California Central District Court
Judge:Stephen V Wilson
Referred: Patrick J Walsh
Case #: 2:20-cv-04655
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:May 23, 2020
Terminated:Dec 16, 2020
Last checked: Thursday Nov 19, 2020 12:56 AM PST
Defendant
Barry Saven
20244 Pienza Lane
Porter Ranch, CA 91326
Defendant
Air Gourmet, Inc.
Plaintiff
Stockfood America, Inc.
Represented By
Jonah Adam Grossbardt
Sriplaw
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, January 15, 2021
27 27 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 01/15 4:15 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Stockfood America, Inc.. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2020
26 26 misc Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121) Thu 12/17 1:57 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
25 25 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 12/17 10:36 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS MOVING CASE TO INACTIVE CALENDAR PENDING SETTLEMENT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: Notice of Settlement24 . (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
24 24 notice Settlement Tue 12/15 11:54 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Stockfood America, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
23 23 motion Extend Time to File Answer Tue 12/01 7:58 AM
First APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 12/16/2020 filed by defendant Barry Saven. (Attorney Itai Klein added to party Barry Saven(pty:dft)) (Klein, Itai)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 11, 2020
22 22 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 11/11 5:04 PM
SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Stockfood America, Inc., upon Defendant Barry Saven served on 11/11/2020, answer due 12/2/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.(Grossbardt, Jonah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Collette Navasartian,
Att: 2 Exhibit A of Collette Navasartian's Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit B of Collette Navasartian's Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit C of Collette Navasartian's Declaration
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
21 21 1 pgs order Order Wed 11/04 4:34 PM
ORDER GRANTING ALTERNATIVE SERVICE OF PROCESS by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Serve Defendant's via Alternate Service of Process and Additional Time to Serve the Summons and Complaint 17 . Plaintiff shall serve a copy of the summons and complaint on Defendant Air Gourmet, Inc. dba Gourmet Celebrations by alternative service through the Secretary of State and Defendant Barry Saven by alternate service through email and certified mail. Plaintiff is given an additional 30 days, up to and including December 4, 2020 to serve Defendants. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
20 20 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 11/04 3:33 PM
IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Court finds that the email address and mailing address are reasonably calculated to give actual notice to Defendant Barry Saven, and therefore GRANTS Plaintiffs request to serve Saven by e-mail and certified mail under Cal. Civ. Proc. Code section 413.30 at the addresses specified in the supplemental declaration19 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 28, 2020
19 19 misc Declaration Wed 10/28 6:56 PM
DECLARATION of Collette Navasartian re Text Only Scheduling Notice,,, 18 filed by Plaintiff Stockfood America, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 22, 2020
18 18 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 10/22 3:34 PM
IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson - The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs ex parte application17 in part. The Court finds that Plaintiff attempted to serve Defendant Air Gourmet, Inc. through its designated agent with reasonable diligence and now authorizes service on the Secretary of State under Cal. Corp. Code section 1702(a). The Court requires additional information about the proposed alternative service on Defendant Barry Saven. No later than 7 days from the issuance of this Order, Plaintiff should provide information about Savens connection to the relevant email and/or mailing addresses demonstrating that service at those addresses is reasonably calculated to give actual notice to Saven. Cal. Code Civ. P. section 413.30. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 16, 2020
17 17 motion Leave Fri 10/16 4:25 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Serve Defendant's via Alternate Service of Process and Additional Time to Serve the Summons and Complaint filed by Plaintiff Stockfood America, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration of Jonah A. Grossbardt,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 of Jonah A. Grossbardt's Declaration,
Att: 4 Declaration of Collette Navasartian,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Friday, August 21, 2020
16 16 order Extension of Time to File Fri 08/21 4:02 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANT WITH THE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re:15 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff has up to and including October 20, 2020 to serve defendants with the summons and complaint. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 20, 2020
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 08/20 6:33 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Return of Service and Serve Summons and Complaint filed by Plaintiff Stockfood America, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Declaration of Jonah A. Grossbardt,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 of Jonah A. Grossbardt's Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 of Jonah A. Grossbardt's Declaration,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 28, 2020
14 14 service Summons Issued Thu 05/28 3:45 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint1 as to defendant Barry Saven. (lom)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Issued Thu 05/28 3:44 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint1 as to defendant Air Gourmet, Inc. (lom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 27, 2020
12 12 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 05/27 3:40 PM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Summons Request Wed 05/27 10:58 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,,9 filed by Plaintiff Stockfood America, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Summons Request Wed 05/27 10:57 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,,9 filed by Plaintiff Stockfood America, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
9 9 notice Deficiency in Summons Tue 05/26 12:32 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et)
Related: [-]
8 8 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 05/26 12:25 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 05/26 12:25 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (et)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 23, 2020
6 6 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Sat 05/23 10:21 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Stockfood America, Inc., identifying Stockfood GmbH. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Sat 05/23 10:19 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Stockfood America, Inc. identifying Stockfood GmbH as Corporate Parent. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Sat 05/23 10:18 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Stockfood America, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Sat 05/23 10:17 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Stockfood America, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Sat 05/23 10:17 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Stockfood America, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Sat 05/23 10:16 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26548304 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Stockfood America, Inc.. (Attorney Jonah Adam Grossbardt added to party Stockfood America, Inc.(pty:pla))(Grossbardt, Jonah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2