Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11316

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:20-ap-50608
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:May 22, 2020
Terminated:Nov 30, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Path-Tec, LLC
5700 Old Brim Road
Midland, GA 31820
Represented By
Path-Tec, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Don A. Beskrone
Ashby & Geddes P.O. Box 272
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Benjamin W. Keenan
Ashby & Geddes
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, November 30, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Mon 11/30 9:00 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50608 Closed (LBr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 25, 2020
14 14 notice Dismissal - Notice Wed 11/25 4:32 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Don A. Beskrone (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, November 09, 2020
13 13 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Mon 11/09 4:42 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Don A. Beskrone. Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2020 at 12:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Mon 11/09 1:53 PM
Order Approving Settlement of Certain Preference and/or Fraudulent Transfer Claims Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Related [+] Order Signed on 11/9/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 9
11 11 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Mon 11/09 11:16 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Don A. Beskrone. Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2020 at 12:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Mon 11/09 11:01 AM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Motion of Don A. Beskrone, Chapter 7 Trustee, to Approve Settlement of Certain Preference and/or Fraudulent Transfer Claims Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Filed by Don A. Beskrone. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 22, 2020
9 9 motion Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion Thu 10/22 3:51 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 //Motion of Don A. Beskrone, Chapter 7 Trustee, to Approve Settlement of Certain Preference and/or Fraudulent Transfer Claims Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Filed by Don A. Beskrone. Objections due by 11/5/2020. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 09/02 4:16 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Don A. Beskrone. Hearing scheduled for 9/3/2020 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Tue 09/01 11:21 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Don A. Beskrone. Hearing scheduled for 9/3/2020 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 20, 2020
6 6 order Stipulation Mon 07/20 4:36 PM
Order Approving Second Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant toAnswer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint Related [+] Order Signed on 7/20/2020. (LJJ)
Related: [-] 5
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Second Stipulation
Friday, July 17, 2020
5 5 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Fri 07/17 11:03 AM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Second Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint Filed by Don A. Beskrone. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order and Stipulation
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, June 17, 2020
4 4 motion Stipulation Wed 06/17 3:11 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Between Don A. Beskrone and Path-Tec, LLC . Filed by Don A. Beskrone. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 22, 2020
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 05/22 3:23 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Path-Tec, LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 9/3/2020 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 7/21/2020. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Att: 2 Certificate Pursuant to Del. Bankr. L.R. 9019-5(i)(j)
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 05/22 3:16 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50608 LSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9786208, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 05/22 3:14 PM
Adversary case 20-50608 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Don A. Beskrone against Path-Tec, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)). AP Summons Served due date: 8/20/2020. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A