California Central District Court
Judge:Margaret M Morrow
Referred: Carla Woehrle
Case #: 2:14-cv-03305
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2014
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 20, 2015 8:44 PM PST
Defendant
Katja Motion Picture Corp
Represented By
Michelle Inouye Schultz
Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.
contact info
Matthew T Kline
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
New Line Productions Inc
Represented By
Michelle Inouye Schultz
Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.
contact info
Matthew T Kline
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc
Represented By
Michelle Inouye Schultz
Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.
contact info
Matthew T Kline
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Terry T. Gerritsen
Represented By
Glen L Kulik
Kulik Gottesman And Siegel LLP
contact info
Natalie Wright
Kulik Gottesman Mouton And Siegel LLP
contact info


1. Judge downs Gravity lawsuit from bestselling author Tess Gerritsen (theguardian.com)
Submitted Mon 02/02/2015
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, June 29, 2015
49 49 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Mon 06/29 9:48 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Terry T. Gerritsen. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Kulik, Glen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 17, 2015
48 48 order Order Wed 06/17 2:25 PM
ORDER MODIFYING FILING SCHEDULE IN CONNECTION WITH PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Margaret M. Morrow, re Stipulation47 : Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiff will file any Second Amended Complaint by no later than July 9, 2015; and 2. Defendants will file their response to the Second Amended Complaint by no later than July 31, 2015. (bm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 16, 2015
47 47 stip Order Tue 06/16 4:51 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Order RE: MODIFIED FILING SCHEDULE IN CONNECTION WITH PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendants Katja Motion Picture Corp, New Line Productions Inc, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.(Kline, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, June 12, 2015
46 46 order Dismiss Fri 06/12 3:44 PM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT33 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: The court strikes plaintiff's new claims for breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing under Rule 12(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. It grants defendants' motion to dismiss the first amended complaint. Gerritsen may file an amended complaint within twenty (20) days of the date of this order. (ah)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 11, 2015
45 45 notice Appearance Mon 05/11 12:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Laura E Lorenz on behalf of Defendants Katja Motion Picture Corp, New Line Productions Inc, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc (Attorney Laura E Lorenz added to party Katja Motion Picture Corp(pty:dft), Attorney Laura E Lorenz added to party New Line Productions Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Laura E Lorenz added to party Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc(pty:dft))(Lorenz, Laura)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2015
44 44 respm Reply (Motion related) Wed 05/06 8:55 AM
REPLY In Support Of MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 33 filed by Defendants Katja Motion Picture Corp, New Line Productions Inc, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. (Kline, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 05, 2015
43 43 respm Reply (Motion related) Tue 05/05 1:36 PM
REPLY In Support Of REQUEST for Consideration of sources incorporated by reference in Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint34 filed by Defendants Katja Motion Picture Corp, New Line Productions Inc, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. (Pearson, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 29, 2015
42 42 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Wed 04/29 3:23 PM
Objection in Opposition re: REQUEST for Consideration of sources incorporated by reference in Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint34 filed by Plaintiff Terry T. Gerritsen. (Kulik, Glen)
Related: [-]
41 41 respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Wed 04/29 3:21 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 33 filed by Plaintiff Terry T. Gerritsen. (Kulik, Glen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 02, 2015
40 40 order Stipulation and Order Fri 04/03 3:19 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: re Stipulation for Order,39 . Plaintiff's opposition to motion to dismiss due April 29, 2105. Defendant's reply due May 6, 2015. See order for details. (ah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 24, 2015
39 39 stip Order Tue 03/24 2:41 PM
STIPULATION for Order re: MODIFIED BRIEFING SCHEDULE IN CONNECTION WITH DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendants Katja Motion Picture Corp, New Line Productions Inc, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.(Kline, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
38 38 testxtonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 03/24 10:54 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Striking Stipulation to Expedite Briefing Schedule by Judge Margaret M. Morrow re: Stipulation to Expedite,36 . Separate proposed order not attached. See L.R. 52-4.1: Separate Order. A separate proposed order shall be submitted with any stipulation, application, motion, or request of the parties requiring an order of the court. If the proposed order is the result of a stipulation, the pertinent elements requested in the stipulation shall be set forth in the order. Unless the filer is exempted from electronic filing pursuant to L.R. 5-4.2(a), the proposed order shall be submitted as provided in L.R. 5-4.4. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kss)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 23, 2015
37 37 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) Mon 03/23 4:10 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Joint Stipulation Re: Modified Briefing Schedule36 . (bm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 20, 2015
36 36 stip Expedite Fri 03/20 2:03 PM
STIPULATION to Expedite Briefing Schedule in Connection with Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Not Altering or Impacting Hearing Date) filed by Defendants Katja Motion Picture Corp, New Line Productions Inc, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.(Kline, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 09, 2015
35 35 respm Declaration (Motion related) Mon 03/09 1:12 PM
DECLARATION of Matthew T. Kline in support of MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 33 , REQUEST for Consideration of sources incorporated by reference in Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint34 filed by Defendants Katja Motion Picture Corp, New Line Productions Inc, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.(Kline, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits A through F,
Att: 2 Exhibits G through M
34 34 motion Consideration Mon 03/09 1:05 PM
REQUEST for Consideration of sources incorporated by reference in Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by defendants Katja Motion Picture Corp, New Line Productions Inc, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. Request set for hearing on 6/15/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow.(Attorney Ashley K Pearson added to party Katja Motion Picture Corp(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley K Pearson added to party New Line Productions Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley K Pearson added to party Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc(pty:dft))(Pearson, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
33 33 motion Dismiss (cause or other) Mon 03/09 12:42 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by defendants Katja Motion Picture Corp, New Line Productions Inc, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. Motion set for hearing on 6/15/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow.(Kline, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 02, 2015
32 32 order For Order Mon 03/02 4:30 PM
(IN CHAMBERS): ORDER Re: Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Clarification29 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: Gerritsen may not take discovery until she has made showing. See order for details. (ah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 25, 2015
31 31 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Wed 02/25 8:25 AM
Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Clarification of Scheduling Order Regarding Fact Discovery Cutoff 29 filed by Defendants Katja Motion Picture Corp, New Line Productions Inc, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.(Kline, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Of Matthew T. Kline,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-H
Tuesday, February 24, 2015
30 30 misc Errata Tue 02/24 2:30 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Terry T. Gerritsen. correcting EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Clarification of Scheduling Order Regarding Fact Discovery Cutoff 29 (Kulik, Glen)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Order Tue 02/24 1:22 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Clarification of Scheduling Order Regarding Fact Discovery Cutoff filed by Plaintiff Terry T. Gerritsen.(Kulik, Glen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 19, 2015
28 28 25 pgs othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Thu 02/19 1:15 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Katja Motion Picture Corp, New Line Productions Inc, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc amending Complaint - (Discovery),1 , filed by Plaintiff Terry T. Gerritsen(Kulik, Glen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Thursday, February 05, 2015
27 27 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Thu 02/05 4:52 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 10/19/2015. (ah)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 02/05 4:51 PM
IN CHAMBERS SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DATES by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/23/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Jury Trial set for 1/5/2016 08:30 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Telephone Conference set for 7/22/2015 05:30 PM. (ah)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 30, 2015
25 25 order Dismiss Case Fri 01/30 11:08 AM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS8 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: The court grants defendants' motion to dismiss Gerritsen's complaint. Gerritsen may file an amended complaint within twenty (20) days of the date of this order if she is able to remedy the deficiencies the court has noted in this order. (ah)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 16, 2015
24 24 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Fri 01/16 10:00 AM
Objection re: MOTION to Dismiss Case 8 as to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Plaintiff Terry T. Gerritsen. (Kulik, Glen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 14, 2015
23 23 3 pgs notice Notice (Other) Wed 01/14 9:43 AM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by Defendants Katja Motion Picture Corp, New Line Productions Inc, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.(Kline, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, September 26, 2014
22 22 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS8 OFF CALENDAR by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Defendants' motion to dismiss is currently on calendar for September 29, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the court finds that this matter is appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for September 29, 2014, is hereby vacated, and the matter is taken off calendar. The matter will be deemed submitted on the vacated hearing date, and the clerk will notify the parties when the court has reached a decision. The court further vacates the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE scheduled for September 29, 2014 10:00 am. A minute order setting forth the dates that will manage the case will be issued at a later date. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
Related: [-]
Friday, September 19, 2014
21 21 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Defendants Katja Motion Picture Corp, New Line Productions Inc, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Kline, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 15, 2014
20 20 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's additional Request for Judicial Notice filed by Defendants Katja Motion Picture Corp, New Line Productions Inc, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc re: Request for Judicial Notice, Request for Relief16 (Pearson, Ashley)
Related: [-]
19 19 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Katja Motion Picture Corp, New Line Productions Inc, Warner Bros. Entertainment Incto Objection/Opposition (Motion related)15 (Kline, Matthew)
Related: [-]
18 18 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice filed by Defendants Katja Motion Picture Corp, New Line Productions Inc, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc re: Request for Judicial Notice,, Request for Relief,14 (Kline, Matthew)
Related: [-]
17 17 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Case 8 filed by Defendants Katja Motion Picture Corp, New Line Productions Inc, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. (Kline, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 08, 2014
16 16 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case 8 (Additional RJN in Opposition to Motion) filed by Plaintiff Terry T. Gerritsen. (Kulik, Glen)
Related: [-]
15 15 Objection in Opposition to Declaration of Ashley Pearson and Attached Exhibits re: MOTION to Dismiss Case 8 filed by Plaintiff Terry T. Gerritsen. (Kulik, Glen)
Related: [-]
14 14 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case 8 in Support of Opposition filed by Plaintiff Terry T. Gerritsen.(Kulik, Glen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-10,
Att: 2 Exhibit 11-25,
Att: 3 Exhibit 26-34,
Att: 4 Exhibit 35-45
13 13 29 pgs MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case 8 filed by Plaintiff Terry T. Gerritsen. (Kulik, Glen)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 23, 2014
12 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Judge Margaret M. Morrow is participating in a pilot project regarding the submission of SEALED DOCUMENTS. All proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judge's Chambers email at MMM_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. Please refer to the judge's procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/19/2014. Scheduling Conference set for 9/29/2014 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow. (ah)
Related: [-]
10 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Margaret M. Morrow re: MOTION to Dismiss Case 8 previously scheduled for 9/15/2014 10:00 am has been rescheduled. The court, on its own motion, continues defendants' motion to dismiss to 9/29/2014 at 10:00 a.m.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
Related: [-]
Friday, June 20, 2014
9 9 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Katja Motion Picture Corp, New Line Productions Inc, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. correcting MOTION to Dismiss Case 8 (Kline, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Ashley Pearson in Suppport of Motion to Dismiss w/ Exhibits A-G
8 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendants Katja Motion Picture Corp, New Line Productions Inc, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. Motion set for hearing on 9/15/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Morrow.(Attorney Matthew T Kline added to party Katja Motion Picture Corp(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew T Kline added to party New Line Productions Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew T Kline added to party Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc(pty:dft))(Kline, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Ashley Pearson in Support of,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Proposed Order,
Att: 10 Proof of Service
7 7 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Katja Motion Picture Corp, New Line Productions Inc, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc of Lodged Paperback novel Gravity, by Tess Gerritsen, published in 1999; Blu-ray DVD Gravity, directed by Alfonso Cuarn, released in 2013. (Kline, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2014
6 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Katja Motion Picture Corp, New Line Productions Inc, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc, (Schultz, Michelle)
Related: [-]
5 5 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to New Line Productions Inc answer now due 6/20/2014; Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc answer now due 6/20/2014; Katja Motion Picture Corp answer now due 6/20/2014, re Complaint - (Discovery),1 filed by defendant New Line Productions Inc; Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc; Katja Motion Picture Corp.(Attorney Michelle Inouye Schultz added to party Katja Motion Picture Corp(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle Inouye Schultz added to party New Line Productions Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle Inouye Schultz added to party Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc(pty:dft))(Schultz, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2014
4 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Terry T. Gerritsen. (et) (mg).
Related: [-]
2 2 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery)1 as to Defendants Katja Motion Picture Corp, New Line Productions Inc, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. (et)
Related: [-]
1 1 45 pgs COMPLAINT against Defendants Katja Motion Picture Corp, New Line Productions Inc, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. Case assigned to Judge Margaret M. Morrow for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. (Filing fee $ 400 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Terry T. Gerritsen. (et) (mg).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/30/2014) Notice of Assignment,
Att: 2 (4/30/2014) Civil Cover Sheet