California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Catherine E Bauer
Case #: 8:14-bk-12713
Case Filed:May 01, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Jun 13, 2014
Claims Deadline:Jul 20, 2014
Dismissed:Mar 23, 2015
Terminated:Jun 26, 2015
Discharge Objection Deadline:Aug 12, 2014

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Easy Life Furniture Inc.
6101 Knott Ave
Buena Park, CA 90620-1031
Represented By
Ori Katz
contact info
Robert K Sahyan
contact info
Michael M Lauter
Sheppard Mullin
contact info
Evan D Smiley
Smiley Wang-Ekvall, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Shirley Cho
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 9041
Santa Ana, CA 92701
Represented By
Michael J Hauser
contact info
Elizabeth A Lossing
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, June 26, 2015
354 354 court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 06/26 7:48 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing the above referenced case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the case is closed. Related [+] (Allen, Gloria)
Related: [-] 16 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12, 46 Hearing (Bk Motion) Continued, 63 Hearing (Bk Motion) Continued,146 Notice of Bar Date For Filing Proofs of Claim (Ch 11) (LBR 3001-1) filed by Debtor Easy Life Furniture Inc., Special Counsel Easy Life Furniture Inc.,281 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor Easy Life Furniture Inc., Special Counsel Easy Life Furniture Inc., 282 Hearing (Bk Motion) Set, 286 Hearing (Bk Motion) Set,295 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor Easy Life Furniture Inc., Special Counsel Easy Life Furniture Inc., 296 Hearing (Bk Motion) Set