Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Timothy J Savage
Case #: 2:20-cv-02448
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:May 26, 2020
Terminated:Feb 10, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Nov 22, 2020 7:19 AM EST
Defendant
Glenside United Church of Christ Preschool
Represented By
JENNIFER M. BROOKS
Guideone Insurance Co
contact info
Plaintiff
Melissa Anderson-McDonald
Represented By
ROBERT E. BROOKMAN
The Brookman Law Group LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nita Lynch
Represented By
ROBERT E. BROOKMAN
The Brookman Law Group LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 10, 2021
26 26 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Wed 02/10 2:11 PM
ORDER THAT THIS ACTION IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, WITHOUT COSTS, PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 2/9/21. 2/10/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 12/01 12:12 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DOC. NO.24 ) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. THE PLAINTIFF SHALL RESPOND TO THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT NO LATER THAN 12/4/20. ALL REMAINING DEADLINES IN THE SCHEDULING ORDER OF 6/25/20 ARE STAYED PENDING DISPOSITION OF THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/1/20.12/1/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 30, 2020
24 24 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 11/30 1:12 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Melissa Anderson-McDonald..(BROOKMAN, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Friday, November 06, 2020
23 23 motion Summary Judgment Fri 11/06 10:39 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Glenside United Church of Christ Preschool.Order, Brief, Certificate of Service.(BROOKS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Undisputed Facts,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Exhibit,
Att: 13 Exhibit,
Att: 14 Brief Brief,
Att: 15 Certificate of Service
Monday, November 02, 2020
22 22 minutes Discovery Hearing Mon 11/02 11:07 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE Discovery Hearing held on 10/28/20. (amas, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
21 21 minutes Settlement Conference Tue 09/29 1:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART Settlement Conference held on 9/29/20. (amas, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2020
20 20 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 08/07 12:29 PM
AMENDED ORDER THAT THE 9/14/20 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED AND WILL NOW BE HELD ON 9/29/20, AT 10:00 AM, VIA ZOOM TELECONFERENCE, BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 8/7/20. 8/7/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 06, 2020
19 19 1 pgs order Order Thu 08/06 1:08 PM
ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASES SHALL BE CONSOLIDATED BEFORE THE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE FOR PRETRIAL PURPOSES ONLY. C.A. NO. 20-3221 SHALL BE REFERRED TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE FOR PRETRIAL PURPOSES ONLY. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 8/6/20. 8/6/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 29, 2020
18 18 respm Response in Support of Motion Wed 07/29 11:32 AM
RESPONSE in Support re10 MOTION to Dismiss Count IV of Plaintiffs Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Glenside United Church of Christ Preschool. (BROOKS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 27, 2020
17 17 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 07/27 11:18 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re10 MOTION to Dismiss Count IV of Plaintiffs Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Melissa Anderson-McDonald.(BROOKMAN, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, July 23, 2020
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 07/23 4:01 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to15 Order on Motion to Dismiss, filed by Melissa Anderson-McDonald.Stipulation Extending Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Count IV of Plaintiff's Complaint.(BROOKMAN, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 21, 2020
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 07/21 4:16 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT GLENSIDE UNITED CHURCH OF CHRIST PRESCHOOL MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT IV OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 12 (B)(6) IS GRANTED. COUNT IV OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 7/21/20.7/21/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 07, 2020
14 14 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 07/07 1:01 PM
AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 7/23/2020 10:00 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER.(amas, )
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 07/07 1:00 PM
ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED TO BE HELD ON 9/14/2020, AT 10:00 AM, VIA ZOOM TELECONFERENCE, BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 7/7/20. 7/7/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
Related: [-]
12 12 minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 07/07 12:58 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART Scheduling Conference held on 7/7/20. (amas, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
11 11 1 pgs order Order Tue 06/30 1:52 PM
ORDER THAT THE CAUSES OF ACTIONS OF EACH OF THE PLAINTIFFS ARE SEVERED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 6/30/20. 6/30/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Dismiss Tue 06/30 9:57 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Count IV of Plaintiffs Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Glenside United Church of Christ Preschool.Motion to Dismiss Count IV of Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P.12(B)(6).(BROOKS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
9 9 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 06/30 9:41 AM
ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED TO BE HELD ON 7/7/2020, AT 9:00 AM, BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 6/30/20. 6/30/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 25, 2020
8 8 order Scheduling Order Fri 06/26 9:49 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER THAT ALL MOTIONS TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT SHALL BE FILED WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 10/23/20. THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART FOR SETTLEMENT. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 11/6/20. THE PARTIES SHALL FILE THEIR PRETRIAL MEMORANDA NO LATER THAN 12/4/20. ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED BY 12/11/20. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 1/5/21, AT 10:00 AM, IN CHAMBERS (ROOM 9614). THE CASE WILL BE LISTED FOR TRIAL ON 1/7/21, AT 9:00 AM, IN COURTROOM 9A. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEADLINES OUTLINED HEREIN..SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 6/25/20. 6/26/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2020
7 7 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 06/25 8:44 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE Pretrial Conference held on 6/24/20 (amas, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 17, 2020
6 6 misc Report Of Wed 06/17 11:46 AM
Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by Glenside United Church of Christ Preschool. (BROOKS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 06/10 9:11 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Glenside United Church of Christ Preschool, filed by Melissa Anderson-McDonald, Nita Lynch.(BROOKMAN, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form,
Att: 3 Case Management Track Form,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
Friday, June 05, 2020
4 4 motion Appear Fri 06/05 10:03 AM
First MOTION for Leave to Appear Entry of Appearance filed by Glenside United Church of Christ Preschool.Entry of Appearance.(BROOKS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
3 3 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 06/02 3:40 PM
ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 6/24/2020, AT 8:30 AM, IN ROOM 9614, BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 6/2/20. 6/2/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 01, 2020
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 06/01 8:06 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Melissa Anderson-McDonald. Glenside United Church of Christ Preschool waiver sent on 5/26/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (BROOKMAN, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 27, 2020
service Summons Issued Wed 05/27 11:24 AM
Summons Issued as to Glenside United Church of Christ Preschool AND EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL ON 5/27/20. (rf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Tue 05/26 2:07 PM
COMPLAINT against Glenside United Church of Christ Preschool ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14311914.), filed by Melissa Anderson-McDonald.(BROOKMAN, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Case Management Track Form,
Att: 3 Designation Form