed 09/02 3:17 PM
Scheduling Order The case judge is Laurie Selber Silverstein. Signed on 9/2/2020. (LJJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
5 5 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Tue 09/01 11:21 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Don A. Beskrone. Hearing scheduled for 9/3/2020 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2020
4 4 misc Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 08/31 12:10 PM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Don A. Beskrone. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 22, 2020
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 05/22 10:49 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant FNAPath PLLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 9/3/2020 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 7/21/2020. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Att: 2 Certificate Pursuant to Del. Bankr. L.R. 9019-5(i)(j)
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 05/22 10:34 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50605 LSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9785271, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 05/22 10:30 AM
Adversary case 20-50605 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Don A. Beskrone against FNAPath PLLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)). AP Summons Served due date: 8/20/2020. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A